Florida Northern District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00035
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 04, 2024 2:20 AM EST
Defendant
SHANNON JARBAR CLAYTON (2)
Represented By
MARIA L DYKES
Maria Dykes Pa - Panama City Fl
contact info
Defendant
RESHARD SHONTEL FEDD (4)
Represented By
GARY ANTHONY ROBERTS
Gary A Roberts & Assoc Llc - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
ELIZABETH GRAY (5)
Represented By
RICHARD A GREENBERG
Rumberger Kirk & Caldwell Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
SANTANA WYVONNE HARRIS (3)
Represented By
ARMANDO GARCIA
Garcia Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
MARIO SWANSTON (1)
Represented By
JANESE MICHELLE CARUTHERS
Federal Public Defender Office - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
JOSEPH ANTHONY RAVELO
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 10:22 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
1 1 6 pgs INDICTMENT (PDF redacted per privacy policy) as to MARIO SWANSTON (1) count(s) 1, 4, SHANNON JARBAR CLAYTON (2) count(s) 1, SANTANA WYVONNE HARRIS (3) count(s) 1, 2, RESHARD SHONTEL FEDD (4) count(s) 1, 3, ELIZABETH GRAY (5) count(s) 1. (vkm)
Related: [-]
2 2 Sealed Document (Unredacted Indictment) (vkm)
Related: [-]
3 3 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET by USA as to MARIO SWANSTON (copy to US Marshal)(PDF sealed per Privacy Policy) (vkm)
Related: [-]
4 4 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET by USA as to SHANNON JARBAR CLAYTON (copy to US Marshal)(PDF sealed per Privacy Policy) (vkm)
Related: [-]
5 5 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET by USA as to SANTANA WYVONNE HARRIS (copy to US Marshal)(PDF sealed per Privacy Policy) (vkm)
Related: [-]
6 6 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET by USA as to RESHARD SHONTEL FEDD (copy to US Marshal)(PDF sealed per Privacy Policy) (vkm)
Related: [-]
7 7 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET by USA as to ELIZABETH GRAY (copy to US Marshal)(PDF sealed per Privacy Policy) (vkm)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs MOTION REQUESTING AN ORDER SEALING THE INDICTMENT by USA as to MARIO SWANSTON, SHANNON JARBAR CLAYTON, SANTANA WYVONNE HARRIS, RESHARD SHONTEL FEDD, ELIZABETH GRAY. (vkm)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER granting 8 MOTION REQUESTING AN ORDER SEALING THE INDICTMENT as to MARIO SWANSTON (1), SHANNON JARBAR CLAYTON (2), SANTANA WYVONNE HARRIS (3), RESHARD SHONTEL FEDD (4), ELIZABETH GRAY (5). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 8/6/2024. (vkm)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER FOR WARRANT as to MARIO SWANSTON. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 8/6/2024. (vkm)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER FOR WARRANT as to SHANNON JARBAR CLAYTON. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 8/6/2024. (vkm)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER FOR WARRANT as to SANTANA WYVONNE HARRIS. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 8/6/2024. (vkm)
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER FOR WARRANT as to RESHARD SHONTEL FEDD. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 8/6/2024. (vkm)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER FOR WARRANT as to ELIZABETH GRAY. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 8/6/2024. (vkm)
Related: [-]