Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12534

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:24-bk-12552
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
New Jersey Medical and Health Associates, LLC
308 Willow Ave
Hoboken, NJ 07030-3808
Represented By
Peter C. Hughes
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
7 7 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Tue 02/04 10:12 AM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch D, Sch E-F, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by New Jersey Medical and Health Associates, LLC. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
6 6 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Wed 01/22 9:29 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by New Jersey Medical and Health Associates, LLC. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 12/23 12:42 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by New Jersey Medical and Health Associates, LLC. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 12/23 12:41 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by New Jersey Medical and Health Associates, LLC. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
3 3 8 pgs order Order Wed 11/20 11:58 AM
AMENDED ORDER (I) DIRECTING JOINT ADMINISTRATION OFCHAPTER 11 CASES AND (II) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF"The Debtors in these Chapter 11 Cases, along with the last four digits of each Debtors federal tax identificationnumber are: (i) Bayonne Intermediate Holdco, LLC (7716); (ii) Benego CarePoint, LLC (2199); (iii) Briar HillCarePoint, LLC (iv) CarePoint Health Management Associates Intermediate Holdco, LLC (none); (v) CarePointHealth Management Associates, LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health (3478); (vi) CarePoint Health Systems, Inc. d/b/a JustHealth Foundation (6996); (vii) CH Hudson Holdco, LLC (3376); (viii) Christ Intermediate Holdco, LLC (3376); (ix)Evergreen Community Assets (1726); (x) Garden State Healthcare Associates, LLC (4414); (xi) HobokenIntermediate Holdco, LLC (2105); (xii) Hudson Hospital Holdco, LLC (3869); (xiii) Hudson Hospital Opco, LLCd/b/a CarePoint Health-Christ Hospital (0608); (xiv) HUMC Holdco, LLC (3488); (xv) HUMCO Opco, LLC d/b/aCarePoint Health-Hoboken University Medical Center (7328); (xvi) IJKG, LLC (7430); (xvii) Just Health MSO, LLC(1593); (xviii) New Jersey Medical and Health Associates d/b/a CarePoint Health Medical Group (0232); (xix) QualityCare Associates, LLC (4710); (xx) Sequoia BMC Holdco, LLC (9812); (xxi) IJKG Opco LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health-Bayonne Medical Center (2063). The address for CarePoint Health Systems Inc. is 308 Willow Avenue, Hoboken,NJ 07030." Signed on 11/19/2024. (AJL)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 11/04 9:01 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-12552 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11872127, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 03, 2024
1 1 20 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 11/03 9:29 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by New Jersey Medical and Health Associates, LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 12/3/2024 (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Sun 11/03 9:33 PM
Judge J Kate Stickles added to case (SH)
Related: [-]