WATSON v. BABCOCK et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Paradise Baxter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00306 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 04, 2024 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2024 |
Defendant
A. HULING
|
|
Defendant
C. BABCOCK
|
|
Defendant
CROSE
|
|
Defendant
D. MUNTZ
|
|
Defendant
DEAL
|
|
Defendant
GUARNIERI
|
|
Defendant
I. GUSTAFSON
|
|
Defendant
J. KURDICK
|
|
Defendant
J. RANKIN
|
|
Defendant
LAUREL HARRY
|
|
Defendant
M. BLICHA
|
|
Defendant
R. IRWIN
|
|
Defendant
RICHARDS
|
|
Defendant
SPRUTE
|
|
Defendant
YOUNG
|
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN WATSON
|
Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, this 1st day of April, 2025, that this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Stay, ECF No.6 , be DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation of the Chief United States Magistrate Judge issued on February 14, 2025, ECF No.7 , is adopted as the Opinion of this Court. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 4/1/2025. (snc) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay. It is respectfully recommended that the motion be denied and that this matter be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to this R&R are due by 2/28/2025; Objections to R&R from Unregistered ECF Users are due by 3/3/2025. A printed copy of this text entry and the accompanying R&R have been mailed this day to the Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on February 14, 2025. (jbh) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 02/14 4:03 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Susan Paradise Baxter, presiding, and Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. Motions referred to Richard A. Lanzillo. (dlh) |
||
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() MOTION to Stay re1 Lodged Complaint by BRIAN WATSON. (jkn) Modified text on 2/4/2025. (dlh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING due to filing deficiencies. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 12/19/2024. (dlh) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/26/2024. (dlh) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order to Vacate Document Order Lifting Stay
Tue 11/26 11:40 AM
Order Vacating 2 Order Staying Case. As it is unclear whether any defendants are Wellpath entities, the Order to Stay is premature and is hereby VACATED. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/26/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dlh) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order Staying Case
Wed 11/20 10:15 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE. On November 11, 2024, Wellpath Holdings, Inc., and related entities filed a petition for relief under Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas. See In re Wellpath Holdings, Inc., No. 24-90533 (Bankr. S.D. Tex.) Pursuant to Section 362(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, the petition operates as a stay on a on all proceedings against the debtor. See 11 U.S.C. 362(a). On November 12, 2024, the Bankruptcy Court amended the automatic stay and extended the stay to all lawsuits and all non-debtor defendants on an interim basis, pending a hearing scheduled before the Bankruptcy Court on December 5, 2024. In re Wellpath Holdings, Inc. No. 24-90533 ECF No. 68. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is temporarily STAYED and all scheduled proceedings and deadlines are hereby continued and suspended pending further order of this Court. The Court understands that many litigants, particularly those proceeding pro se, may have questions about this Order. To avoid overwhelming the Court, parties are encouraged to refrain from filing motions seeking additional information. The parties will be notified of relevant developments in the Bankruptcy proceedings, including any lifting or modification of the automatic stay that allow this Court to proceed with this case. A printed copy of this Order has been mailed to the Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on November 20, 2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jbh) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Remark: Complaint lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (jkn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |