California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:24-bk-12827
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Dismissed:Nov 19, 2024
Terminated:May 06, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
The CookQueen LLC, Soulfull Seafood, Roots Fruits, N Herbs
4712 E 2nd St PMB 133
Long Beach, CA 90803-5309
Represented By
Damian J Nassiri
Cannabis Law Group
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
31 31 court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 05/06 4:03 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing the above referenced bankruptcy case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, the bond is exonerated, and this case is therefore closed. (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
30 30 trustee Ch 11 Subch V Trustee's Rpt of No Distribution C-case dism or conv, fee award not recd Thu 12/26 2:40 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee's Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 2 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $0.00, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Trustee Arturo Cisneros (TR). (Cisneros (TR), Arturo)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 22, 2024
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 12/22 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Friday, December 20, 2024
28 28 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Fri 12/20 9:50 AM
Order Denying Debtors' Motion to Vacate Dismissal (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/20/2024 (AM)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, December 13, 2024
27 27 audio Audio File Fri 12/13 4:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [12/11/2024 10:17:43 AM]. File Size [ 3411 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:28 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 12/13 8:37 AM
Notice of lodgment of Order in Bankruptcy Case Re: Debtors' Motion to Vacate Dismissal with proof of service Filed by Creditor Main St. Kitchens, LLC Related [+]. (Lieberman, Marc)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Vacate Dismissal Filed by Debtor The CookQueen LLC, Soulfull Seafood, Roots Fruits, N Herbs (GD)
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
25 25 court Hearing Held (Motion) Wed 12/11 12:28 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] Motion is denied (GD)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to vacate dismissal filed by Debtor The CookQueen LLC, Soulfull Seafood, Roots Fruits, N Herbs
24 24 court Hearing Held (Motion) Wed 12/11 12:27 PM
Hearing Held Re:13 United States Trustee To Dismiss Case Or Convert Case To One Under Chapter 7 Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b) - Off Calendar - Case Dismissed - Order Of Dismissal For Failure To File Schedules, Statements And/Or Plan Entered 11-19-24 - See doc #17 (GD)
Related: [-]
23 23 court Hearing Held (Other) Wed 12/11 12:24 PM
Hearing Held Re:1 Status Conference Re: Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual - Off Calendar - Case Dismissed - Order Of Dismissal For Failure To File Schedules, Statements And/Or Plan Entered 11-19-24 - See Doc #17 (GD)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 23, 2024
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 11/23 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, November 21, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 11/21 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 32. Notice Date 11/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 ORDER and notice of dismissal for failure to file schedules, statements, and/or plan (Option A or Option B) (BNC)
20 20 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Thu 11/21 12:36 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 12/11/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to vacate dismissal filed by Debtor The CookQueen LLC, Soulfull Seafood, Roots Fruits, N Herbs
19 19 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 11/21 12:26 PM
Order Setting Hearing On Motion To Vacatee Dismissal - Hearing WIll Be Held On December 11, 2024 at 10:00 a.m., Rm 5B via ZoomGov (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/21/2024 (GD)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
18 18 motion Vacate dismissal (motion) Wed 11/20 1:42 PM
Motion to Vacate Dismissal Filed by Debtor The CookQueen LLC, Soulfull Seafood, Roots Fruits, N Herbs (GD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
17 17 order Dism for failure to file sched, stat or plan (Order/Notice) (Option A or Option B) (BNC) Tue 11/19 3:20 PM
ORDER and notice of dismissal for failure to file schedules, statements, and/or plan - Debtor Dismissed. All pending motions and adversary proceedings are moot and dismissed. (BNC) Signed on 11/19/2024 Related [+]. (HC)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor The CookQueen LLC, Soulfull Seafood, Roots Fruits, N Herbs,4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships under Subchapter V) (309F2),13 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA)
Friday, November 15, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 11/15 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 32. Notice Date 11/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
15 15 misc Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF) Wed 11/13 12:58 PM
Notice to creditors Re: Notice Of Motion And Motion By United States Trustee To Dismiss Case Or Convert Case To One Under Chapter 7 Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b); Declarations Of Michael Hauser And Michele Steele In Support Thereof (BNC-PDF) (GD)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 11/13 12:54 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 12/11/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD)
Related: [-] 13 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA)
13 13 motion U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert (motion) Wed 11/13 11:40 AM
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert Notice Of Motion And Motion By United States Trustee To Dismiss Case Or Convert Case To One Under Chapter 7 Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §1112(b); Declarations Of Michael Hauser And Michele Steele In Support Thereof Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA). (Hauser, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 11/08 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, November 07, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 11/07 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 32. Notice Date 11/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships under Subchapter V) (309F2)
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 11/06 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor The CookQueen LLC, Soulfull Seafood, Roots Fruits, N Herbs
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 11/06 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor The CookQueen LLC, Soulfull Seafood, Roots Fruits, N Herbs
8 8 court Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 11/06 4:35 PM
Hearing Set Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/11/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor The CookQueen LLC, Soulfull Seafood, Roots Fruits, N Herbs
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 11/06 4:33 PM
Order Setting Scheduling And Case Management Conference In SubChapter V Case - Hearing To Be Held On December 11, 2024 at 10:00 a.m., Rm 5B Via ZoomGov, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Ronald Reagan Federal Building; 411 W. Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/6/2024 (GD)
Related: [-] doc
6 6 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 11/06 9:00 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Cisneros, Arturo. (Cisneros, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships under Subchapter V) (309F2) Tue 11/05 3:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/3/2024 at 10:00 AM at UST-SA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-919-3126, PARTICIPANT CODE:3803126. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 2/3/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 1/13/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/5/2025. (JL)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs trustee Notice Appointing Trustee Tue 11/05 1:40 PM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee and Acceptance of Subchapter V Trustee . Arturo Cisneros (TR) added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA). (Hauser, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
5 5 court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 11/05 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by TN. Receipt Number 81000715. (admin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 11/05 11:07 AM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by TN. Receipt Number 81000715. (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 11/04 2:40 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by The CookQueen LLC, Soulfull Seafood, Roots Fruits, N Herbs List of Equity Security Holders due 11/18/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 11/18/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 11/18/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 11/18/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 11/18/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 11/18/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 11/18/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 11/18/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 11/18/2024. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 11/18/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 11/18/2024. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 11/18/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 11/18/2024. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 11/18/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 11/18/2024. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 2/3/2025. (VN) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2024 (VN)
Related: [-]