Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Referred: Jeffery S Frensley
Case #: 3:24-cv-01316
Nature of Suit371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024
Case in other court:Chancery Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, 24-01129-IV
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 4:57 AM CDT
Defendant
Encore Bancshares, Inc.
Represented By
Austin C. Evans
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Nathaniel T. Gorman
Hall Booth Smith, P.C. (nashville Office)
contact info
Baxter D. Drennon
Hall Booth Smith, P.C.
contact info
Joshua D. Wilson
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp (nashville)
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Clifford
Represented By
Jacob T. Clabo
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Connor M. Blair
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Kaitlin E. White
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy McDonald Gaw
Represented By
Jacob T. Clabo
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Connor M. Blair
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Kaitlin E. White
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Turner Gaw
Represented By
Jacob T. Clabo
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Connor M. Blair
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Kaitlin E. White
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lyndsey Harris
Represented By
Jacob T. Clabo
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Connor M. Blair
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Kaitlin E. White
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathan Harris
Represented By
Jacob T. Clabo
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Connor M. Blair
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Kaitlin E. White
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Beth Maaske
Represented By
Jacob T. Clabo
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Connor M. Blair
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Kaitlin E. White
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Maaske
Represented By
Jacob T. Clabo
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Connor M. Blair
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Kaitlin E. White
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Darin Zumwalt
Represented By
Jacob T. Clabo
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Connor M. Blair
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Kaitlin E. White
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristin Zumwalt
Represented By
Jacob T. Clabo
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Connor M. Blair
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Kaitlin E. White
Buchalter, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Austin C. Evans on behalf of Encore Bancshares, Inc. (Evans, Austin)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D. Wilson on behalf of Encore Bancshares, Inc. (Wilson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 03/10 1:38 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Joshua D. Wilson, Austin C. Evans admitted to this court . (ab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
16 16 4 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Wed 02/05 1:53 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 7/14/2026 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5C before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2026 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5C before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/29/2026. Exhibit List due by 6/29/2026. Witness List due by 6/29/2026. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/5/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Case Management Order Wed 02/05 1:22 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2025; Discovery due by 9/19/2025; Motions due by 2/27/2026. Subsequent Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/20/2025 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/5/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ab)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
14 14 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/03 2:52 PM
ORDER granting9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Baxter D. Drennon to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 02/03/2025. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/31 8:42 AM
ORDER: The Court will be utilizing a new conference line for the telephone conference set on February 4, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. All parties shall call 1-855-244-8681, and when prompted for the access code, enter 23139129180# to participate in the Case Management Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 1/31/2025. (ch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
12 12 misc Proposed Case Management Order Thu 01/30 4:06 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by All Plaintiffs. (Blair, Connor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 01/29 9:47 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Connor M. Blair, Kaitlin E. White admitted to this court . (ab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/28 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin E. White on behalf of All Plaintiffs (White, Kaitlin)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/28 1:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Connor M. Blair on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blair, Connor)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 01/24 12:21 PM
AR State Bar status verified as active for Baxter D. Drennon PHV motion pending - Local counsel secured . (ab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/23 2:04 PM
MOTION for attorney Baxter D. Drennon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4244461) by Encore Bancshares, Inc..(Gorman, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, November 04, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/04 9:40 PM
Defendant Encore Bancshares, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by Encore Bancshares, Inc..(Gorman, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Mon 11/04 12:17 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/4/2024. (ab)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Mon 11/04 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 2/4/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ad)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Mon 11/04 11:11 AM
***DISREGARD***NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 2/4/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ad) Modified on 11/4/2024 (ad)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Mon 11/04 11:03 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Mon 11/04 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Mon 11/04 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 11/04 11:29 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jacob T. Clabo, Nathaniel T. Gorman admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 11/04 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Encore Bancshares, Inc. from Chancery Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 24-1129 IV. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNMDC-4194420)(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit - Return of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit - Arkansas SOS