California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:M Elaine Hammond
Case #: 5:24-bk-51678
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Creditor Meeting:May 23, 2025
Claims Deadline:May 09, 2025
Converted:Feb 28, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Precision Swiss Products, Inc
1911 Tarob Ct
Milpitas, CA 95035-7114
Represented By
Chris D. Kuhner
Kornfield Nyberg Bendes Kuhner & Little
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
David M. Bluhm
Creditor Committee
Visio Investment Group, LLC
1951 Avenida Joaquin
Encinitas, CA 92024
Responsible Ind
Norbert Kozar
Chief Executive Officer 1911 Tarob Court
Milpitas, CA 95035
Trustee
Kari Bowyer
P.O. Box 700096
San Jose, CA 95170
Represented By
Brent D. Meyer
Meyer Law Group, LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113
Represented By
Jay K Chien
Doj-Ust
contact info
Mike Chow
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:52 AM PDT
Monday, November 04, 2024
crditcrd none Mon 11/04 3:58 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-51678 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A33510690, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
1 1 32 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 11/04 3:56 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Fee Amount $1738, Filed by Precision Swiss Products, Inc. Application to Employ Counsel by Debtor due by 12/4/2024. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 11/12/2024.Incomplete Filings due by 11/18/2024. (Kuhner, Chris)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Mon 11/04 4:15 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/3/2024 at 10:00 AM via UST Teleconference, Call in number/URL: 1-877-991-8832 Passcode: 4101242. Proofs of Claims due by 3/3/2025. (Kuhner, Chris)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 11/04 5:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mike Chow. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ (Chow, Mike)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pay Mon 11/04 5:41 PM
Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll Filed by Debtor Precision Swiss Products, Inc (Kuhner, Chris)
Related: [-]
5 5 7 pgs motion Use Cash Collateral Mon 11/04 5:43 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Precision Swiss Products, Inc (Kuhner, Chris)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/04 5:47 PM
Motion for Approval of Post-Petitioning Financing Filed by Debtor Precision Swiss Products, Inc (Kuhner, Chris)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/04 5:50 PM
Motion to Approve Overbid and Auction Procedures and Breakup Fees and Expense Reimbursement Filed by Debtor Precision Swiss Products, Inc (Kuhner, Chris)
Related: [-]
8 8 9 pgs misc Declaration Mon 11/04 6:14 PM
Declaration of Norbert Kozar in Support of First Day Motions and Related Relief Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Precision Swiss Products, Inc (Kuhner, Chris)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Pay,5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral,6 Motion Miscellaneous Relief,7 Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Att: 1 Exhibits A-H