Tennessee Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-20141
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 04, 2024 1:19 AM CST
Defendant
Javier Herrera De Loera (5)
Represented By
Timothy J. Williams
Law Offices Of Timothy J. Williams
contact info
Timothy Joel Williams, Jr
Tim Williams Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Manuel Gonzalez-Lopez (7)
Represented By
Claiborne Hambrick Ferguson
The Claiborne Ferguson Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Carlos Mendoza (6)
Represented By
Janika N. White
Janika White Law, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jorge Murillo-Lopez (8)
Represented By
Howard Brett Manis
Cochran Firm - Memphis
contact info
Defendant
Jose Alberto Ortega-Montes (2)
Represented By
Barry J. McWhirter
Mcwhirter Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Ismael Rodriguez (1)
Represented By
Needum Louis Germany, III
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Prudencio Rodriguez-Morales (3)
Represented By
Marty B. McAfee
The Mcafee Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Adolfo Salinas-Aguilar (4)
Represented By
Lee Howard Gerald
Law Office Of Lee Gerald
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Gregory David Allen
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/04/2024 2:30 AM CST
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
2 2 MOTION to Seal Indictment as to Ismael Rodriguez, Jose Alberto Ortega-Montes, Prudencio Rodriguez-Morales, Adolfo Salinas-Aguilar, Javier Herrera De Loera, Carlos Mendoza, Manuel Gonzalez-Lopez, Jorge Murillo-Lopez. (tlh)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER Granting2 Motion to Seal Indictment as to Ismael Rodriguez (1), Jose Alberto Ortega-Montes (2), Prudencio Rodriguez-Morales (3), Adolfo Salinas-Aguilar (4), Javier Herrera De Loera (5), Carlos Mendoza (6), Manuel Gonzalez-Lopez (7), Jorge Murillo-Lopez (8). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 8/6/2024. (Pham, Tu)
Related: [-]
4 4 INDICTMENT (PENALTY COPY) as to Ismael Rodriguez, Jose Alberto Ortega-Montes, Prudencio Rodriguez-Morales, Adolfo Salinas-Aguilar, Javier Herrera De Loera, Carlos Mendoza, Manuel Gonzalez-Lopez, Jorge Murillo-Lopez. (cas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Penalties