Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William Matthewman
Referred: William Matthewman
Case #: 9:24-cv-81385
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 6:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Garrett Bechtel
Represented By
Summer Marie Barranco
Purdy, Jolly, Giuffreda, Barranco & Jisa, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Ric Bradshaw
Represented By
Summer Marie Barranco
Purdy, Jolly, Giuffreda, Barranco & Jisa, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Cano
sued in their individual capacity Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office 3228 Gun Club Rd.
West Palm Beach, FL 33406
Represented By
Summer Marie Barranco
Purdy, Jolly, Giuffreda, Barranco & Jisa, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Justin Tolbert
Represented By
Summer Marie Barranco
Purdy, Jolly, Giuffreda, Barranco & Jisa, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexander Farrell
Represented By
Faudlin Pierre
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
36 36 3 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Mon 05/12 2:29 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM. Settlement Conference set for 12/2/2025 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 5/12/2025. See attached document for full details. (jas) Modified text to correct Judge on 5/12/2025 (mf)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/12 11:37 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting34 Joint Motion Requesting Settlement Conference. The Court will set the settlement conference by separate Order to take place on December 2, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 5/12/2025. (jb02)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 05/12 2:46 PM
Reset Hearing to correct Judge re: DE36 Order for Settlement Conference set for 12/2/2025 01:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe via ZOOM. (mf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
34 34 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/07 3:40 PM
Joint MOTION Conduct Settlement Conference re 33 Order,, Status Report Order, by Ric Bradshaw, Justin Tolbert, Andrew Cano, Garrett Bechtel. (Barranco, Summer)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
33 33 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Status Report Order Fri 05/02 12:53 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: This matter has been referred to the undersigned for a settlement conference 31 . By or before May 9, 2025, the parties shall file a joint motion setting forth three mutually agreed upon dates to conduct the settlement conference. Unless both parties agree otherwise, the settlement conference will be conducted via Zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 5/2/2025. (jb02)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
32 32 utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Thu 05/01 1:49 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe for settlement conference. (nrs)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Order on Motion for Appointment of Mediator Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/01 1:47 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting21 Joint Motion Requesting Settlement Conference. The Undersigned respectfully refers this matter for a settlement conference to U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe, who has graciously agreed to conduct a settlement conference in this case. The parties are hereby ORDERED to promptly contact the Chambers of Judge McCabe by telephone (561-803-3470) or by email (McCabe@flsd.uscourts.gov), so that Judge McCabe can schedule a date and time for the settlement conference to be held by Zoom Video Teleconference or other means as determined by Judge McCabe. The parties are directed to comply with all orders and instructions issued by Judge McCabe. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 5/1/2025. (nrs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
30 30 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/30 2:51 PM
ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: Jury Trial set for 4/27/2026 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Calendar Call set for 4/22/2026 01:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2025. Discovery due by 1/23/2026. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2025. In Limine Motions due by 2/2/2026. Dispositive Motions due by 2/2/2026. Motions due by 2/2/2026. Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/5/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 4/30/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/30 11:55 AM
NOTICE OF FILING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Alexander Farrell re 28 Order, (Pierre, Faudlin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 28, 2025
28 28 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 04/28 4:40 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Notice [DE 27] and shall specially set this case for trial starting April 27, 2026. The parties shall prepare a joint proposed scheduling order tied to the April 27, 2026 trial date. The parties shall file their joint proposed scheduling order on the docket and email a Word version to chambers at matthewman@flsd.uscourts.gov by May 2, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 4/28/2025. (nrs)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 3:57 PM
Joint NOTICE REGARDING SPECIAL SET TRIAL DATE by Alexander Farrell re 26 Order on Motion to Continue,,, Status Conference,, (Pierre, Faudlin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
26 26 minutes Status Conference Order on Motion to Continue Fri 04/25 10:50 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: granting 25 Joint ORAL Motion to Continue the Trial date; Status Conference held on 4/25/2025. The hearing was held via Zoom Video Teleconference. The Court discussed trial dates and pre-trial deadlines. Counsel will confer and file on the docket a Joint Notice of their trial availability on or before April 29, 2025. Written scheduling order will be issued. Total time in court: 14 minutes. Attorney Appearances: Faudlin Pierre, Summer Marie Barranco. (Digital 10:31:08) (swr)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Continue Fri 04/25 10:36 AM
JOINT ORAL MOTION to Continue the Trial Date by Alexander Farrell, Ric Bradshaw, Justin Tolbert, Andrew Cano, Garrett Bechtel. (swr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
utility ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/23 4:03 PM
Calendar call and Jury trial before prior presiding Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks terminated. (iar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
24 24 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 04/22 2:20 PM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 4/22/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order Setting Status Conference Tue 04/22 11:49 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: THIS CAUSE is now set before the Undersigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further purposes, including trial [DE 21; DE 22]. Being fully advised in the premises, the Court hereby ORDERS that a Status Conference shall be held on April 25, 2025, at 10:30 a.m., to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference (VTC). To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 540 3826 and Passcode: 246129. All participants at the hearing are expected to appear by both audio and video. Counsel for the parties shall confer prior to the hearing and be prepared to discuss: (1) proposed changes to the existing pretrial schedule; (2) an estimate of the time required for trial; (3) proposed trial dates; (4) the status of the current litigation; and (5) any other matters which need to be addressed by the parties or the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 4/22/2025. (nrs)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/22 11:42 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for allfurther proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks no longer assigned as presider/referral judge(s) in case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/22/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
