Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:R Stan Baker
Referred: Christopher L Ray
Case #: 4:24-cv-00248
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2024
Terminated:Nov 12, 2024
TERMINATED PARTIES
Amicus
Claudine Schneider
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmerhale
contact info
Allegra J. Lawrence-Hardy
Lawrence & Bundy LLC
contact info
Amicus
Ty Cobb
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmerhale
contact info
Allegra J. Lawrence-Hardy
Lawrence & Bundy LLC
contact info
Amicus
Natalie Crawford
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmerhale
contact info
Allegra J. Lawrence-Hardy
Lawrence & Bundy LLC
contact info
Amicus
Geoff Duncan
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmerhale
contact info
Allegra J. Lawrence-Hardy
Lawrence & Bundy LLC
contact info
Amicus
Mickey Edwards
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmerhale
contact info
Allegra J. Lawrence-Hardy
Lawrence & Bundy LLC
contact info
Amicus
Shannon Ferguson
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmerhale
contact info
Allegra J. Lawrence-Hardy
Lawrence & Bundy LLC
contact info
Amicus
Georgia State Conference of the NAACP
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmerhale
contact info
Gerald Weber
Gerald R Weber
contact info
Amicus
League of Women Voters of Georgia
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmerhale
contact info
Gerald Weber
Gerald R Weber
contact info
Amicus
Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmerhale
contact info
Gerald Weber
Gerald R Weber
contact info
Amicus
Richard Painter
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmerhale
contact info
Allegra J. Lawrence-Hardy
Lawrence & Bundy LLC
contact info
Defendant
Susan Motter
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Benjamin S. Klehr
Small Herrin, LLP
contact info
Brent William Herrin
Small Herrin, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alice O'Lenick
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Amber Montrose Carter
Gilbert, Harrell, Sumerford & Martin, P.C.
contact info
Mark David Johnson
Gilbert, Harrell, Sumerford & Martin, PC
contact info
Defendant
Pat Pullar
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Arash Ali Sabzevari
Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hunaid Qadir
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Judd T. Drake
Athens-Clarke County Government
contact info
John Matthew Hawkins
Athens-Clarke County Government
contact info
Defendant
Rocky Raffle
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Judd T. Drake
Athens-Clarke County Government
contact info
John Matthew Hawkins
Athens-Clarke County Government
contact info
Defendant
Anthony Rodriquez
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Defendant
Adam Shirley
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Judd T. Drake
Athens-Clarke County Government
contact info
John Matthew Hawkins
Athens-Clarke County Government
contact info
Defendant
Tori Silas
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Wade Wilkes Herring, II
Hunter Maclean, Exley & Dunn, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W. White
Haynie, Litchfield & White, PC
contact info
Defendant
Karli Swift
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Benjamin S. Klehr
Small Herrin, LLP
contact info
Brent William Herrin
Small Herrin, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wandy Taylor
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Defendant
Patricia Till
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Judd T. Drake
Athens-Clarke County Government
contact info
John Matthew Hawkins
Athens-Clarke County Government
contact info
Defendant
Carol Wesley
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Arash Ali Sabzevari
Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Mosbacher
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Wade Wilkes Herring, II
Hunter Maclean, Exley & Dunn, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W. White
Haynie, Litchfield & White, PC
contact info
Defendant
Democratic National Committee
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Jeffrey R. Harris
Harris Lowry Manton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Jeffrey R. Harris
Harris Lowry Manton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Loretta Mirandola
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Defendant
Vasu Abhiraman
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Benjamin S. Klehr
Small Herrin, LLP
contact info
Brent William Herrin
Small Herrin, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Julie Adams
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Lauren Ann Warner
Chilivis Grubman, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sherri Allen
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Lauren Ann Warner
Chilivis Grubman, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Trish Brown
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Benjamin Mason Perkins
Oliver Maner, LLP
contact info
Wes Parker Rahn
Oliver Maner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Steven F. Bruning
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Wade Wilkes Herring, II
Hunter Maclean, Exley & Dunn, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W. White
Haynie, Litchfield & White, PC
contact info
Defendant
Teresa K. Crawford
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Lauren Ann Warner
