California Central District Court
Judge:Hernan D Vera
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:24-cv-09526
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause28:7402 Refund of Taxes
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 1:52 AM PDT
Defendant
United States Internal Revenue Service
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Robert Charles Bombard
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Bradley Beckerman
Represented By
William L Abrams
Abrams Garfinkel Margolis Bergson, LLP
contact info
John J. Accursio
Abrams Garfinkel Margolis Bergson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Chase Beckerman
Represented By
William L Abrams
Abrams Garfinkel Margolis Bergson, LLP
contact info
John J. Accursio
Abrams Garfinkel Margolis Bergson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, February 03, 2025
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 02/03 5:49 PM
*CORRECTED* TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera :The Court has received and reviewed the parties' Notice of Settlement [ 19]. Based on this submission, all hearing dates and deadlines are vacated, and the case is dismissed. The Court will retain jurisdiction for 90 days to reopen the case if the settlement is not finalized before then. [JS-6] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm)
Related: [-]
20 20 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 02/03 5:46 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: he Court has received and reviewed the parties' Notice of Settlement19 . Based on this submission, all hearing dates and deadlines are vacated, and the case is dismissed. The Court will retain jurisdiction for 60 days to reopen the case if the settlement is not finalized before then. [JS-6] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Settlement Mon 02/03 8:53 AM
NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Motion to Stay Remaining Deadlines filed by Defendant United States of America. (Bombard, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
18 18 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 01/22 1:25 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (wm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
17 17 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 01/21 7:49 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (wm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 01/09 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Hernan D. Vera for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-09526-HDV (RAOx). (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 12/27 10:43 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by defendant United States of America.(Attorney Robert Charles Bombard added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Bombard, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
14 14 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Wed 12/18 11:30 AM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
13 13 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/12 10:17 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: granting11 Non-Resident Attorney JOHN J. ACCURSIO'S EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bradley Beckerman, Chase Beckerman, designating WILLIAM L. ABRAMS as local counsel. (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
12 12 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 11/12 10:00 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney JOHN J. ACCURSIO to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bradley Beckerman, Chase Beckerman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38546207)11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment (see document for further details). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 11/07 3:16 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney JOHN J. ACCURSIO to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bradley Beckerman, Chase Beckerman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38546207) filed by PLAINTIFF Bradley Beckerman, Chase Beckerman. (Abrams, William)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Thu 11/07 10:44 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bradley Beckerman, Chase Beckerman, upon Defendant United States Internal Revenue Service served on 11/7/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; United States of America served on 11/7/2024, answer due 1/6/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Abrams, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 11/06 8:56 AM
MINUTE (In Chambers) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar under the Civil Consent Pilot Project. The parties are reminded to review the time requirements for consent set forth in the Notice to Counsel that was issued at the time of the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff is instructed to forthwith serve a copy of this Order on all parties that have already been served with the summons and complaint, or to serve all parties with a copy of this Order at the time of service of the summons and complaint. (hr)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 11/05 12:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Bradley Beckerman, Chase Beckerman, (Abrams, William)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 11/05 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 11/05 11:39 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John J Accursio. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 11/05 11:38 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants United States Internal Revenue Service, United States of America. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Tue 11/05 11:32 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Monday, November 04, 2024
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 11/04 3:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Bradley Beckerman, Chase Beckerman. (Abrams, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 11/04 3:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Bradley Beckerman, Chase Beckerman. (Abrams, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 11/04 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38521742 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Bradley Beckerman, Chase Beckerman. (Attorney William L Abrams added to party Bradley Beckerman(pty:pla), Attorney William L Abrams added to party Chase Beckerman(pty:pla))(Abrams, William)
Related: [-]