Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-40472

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Noah G Hillen
Case #: 4:24-ap-08033
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jay R. Meyer
3919 E 116 N
Rigby, ID 83442
Represented By
Jay R. Meyer
contact info
Defendant
Natalie Meyer
3919 E 116 N
Rigby, ID 83442
Represented By
Natalie Meyer
contact info
Plaintiff
Frontier Credit Union
865 S. Woodruff Ave.
Idaho Falls, ID 83401
Represented By
Robert J. Maynes
East Idaho Credit Union
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Saturday, April 26, 2025
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Sat 04/26 10:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Case. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
18 18 order Dismissing Case - AP Thu 04/24 3:02 PM
Order Approving Settlement Stipulation and Dismissing Adversary Proceeding, with Prejudice Signed on 4/23/2025. (lp)
Related: [-]
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Thu 04/24 3:05 PM
Adversary Case 4:24-ap-8033 Closed, Disposition of Adversary 4:24-ap-8033 Judgment For Stipulated Agreement/Dismissal (lp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
17 17 motion Stipulation Wed 04/23 9:09 AM
Stipulation Between Frontier & Debtors Filed by Plaintiff Frontier Credit Union. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
16 16 notice Notice to Take Depositions Mon 04/07 1:57 PM
Notice to Take Depositions of Natalie Meyer (Amended Notice) Filed by Plaintiff Frontier Credit Union. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice to Take Depositions Mon 04/07 1:57 PM
Notice to Take Depositions of Jay Meyer (Amended Notice) Filed by Plaintiff Frontier Credit Union. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
14 14 notice Notice to Take Depositions Wed 03/12 9:13 AM
Notice to Take Depositions of Natalie Meyer Filed by Plaintiff Frontier Credit Union. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice to Take Depositions Wed 03/12 9:12 AM
Notice to Take Depositions of Jay R. Meyer Filed by Plaintiff Frontier Credit Union. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Service Re:Discovery Fri 01/17 11:57 AM
Notice of Service Re:Discovery Filed by Plaintiff Frontier Credit Union. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
11 11 audio Fri 12/13 6:15 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [12/12/2024 12:55:24 PM]. File Size [ 10502 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:35 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Pretrial Order Thu 12/12 2:54 PM
Order re Pretrial Proceedings Setting Date for Trial Signed on 12/12/2024. Trial of this matter is set for August 20, 2025, at 9:00 a.m., at the U.S. Courthouse, 801 E. Sherman Street, Pocatello ID 83201. (mb)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other) Thu 12/12 9:16 AM
Hearing Held Appearances: Robert J Maynes - Counsel for the Plaintiff, Aaron J Tolson - Counsel for the Defendant Report of Proceedings: Telephone Pretrial Conference. The pleadings are settled. Any and all discovery shall be completed no later than, June 10, 2025. Any and all pretrial motions shall be filed and heard no later than July 7, 2025. Pretrial briefs shall be filed no later than August 6, 2025. Trial of this matter is set for August 20, 2025, at 9:00 a.m., at the U.S. Courthouse, 801 E. Sherman Street, Pocatello ID 83201. A pretrial order shall be forthcoming. Audio File Location: n/a Related [+] (mb)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Jay R. Meyer, Defendant Natalie Meyer
Sunday, November 17, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Sun 11/17 10:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Notice Date 11/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 11/15 12:45 PM
Notice of Pretrial Conference and Order Related [+]. Pre Trial Conference hearing to be held on 12/12/2024 at 09:00 AM Telephonic Hearing for6 , (lp)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendants Jay R. Meyer, Natalie Meyer
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/13 2:55 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendants Jay R. Meyer, Natalie Meyer (Tolson, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 11/04 2:40 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jay R. Meyer 11/4/2024; Natalie Meyer 11/4/2024 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Mon 11/04 9:58 AM
Summons Issued on Jay R. Meyer Date Issued 11/4/2024, Answer Due 12/4/2024; Natalie Meyer Date Issued 11/4/2024, Answer Due 12/4/2024 (lp)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
3 3 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 11/01 4:17 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 11/01 3:26 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-08033 NGH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8458765. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/01 3:25 PM
Adversary case 24-08033 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud): Complaint by Frontier Credit Union against Jay R. Meyer, Natalie Meyer. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Adversary Summons