Chilivis Grubman, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stacy Efrat
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Wade Wilkes Herring, II
Hunter Maclean, Exley & Dunn, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W. White
Haynie, Litchfield & White, PC
contact info
Defendant
Willa Fambrough
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Judd T. Drake
Athens-Clarke County Government
contact info
John Matthew Hawkins
Athens-Clarke County Government
contact info
Defendant
Debbie Fischer
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Wade Wilkes Herring, II
Hunter Maclean, Exley & Dunn, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W. White
Haynie, Litchfield & White, PC
contact info
Defendant
Dominique Grant
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Arash Ali Sabzevari
Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dorothy Foster Hall
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Arash Ali Sabzevari
Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
James Hall
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Benjamin Mason Perkins
Oliver Maner, LLP
contact info
Wes Parker Rahn
Oliver Maner LLP
contact info
Defendant
David Hancock
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Defendant
Michael Heekin
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Lauren Ann Warner
Chilivis Grubman, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Marianne Heimes
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Benjamin Mason Perkins
Oliver Maner, LLP
contact info
Wes Parker Rahn
Oliver Maner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Danny Hope
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Arash Ali Sabzevari
Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nancy Jester
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Benjamin S. Klehr
Small Herrin, LLP
contact info
Brent William Herrin
Small Herrin, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Aaron V. Johnson
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Lauren Ann Warner
Chilivis Grubman, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Glynda Jones
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Benjamin Mason Perkins
Oliver Maner, LLP
contact info
Wes Parker Rahn
Oliver Maner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Anthony Lewis
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Benjamin S. Klehr
Small Herrin, LLP
contact info
Brent William Herrin
Small Herrin, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Mahoney, III
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Benjamin Mason Perkins
Oliver Maner, LLP
contact info
Wes Parker Rahn
Oliver Maner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Georgia Republican Party, Inc.
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Mark Ansel Bandy
The Law Offices Of Mark A. Bandy, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Republican National Committee
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Alex Benjamin Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Dwight T. Feemster
Duffy & Feemster, LLC
contact info
Mark Ansel Bandy
The Law Offices Of Mark A. Bandy, P.C.
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
54 54 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 11/12 11:08 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). This case is closed. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/12/2024. (amd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
53 53 motion Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/07 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Republican National Committee (Kaufman, Alex)
Related: [-]
52 52 misc Transcript Thu 11/07 10:36 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on November 4, 2024, before Chief Judge R. Stan Baker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly A. McKee, Telephone number 912-650-4065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view[LINK:Transcript Redaction Policy] ) Redaction Request due 11/29/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2025. (McKee, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
51 51 misc Transcript Wed 11/06 7:03 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Motion Hearing held on November 5, 2024, before Chief Judge R. Stan Baker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly A. McKee, Telephone number 912-650-4065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view[LINK:Transcript Redaction Policy] ) Redaction Request due 11/27/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2025. (McKee, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
50 50 misc Transcript Tue 11/05 8:06 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Court's Oral Order from Motion Hearing held on November 5, 2024, before Chief Judge R. Stan Baker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly A. McKee, Telephone number 912-650-4065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view[LINK:Transcript Redaction Policy] ) Redaction Request due 11/26/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/6/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2025. (McKee, Kelly)
Related: [-]
49 49 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 11/05 5:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker. A Telephonic Motion Hearing was held on 11/5/2024 as to Plaintiff's2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / Temporary Restraining Order. (Court Reporter Kelly McKee.)(RSB-CHMB.)(pmh)
