New Jersey District Court
Judge:Christine P O'Hearn
Referred: Matthew J Skahill
Case #: 1:24-cv-10265
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 5:40 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
HPS, INC.
Represented By
MEGAN KNOWLTON BALNE
Hyland Levin Shapiro LLP
contact info
BEAU CHARLES WILSON
Hyland Levin Shapiro LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
JAKE PREGLER
Represented By
THOMAS P. DONNELLY
Antheil Maslow & Macminn, LLP
contact info
Defendant
HPS, INC.
Represented By
MEGAN KNOWLTON BALNE
Hyland Levin Shapiro LLP
contact info
BEAU CHARLES WILSON
Hyland Levin Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JAKE PREGLER
Represented By
THOMAS P. DONNELLY
Antheil Maslow & Macminn, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, February 13, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/13 2:38 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Wed 02/12 12:12 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by JAKE PREGLER, HPS, INC.. (DONNELLY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
22 22 order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Wed 02/05 3:32 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the Parties' correspondence indicating that they have reached a settlement in principle and intend to file a Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). In light of the Parties' settlement, the pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (ECF No. 7), is hereby ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. If the parties do not file the anticipated stipulation of dismissal within thirty (30) days, they shall submit a joint status letter advising the Court of the matter's status. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 2/5/25. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
21 21 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 01/27 3:56 PM
Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by JAKE PREGLER.(DONNELLY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
20 20 order Order Fri 01/10 8:52 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Show Cause hearing presently scheduled for January 15, 2025 is hereby ADJOURNED to February 5, 2025 at 11:00am, Courtroom 5A, before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 1/10/25. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
19 19 order Order Tue 01/07 1:58 PM
TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling the conflict, the February 19, 2025 initial conference is moved to 2:30 p.m. The call in number is 856-210-8988, access code 478 631 796#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 1/7/2025. (rss, )
Related: [-]
18 18 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Tue 01/07 11:35 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 2/19/2025 at 02:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 1/07/2025. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 01/06 5:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against JAKE PREGLER by HPS, INC..(BALNE, MEGAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, January 03, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Fri 01/03 5:45 PM
Letter from HPS Inc. re 14 Order,,. (WILSON, BEAU)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/03 5:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BEAU CHARLES WILSON on behalf of HPS, INC. (WILSON, BEAU)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Fri 01/03 2:57 PM
TEXT ORDER: Having reviewed the Parties' briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (ECF Nos. 7, 10, 12), the Parties are hereby ORDERED to appear before this Court, located at the Mitchell H. Cohen Building and U.S. Courthouse on 4th and Cooper Streets in Camden, New Jersey, in Courtroom 5A, for a hearing on January 15, 2025 at 11:00am. The Parties are further ORDERED to disclose to each other in writing and to the Court the identity of any witnesses they intend to present at the hearing, along with a description of their anticipated testimony, and all exhibits they intend to introduce (pre-marked) no later than two (2) days before the hearing. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 1/3/25. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/31 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN KNOWLTON BALNE on behalf of HPS, INC. (BALNE, MEGAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
12 12 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 12/30 9:31 AM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JAKE PREGLER re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (DONNELLY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Monday, December 23, 2024
11 11 service Certificate of Service Mon 12/23 6:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HPS, INC. re10 Brief in Opposition to Motion (BALNE, MEGAN)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/23 5:38 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by HPS, INC. re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (BALNE, MEGAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Thursday, December 12, 2024
9 9 service Certificate of Service Thu 12/12 12:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JAKE PREGLER re 8 Order, Notification of Status Conference Scheduled for December 18, 2024 (DONNELLY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Thu 12/12 11:29 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a status conference on December 18, 2024 at 3:30pm via Teams. Plaintiff is ordered to serve a copy of this Text Order upon Defendant and file a proof of service once service is effectuated. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 12/12/24. (hem, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/12 9:00 AM
Set Deadlines as to7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion set for 1/6/2025 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
7 7 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 12/11 2:13 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JAKE PREGLER.(DONNELLY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Affidavit of Jake Pregler,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/11 12:30 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Patricia C. Collins, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 12/11/2024. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/12 2:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAKE PREGLER. HPS, INC. waiver sent on 11/6/2024, answer due 1/6/2025. (DONNELLY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/06 2:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JAKE PREGLER.(DONNELLY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Patricia C. Collins,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/06 4:08 PM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 12/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 11/05 9:57 AM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by JAKE PREGLER. (DONNELLY, THOMAS) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/5/2024) (js)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 11/05 9:44 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to HPS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (aji, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 11/05 9:43 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (aji, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Tue 11/05 11:46 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Diversity Disclosure Statement3 filed by THOMAS P. DONNELLY, ESQ. on 11/5/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (js)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/04 12:34 PM
COMPLAINT against JAKE PREGLER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15783752), filed by JAKE PREGLER.(DONNELLY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Confidentiality & Non-Compete Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Offer Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Cease & Desist Letter
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 11/04 4:15 PM
Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (tf, )
Related: [-]