Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant
Case #: 4:24-cv-00982
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 3:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Amber Murphy
Represented By
Janet Guggemos Garza
Schirrmeister Diaz-Arrastia Brem LLP
contact info
Jeremy Roller
Arete Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Bella Forrest Publishing LLC
Represented By
Charles Arnison Wallace
Scale LLP
contact info
James Henry Creedon
Scale LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
utility Remark Tue 05/06 9:58 AM
The Court hereby CANCELS the May 9, 2025 Scheduling Conference; the Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (No attachment) (tls)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
27 27 8 pgs misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 04/25 5:58 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wallace, Charles)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/25 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy Roller on behalf of Amber Murphy. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BTXEDC-10804805. (Roller, Jeremy) (BS).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/29/2025) Sealed Attachment
Friday, April 18, 2025
25 25 11 pgs respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 04/18 5:04 PM
RESPONSE in Support re22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amber Murphy . (Garza, Janet)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
24 24 22 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/11 5:00 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bella Forrest Publishing LLC .(Wallace, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order,
Att: 2 3 pgs Affidavit/Declaration,
Att: 3 3 pgs Affidavit/Declaration,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 5 4 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 6 1 pgs Exhibit
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 04/08 2:58 PM
ORDER denying as moot13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant on 4/8/2025. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
22 22 30+ pgs motion Dismiss Fri 03/28 5:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Amber Murphy.(Garza, Janet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit/Declaration of Amber Murphy,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Swiss Criminal Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - CS&P Fiduciary Agreements,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - CS&P Website Capture,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Hot Pancakes Limited General Power of Attorney,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Trust,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - CS&P Invoice (Copyright & Trademark Registration),
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Order Granting Motion to Dismiss (King Co., WA),
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Decision and Order on Motion (New York Co., NY),
Att: 10 Exhibit I - HPL and CS&P Statement of Claims (Bahamas),
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Murphy Defence and Counterclaim (Bahamas),
Att: 12 Exhibit K - HPL and CS&P Reply to Defence and Counterclaim,
Att: 13 Exhibit L - Murphy Amended Defence and Counterclaim (Bahamas),
Att: 14 Exhibit M - Handwriting Expert Report (Switzerland),
Att: 15 Exhibit N - Dismissal of Appeals (Switzerland),
Att: 16 Affidavit/Declaration of Sandrine Giroud,
Att: 17 Affidavit/Declaration of Jeremy Roller,
Att: 18 Exhibit A - Place card for document previously filed under seal at Dkt No. 12-1,
Att: 19 Proposed Order
Friday, March 21, 2025
21 21 10 pgs order Order Governing Proceedings Fri 03/21 4:15 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/25/2025. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 5/9/2025 at 09:30 AM via Zoom or Telephone before Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant. Signed by Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant on 3/21/2025. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
20 20 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 03/13 4:31 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Amber Murphy answer is now due 3/28/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(rpc)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 03/13 4:09 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Amber Murphy. Summons originally served on 01/28/2025. Agreed new answer date is 03/28/2025.(Garza, Janet)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Thu 03/13 3:32 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Expedited Third Party Discovery. Signed by Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant on 3/13/2025. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
17 17 13 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/06 5:36 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amber Murphy, filed by Bella Forrest Publishing LLC.(Wallace, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 50 pgs Exhibit M
Monday, March 03, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/03 4:08 PM
ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff Bella Forrest Publishing LLC's opposition to Defendant Amber Murphy's motion to dismiss will be timely if filed by Friday, March 28, 2025, and any reply to the opposition would be timely if filed by Friday, April 4, 2025. Signed by Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant on 3/3/2025. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
15 15 2 pgs misc Stipulation Fri 02/28 1:06 PM
JOINT STIPULATION re13 MOTION to Dismiss by Amber Murphy.(Garza, Janet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order
Friday, February 21, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 02/21 2:52 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/21/2025. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
13 13 28 pgs motion Dismiss Tue 02/18 7:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Amber Murphy.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Affidavit/Declaration of Amber Murphy in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Swiss Criminal Complaint (Aug 2020),
Att: 3 Exhibit B - CS&P Fiduciary Agreements,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - CS&P Website Capture,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Hot Pancakes Limited General Power of Attorney,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Trust,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit F - CS&P Invoice (Copyright & Trademark Registration),
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Order Granting Motion to Dismiss (King Co., WA),
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Decision and Order on Motion (New York Co., NY),
Att: 10 Exhibit I - HPL & CS&P Statement of Claims (Bahamas),
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Murphy Defence & Counterclaim (Bahamas),
Att: 12 Exhibit K - HPL & CS&P Reply to Defence & Counterclaim (Bahamas),
Att: 13 Exhibit L - Murphy Amended Defence & Counterclaim (Bahamas),
Att: 14 Exhibit M - Handwriting Expert Report (Switzerland),
Att: 15 Exhibit N - Dismissal of Appeals (Switzerland,
Att: 16 4 pgs Affidavit/Declaration of Sandrine Giroud In Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 17 2 pgs Affidavit/Declaration of Jeremy Roller In Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 18 Exhibit A - Asset Purchase Agreement [Filed Under Seal at Dkt No. 12],
Att: 19 1 pgs Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Garza, Janet) (Entered: 02/18/2025
12 12 misc Sealed Document Tue 02/18 7:04 PM
Sealed Document.(Garza, Janet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jeremy Roller
11 11 2 pgs motion Leave to File Document Tue 02/18 5:50 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Amber Murphy.(Garza, Janet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order
10 10 1 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 02/18 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janet Guggemos Garza on behalf of Amber Murphy (Garza, Janet)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
9 9 motion Discovery Mon 02/17 3:19 PM
MOTION for Discovery On Third Party On Expedited Basis by Bella Forrest Publishing LLC.(Wallace, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order,
Att: 2 2 pgs Affidavit/Declaration of Charles A Wallace in Support of Motion,
Att: 3 41 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 4 9 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
8 8 2 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/28 4:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bella Forrest Publishing LLC. Amber Murphy served on 1/28/2025.(Wallace, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Executed Proof of Service,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit Showing Executed Service of Process on Defendant,
Att: 3 1 pgs Affidavit/Declaration of Charles Wallace in support of Executed Proof of Service
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/28 3:42 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/28/2025. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 01/20 3:30 PM
MOTION for Alternative Service of Process by Bella Forrest Publishing LLC.(Wallace, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Proposed Order,
Att: 2 2 pgs Affidavit/Declaration of Charles A Wallace in Support of Motion,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 5 4 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 6 10 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E
Monday, November 04, 2024
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 11/04 4:52 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Amber Murphy. (baf)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/04 12:41 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Summons Form for Clerk's Execution by Bella Forrest Publishing LLC re1 Complaint, (Wallace, Charles)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 11/04 11:13 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wallace, Charles)
Related: [-]
2 2 8 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121) Mon 11/04 11:12 AM
Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 emailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Wallace, Charles)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/04 11:04 AM
COMPLAINT against Amber Murphy ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10460284.), filed by Bella Forrest Publishing LLC.(Wallace, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/04 4:48 PM
Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 11/04 4:50 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (baf)
Related: [-]