Related: [-]
48 48 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 11/05 2:02 PM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel White. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/5/2024. (gmh)
Related: [-]
47 47 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 11/05 1:56 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Felicia H. Ellsworth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/5/2024. (gmh)
Related: [-]
46 46 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 11/05 1:46 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Matthew Hawkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/5/2024. (gmh)
Related: [-]
45 45 trial Witness List Tue 11/05 10:42 AM
Witness List by Republican National Committee. (Kaufman, Alex)
Related: [-]
44 44 motion Leave to File Document Tue 11/05 10:40 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc, League of Women Voters of Georgia. Responses due by 11/19/2024.(Weber, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Brief of Amici Curiae Georgia NAACP, GCPA, and League of Women Voters
43 43 misc Declaration Tue 11/05 10:40 AM
DECLARATION of Jared Hooper by Republican National Committee. (Kaufman, Alex)
Related: [-]
42 42 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/05 9:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Ann Warner on behalf of Julie Adams, Sherri Allen, Teresa K. Crawford, Michael Heekin (Warner, Lauren)
Related: [-]
41 41 notice Brief in Support/Opposition of Motion Tue 11/05 9:02 AM
Brief in Opposition re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Dominique Grant, Dorothy Foster Hall, Danny Hope, Pat Pullar, Carol Wesley. (Sabzevari, Arash)
Related: [-]
40 40 respoth Response Tue 11/05 9:02 AM
RESPONSE to2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., Republican National Committee filed by Julie Adams, Sherri Allen, Teresa K. Crawford, Michael Heekin, Aaron V. Johnson.(Warner, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration
39 39 misc Declaration Tue 11/05 9:01 AM
DECLARATION re37 Response in Opposition to Motion by Steven F. Bruning, Stacy Efrat, Debbie Fischer, Jennifer Mosbacher, Tori Silas. (Herring, Wade)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Dismiss Tue 11/05 8:59 AM
MOTION to Dismiss and Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alice O'Lenick. Responses due by 11/19/2024.(Johnson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
37 37 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 11/05 8:58 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Steven F. Bruning, Stacy Efrat, Debbie Fischer, Jennifer Mosbacher, Tori Silas. (Herring, Wade)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/05 8:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark David Johnson on behalf of Alice O'Lenick (Johnson, Mark)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Brief in Support/Opposition of Motion Tue 11/05 8:55 AM
Brief in Opposition re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Trish Brown, James Hall, Marianne Heimes, Glynda Jones, Thomas Mahoney, III.(Perkins, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
34 34 notice Brief in Support/Opposition of Motion Tue 11/05 8:52 AM
Brief in Opposition re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Vasu Abhiraman, Nancy Jester, Anthony Lewis, Susan Motter, Karli Swift.(Herrin, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Keisha Smith
33 33 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/05 8:38 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel White Receipt Number CGASDC-3931893, Fee Amount $200, by Steven F. Bruning, Stacy Efrat, Debbie Fischer, Jennifer Mosbacher, Tori Silas. Responses due by 11/19/2024.(Herring, Wade)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed ORder,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 List of Cases
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 11/05 8:24 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Brief in Response filed by Willa Fambrough, Hunaid Qadir, Rocky Raffle, Adam Shirley, Patricia Till. (Drake, Judd)
Related: [-]
31 31 trial Witness List Tue 11/05 12:12 AM
Witness List by Georgia Republican Party, Inc.. (Kaufman, Alex)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Declaration Tue 11/05 12:10 AM
DECLARATION of Jared Hooper by Georgia Republican Party, Inc.. (Kaufman, Alex)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 11/05 9:22 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Felicia Ellsworth Receipt Number AGASDC-3931761, Fee Amount $200;33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel White Receipt Number CGASDC-3931893, Fee Amount $200. (csr)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 11/05 9:24 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (pmh)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for TRO Tue 11/05 5:51 PM
ORAL ORDER. For the reasons and in the manner stated on the record of the January 5, 2024 Telephonic Motions Hearing, the Court denies Plaintiffs'2 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction / Temporary Restraining Order. The Court will file the transcript of the Order on the docket as soon as practicable. Entered by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on November 5, 2024. (pmh)
Related: [-]