Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Melissa Damian
Case #: 0:24-cv-62080
Nature of Suit560 Prisoner Petitions - Civil Detainee - Conditions of Confinement
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 05, 2024 10:08 PM EST
Petitioner
Jamell Demons
Represented By
Michael A. Pizzi
Michael A Pizzi, Jr., P.A.
contact info
Respondent
Broward County Sheriff Office
Represented By
Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
contact info
Respondent
Sheriff Tony Gregory
Represented By
Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
34 34 1 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Mon 03/10 4:20 PM
Order Cancelling Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/13/2025 at 9:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 3/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
33 33 trial Witness List Thu 03/06 9:55 AM
Witness List by Jamell Demons.. (Pizzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/20 9:21 AM
NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING by Tony Gregory, Broward County Sheriff Office (Hayes, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
31 31 minutes Status Conference Wed 02/19 3:46 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melissa Damian: Status Conference held on 2/19/2025. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 51 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Colin Tillinghast Hayes, Michael A. Pizzi, and Christian Tsoubanos. Court Reporter: Glenda Powers, 305-523-5022 / Glenda_Powers@flsd.uscourts.gov. Order to follow. (pg00)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
30 30 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/10 4:24 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time 1 business day extension of time to file brief re24 Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel, BSO Response to filed by Tony Gregory, Broward County Sheriff Office. Replies due by 2/18/2025.(Hayes, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, February 03, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 02/04 9:11 AM
ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF ECF NO.27 . Petitioner shall the brief no later than February 3, 2025. Respondents shall file a response no later than February 10, 2025. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 2/3/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
28 28 13 pgs misc Memorandum Mon 02/03 11:37 PM
MEMORANDUM of Law re24 Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel, PETITIONERS MEMORANDUM OF LAW ADDRESSING ISSUES RAISED AT STATUS CONFERENCE by Jamell Demons. (Pizzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
27 27 motion Extension of Time Thu 01/30 3:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time 1 business day extension of time to file brief re24 Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel, by Jamell Demons. Responses due by 2/13/2025.(Pizzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/30 12:35 PM
NOTICE OF CORRESPONDENCE RECEIVED BY THE COURT AS TO JAMELL DEMONS At 11:27 AM today, the Court received the following email from rittenliam@gmail.com. See attached document for full details. (pg00)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
25 25 order Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued Tue 01/21 11:24 AM
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum as to Jamell Demons. Hearing set for 2/19/2025 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Melissa Damian. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 1/21/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel Tue 01/21 10:48 AM
Order Following Status Conference denying without prejudice15 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Responses due by 2/7/2025. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/13/2025 09:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Melissa Damian. Hearing set for 2/19/2025 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Melissa Damian. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 1/21/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
23 23 minutes Status Conference Fri 01/17 12:36 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melissa Damian: Status Conference held on 1/17/2025. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 12 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Colin Tillinghast Hayes, Christian Tsoubanos, and Michael A. Pizzi. Court Reporter: Shamelle (Shelly) Kelley, 305-523-5637 / Shamelle_Kelley@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pg00)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
22 22 respm Response/Reply (Other) Thu 01/02 11:21 PM
REPLY to16 Response/Reply (Other),, PETITIONER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HABEAS CORPUS PETITION by Jamell Demons. (Pizzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Thu 01/02 4:15 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. THIS CAUSE is before the Court on Petitioner, Jamell M. Demons', Motion for Permission to Increase Page Limit on Reply Brief, filed January 2, 2025 [ECF No. 20 (the "Motion")]. THE COURT has considered the Motion and is otherwise fully advised in the premises. Petitioner seeks a 5-page enlargement of the page limit for a Reply Brief. Although Respondents did not state their position on the Motion, the Court notes that Respondents previously received an enlargement of ten pages for their Response brief to which Petitioner's Reply responds. [ECF No. 12]. Therefore, finding good cause for the requested relief, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion [ECF No. 20] is GRANTED. Petitioner's Reply Brief shall not exceed fifteen pages. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 1/2/2025. (pg00)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion File Excess Pages Thu 01/02 1:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jamell Demons. (Pizzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 12/19 3:21 PM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time ECF No.17 . Petitioner shall file a Reply in support of the Habeas Petition no later than January 2, 2025. Replies due by 1/2/2025. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 12/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/18 3:39 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel CHRISTIAN TSOUBANOS AND OFFICE OF GENERAL COUNSEL FOR BROWARD COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE AND TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF CORRESPONDENCE filed by Broward County Sheriff Office, Tony Gregory. Replies due by 12/26/2024. (Hayes, Colin)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 12/18 1:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to16 Response/Reply (Other),, by Jamell Demons. (Pizzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
16 16 31 pgs respm Response/Reply (Other) Fri 12/13 1:56 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition (Complaint) RE: Government Agency for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Broward County Sheriff Office, Tony Gregory.(Hayes, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 115 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 49 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 27 pgs Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 7 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 26 pgs Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 130 pgs Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Affidavit Records Custodian
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
15 15 motion Disqualify Counsel Wed 12/11 11:32 PM
MOTION to Disqualify Counsel CHRISTIAN TSOUBANOS AND OFFICE OF GENERAL COUNSEL FOR BROWARD COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE AND TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF CORRESPONDENCE by Jamell Demons. Responses due by 12/26/2024. (Pizzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 12/04 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christian Tsoubanos on behalf of Broward County Sheriff Office, Tony Gregory. Attorney Christian Tsoubanos added to party Broward County Sheriff Office(pty:res), Attorney Christian Tsoubanos added to party Tony Gregory(pty:res). (Tsoubanos, Christian)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued Wed 12/04 10:45 AM
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Jamell Demons. Status Conference set for 1/17/2025 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Melissa Damian. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 12/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 12/03 4:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ECF NO.11 AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Responses due by 12/16/2024. Status Conference set for 1/17/2025 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Melissa Damian. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 12/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 11/27 1:28 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to7 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause by Broward County Sheriff Office, Tony Gregory.(Hayes, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 25, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 11/25 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Colin Tillinghast Hayes on behalf of Broward County Sheriff Office, Tony Gregory. Attorney Colin Tillinghast Hayes added to party Broward County Sheriff Office(pty:res), Attorney Colin Tillinghast Hayes added to party Tony Gregory(pty:res). (Hayes, Colin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 11/21 3:31 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Petition (Complaint) RE: Government Agency with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jamell Demons. Broward County Sheriff Office served on 11/13/2024, response/answer due 12/4/2024. (Pizzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 11/21 3:29 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Petition (Complaint) RE: Government Agency with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jamell Demons. Tony Gregory served on 11/13/2024, response/answer due 12/4/2024. (Pizzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Show Cause Mon 11/18 3:10 PM
ORDER to Show Cause granting6 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 12/6/2024. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 11/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
6 6 motion Show Cause Fri 11/15 4:21 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause WHY PETITIONER SHOULD NOT BE RELEASED by Jamell Demons. (Pizzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 11/08 11:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Broward County Sheriff Office, Tony Gregory. (pc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 11/08 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) against Gregory Tony by Jamell Demons (Pizzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 11/08 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) against Broward Sheriff's Office (BSO) by Jamell Demons (Pizzi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
2 2 order Judge Assignment Mon 11/04 10:48 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian (ar24)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 02, 2024
1 1 12 pgs PETITION (Complaint) Writ of Habeas Corpus RE: Government Agency . Filing fee $ 52.00 receipt number BFLSDC-17955280, filed by Jamell Demons.(Pizzi, Michael)
Related: [-]