21 21 motion Appoint Mediator Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/21 2:49 PM
Joint MOTION to Appoint Mediator ( Responses due by 5/5/2025.), Joint MOTION CONSENT FOR DISPOSITION BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MATTHEWMAN by Alexander Farrell. (Pierre, Faudlin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
20 20 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Wed 04/16 7:00 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Ric Bradshaw, Justin Tolbert, Andrew Cano, Garrett Bechtel (Barranco, Summer)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
19 19 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 04/07 11:06 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: (Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2025., Discovery due by 8/21/2025., Joinder of Parties due by 5/1/2025., In Limine Motions due by 9/4/2025., Dispositive Motions due by 9/4/2025., Motions due by 9/4/2025., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/6/2025.). Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 4/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Scheduling Conference + MINUTE ORDER (IMPORTANT! select w hrg(s) for AO CREDIT) Mon 04/07 10:42 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: The hearing was held via Zoom Video Teleconference. Scheduling Conference held on 4/7/2025. The Court discussed whether parties would be added, there are no motions pending, the trial period, pretrial deadlines, motions to continue, sealing of documents, consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction, mediation or settlement conferences, requirements if a settlement is reached, the local rules, discovery, and good faith conferral. Written scheduling order and order of referral to mediation will be issued. Total time in court: 27 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Summer Marie Barranco, Faudlin Pierre. (Digital Zoom Video Recording 10:01 am) (nrs)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
17 17 order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Mon 03/24 1:23 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2025 at 10:00 AM in the West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference (VTC). Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed two (2) business days prior to the Scheduling Conference. Motions to modify the trial date must specifically state the basis for the request, including detailed factual support, and must provide a compelling reason. The parties are further advised that the Court is strongly disinclined to modify the trial date based upon the scheduling "tracks" contained within the Local Rules and/or based upon vague references to the complexities of the case. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 540 3826 and Passcode: 246129. All counsel shall appear by both audio and video. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)'s conference report requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 3/24/2025. (nrs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 03/20 11:53 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE. ( Jury Trial set for 11/3/2025 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 10/29/2025 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/20/2025. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/17 1:55 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ric Bradshaw, Justin Tolbert, Andrew Cano, Garrett Bechtel. (Barranco, Summer)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 03/17 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Summer Marie Barranco on behalf of Ric Bradshaw, Justin Tolbert, Andrew Cano, Garrett Bechtel. Attorney Summer Marie Barranco added to party Ric Bradshaw(pty:dft), Attorney Summer Marie Barranco added to party Justin Tolbert(pty:dft), Attorney Summer Marie Barranco added to party Andrew Cano(pty:dft), Attorney Summer Marie Barranco added to party Garrett Bechtel(pty:dft). (Barranco, Summer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
13 13 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 03/04 1:09 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Alexander Farrell. Ric Bradshaw served on 2/24/2025, response/answer due 3/17/2025. (wce)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 03/04 1:08 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Alexander Farrell. Garrett Bechtel served on 2/24/2025, response/answer due 3/17/2025. (wce)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 03/04 1:08 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Alexander Farrell. Justin Tolbert served on 2/24/2025, response/answer due 3/17/2025. (wce)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 03/04 1:07 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Alexander Farrell. Andrew Cano served on 2/24/2025, response/answer due 3/17/2025. (wce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Compliance Wed 01/08 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Compliance: per Order at De7 , the Clerk has prepared a Packet for the US Marshall for Service in FTP. The Packet contains a Certified Copy of DE's1 ,3 ,5 ,6 , and8 . (wce)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 01/08 4:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Garrett Bechtel, Ric Bradshaw, Andrew Cano, and Justin Tolbert per DE7 . (wce) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/8/2025) (wce)
Related: [-]
7 7 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Appointment of Special Process Server Wed 01/08 3:58 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ORDERING SERVICE BY U.S. MARSHAL: Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (DE3 , DE5 ) are GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Direct Clerk to Issue Summonses and Appoint the US Marshal to Serve Process (DE6 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/8/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
6 6 motion Appointment of Special Process Server (e.g., US Marshal) Mon 12/30 3:48 PM
MOTION for Appointment of US Marshal as Special Process Server and to DIRECT CLERK TO ISSUE SUMMONSES by Alexander Farrell. Responses due by 1/13/2025. (Pierre, Faudlin)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 12/30 3:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexander Farrell. (Pierre, Faudlin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
4 4 order Clerk's Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES) Mon 11/04 4:40 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) will not be issued. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the summons attached upon motion being granted or payment of filing fee. (wce)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 11/04 4:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexander Farrell. (wce)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 11/04 4:35 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens Mon 11/04 3:47 PM
Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 405.00. IFP Filed, filed by Alexander Farrell.(Pierre, Faudlin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit