New York Southern District Court
Judge:Alvin K Hellerstein
Case #: 1:24-cv-08401
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 5:15 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Biote Management, LLC
Represented By
William Andrew Brewer, III
Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors
contact info
Claiborne Roberson Hane
Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors
contact info
Counter Claimant
Dr. Gary S. Donovitz
Represented By
William Andrew Brewer, III
Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors
contact info
Claiborne Roberson Hane
Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors
contact info
Counter Defendant
B. Riley Securities, Inc.
Represented By
Emily Anna Hayes
B. Riley Financial, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Biote Management, LLC
Represented By
William Andrew Brewer, III
Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors
contact info
Claiborne Roberson Hane
Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Gary S. Donovitz
Represented By
William Andrew Brewer, III
Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors
contact info
Claiborne Roberson Hane
Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors
contact info
Plaintiff
B. Riley Securities, Inc.
Represented By
Emily Anna Hayes
B. Riley Financial, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Counterclaim Tue 04/15 10:32 AM
ANSWER to23 Amended Counterclaim,. Document filed by B. Riley Securities, Inc...(Hayes, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
23 23 cmp Amended Counterclaim Thu 04/03 11:51 PM
FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM amending10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim against B. Riley Securities, Inc..Document filed by Biote Management, LLC, Gary S. Donovitz. Related document:10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim..(Brewer, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
22 22 order Case Management Plan Mon 03/24 3:40 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 4/3/2025. Deposition due by 11/21/2025. Discovery due by 12/19/2025. Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2026 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/21/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/21 10:48 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/21/2025, ( Status Conference set for 2/6/2026 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Jones, Brigitte)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
21 21 order Protective Order Wed 03/19 1:59 PM
STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/19/2025) (ar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
20 20 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 03/18 10:16 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Biote Management, LLC, Gary S. Donovitz..(Hane, Claiborne)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Tue 03/18 10:15 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Biote Management, LLC, Gary S. Donovitz..(Hane, Claiborne)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
18 18 order Scheduling Order Mon 02/03 3:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for a status conference on March 21, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 646-453-4442 Conference ID: 763 345 915# To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 10 minutes prior to the start of the conference. Finally, no later than March 18, 2025, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/3/2025) Status Conference set for 3/21/2025 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (ar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Counterclaim Tue 12/03 5:32 PM
ANSWER to11 Counterclaim. Document filed by B. Riley Securities, Inc...(Hayes, Emily)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Counterclaim Tue 12/03 5:30 PM
ANSWER to10 Counterclaim. Document filed by B. Riley Securities, Inc...(Hayes, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
15 15 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/12 5:15 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent B. Riley Financial, Inc. for B. Riley Securities, Inc., B. Riley Securities, Inc., B. Riley Securities, Inc.. Document filed by B. Riley Securities, Inc...(Hayes, Emily)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/12 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Anna Hayes on behalf of B. Riley Securities, Inc...(Hayes, Emily)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/12 11:08 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Biote Management, LLC..(Brewer, William)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/12 11:06 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gary S. Donovitz..(Brewer, William)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/12 9:04 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney William Andrew Brewer to RE-FILE Document Nos. 9 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and 8 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. These filings are deficient for the following reason(s): The Attorney who signed the PDF is not the Attorney who electronically filed the Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statements;. Re-file these documents using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 11/11 11:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against B. Riley Securities, Inc.. Document filed by Gary S. Donovitz..(Brewer, William)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 11/11 11:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against B. Riley Securities, Inc.. Document filed by Biote Management, LLC..(Brewer, William)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/11 11:07 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gary S. Donovitz..(Brewer, William)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/11 11:06 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Biote Management, LLC..(Brewer, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/08 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Andrew Brewer, III on behalf of Gary S. Donovitz, Biote Management, LLC..(Brewer, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/08 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claiborne Roberson Hane on behalf of Gary S. Donovitz, Biote Management, LLC..(Hane, Claiborne)
Related: [-]
5 5 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 11/08 9:59 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Document filed by Gary S. Donovitz..(Brewer, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
4 4 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 11/07 9:53 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 5 Answer) - ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Document filed by Biote Management, LLC. (Brewer, William) Modified on 11/8/2024 (db)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Removal Wed 11/06 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME COURT OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK, County of NEW YORK. Case Number: 654401/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-30149738).Document filed by Biote Management, LLC..(Brewer, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Affirmation of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 11/06 4:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brewer, William)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 11/06 11:44 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William Andrew Brewer, III. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DR. GARY S. DONOVITZ, AS TRUSTEE OF THE GARY S. DONOVITZ 2012 IRREVOCABLE TRUST, BIOTE MANAGEMENT, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Wed 11/06 11:45 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney William Andrew Brewer, III. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 11/06 11:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney William Andrew Brewer, III to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3, Notice of Removal exhibits must be filed as attachments and labeled. Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc.". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 11/06 11:53 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 11/06 11:56 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 11/06 11:56 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 11/04 5:29 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME COURT OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK, County of NEW YORK. Case Number: 654401/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30139949).Document filed by BIOTE MANAGEMENT, LLC..(Brewer, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D