Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Benita Y Pearson
Case #: 5:24-cv-01926
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Terminated:Dec 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Hutchinson Sealing Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel N. Sharkey
Brooks, Wilkins, Sharkey & Turco
contact info
Plaintiff
Midlands Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Scott M. Zurakowski
Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty - Canton
contact info
Kallen L. Boyer
Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths, & Dougherty
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 13, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Termination Fri 12/13 1:45 PM
Marginal Order approving Plaintiff's10 Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 12/13/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 12/10 2:16 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Without Prejudice filed by Midlands Technologies, Inc.. (Zurakowski, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/09 4:51 PM
Marginal Order approving Defendant's Stipulation to Extend Deadline to answer Complaint. Defendant Hutchinson Sealing Systems, Inc. answer due 12/13/2024. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 12/9/2024. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Tue 12/03 4:24 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Hutchinson Sealing Systems, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Co. on 11/13/24, filed on behalf of Midlands Technologies, Inc. Related document(s)3 . (C,RD)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Return of Service Executed Tue 12/03 4:14 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Hutchinson Sealing Systems, Inc. c/o CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Services on 11/13/2024, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Midlands Technologies, Inc. Related document(s)3 . (C,RD)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
6 6 notice Stipulation (atty event) Mon 12/02 3:44 PM
Proposed Stipulation filed by Hutchinson Sealing Systems, Inc.. (Sharkey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 12/02 3:22 PM
Attorney Appearance by Daniel N. Sharkey filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Sharkey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Fri 11/22 11:23 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Hutchinson Sealing Systems, Inc. on 11/12/2024, filed on behalf of Midlands Technologies, Inc. Related document(s)3 . (C,RD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
oth_evt Service by Clerk Thu 11/07 8:19 AM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Hutchinson Sealing Systems, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Co. Related [+]; Hutchinson Sealing Systems, Inc. c/o CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Services and Hutchinson Sealing Systems, Inc., placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified Mail. (B,DL)
Related: [-] ceipt # 9414 7266 9904 2218 5197 13ceipt # 9414 7266 9904 2218 5197 20ceipt # 9414 7266 9904 2218 5197 06
Monday, November 04, 2024
3 3 oth_evt Summons Issued Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 11/04 4:13 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Hutchinson Sealing Systems, Inc. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 11/04 3:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Midlands Technologies, Inc.. (Zurakowski, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/04 3:35 PM
Complaint against Hutchinson Sealing Systems, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 405.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12815627. Filed by Midlands Technologies, Inc. (Zurakowski, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Contract Quote,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Invoice Accounting,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Midlands Iv. 32653,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Summons - Hutchinson,
Att: 6 Summons - Hutchinson c/o Corporation Service,
Att: 7 Summons - Hutchinson c/o CSC Lawyers
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 11/04 3:56 PM
Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 11/04 4:02 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (B,DL)
Related: [-]