Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Referred: Christopher C Bly
Case #: 1:24-cv-05021
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 et seq. Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 5:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Expeditors International of Washington
Represented By
Kimberly Ohanuka
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Dionysia L. Johnson-Massie
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Diondre Cobb
31909 2nd Lane SW #D204
Federal Way, WA 98023


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/19 5:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION for Judicial Notice of Public Court Records filed by Expeditors International of Washington. (Johnson-Massie, Dionysia)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/07 8:31 AM
MOTION for Judicial Notice of Public Court Records by Diondre Cobb.(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support
23 23 respm Reply Brief Wed 05/07 8:30 AM
REPLY BRIEF in Support re17 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Diondre Cobb. (ane)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/06 2:34 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Untimely Reply in Support of His Motion to Strike Defendant's Reply Brief for Consideration filed by Diondre Cobb.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/30 4:40 PM
Submission of17 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
21 21 motion To Exclude Tue 04/15 4:57 PM
MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Untimely Reply in Support of His Motion to Strike Defendant's Reply Brief for Consideration with Brief In Support by Expeditors International of Washington. (Johnson-Massie, Dionysia)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/15 4:51 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Expeditors International of Washington. (Johnson-Massie, Dionysia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/02 10:39 AM
Submission of14 MOTION to Strike13 Reply Brief to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Filing Thu 04/03 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Filing Declaration in Support by Diondre Cobb(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
18 18 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 04/03 8:42 AM
Plaintiff's Reply in Support of14 MOTION to Strike filed by Diondre Cobb. (ajw)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Leave to File Document Thu 04/03 8:41 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Diondre Cobb.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/12 1:38 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Strike13 Reply Brief, filed by Expeditors International of Washington. (Johnson-Massie, Dionysia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
15 15 discov Certificate of Service Thu 02/27 4:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re13 Reply Brief, Amended Certificate of Service by Expeditors International of Washington.(Johnson-Massie, Dionysia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
14 14 motion Strike Thu 02/27 12:37 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike13 Reply Brief and Improperly Introduced Evidence. by Diondre Cobb.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in support
Saturday, February 15, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Sat 02/15 5:51 PM
Submission of8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
13 13 respm Reply Brief Thu 02/13 11:50 PM
REPLY BRIEF re8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Under 12(B)(6) filed by Expeditors International of Washington.(Johnson-Massie, Dionysia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
12 12 service Certificate of Service Thu 01/30 4:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Diondre Cobb (ajw)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Change of Pro Se Address Thu 01/30 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Diondre Cobb (ajw)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate of Service Thu 01/30 9:55 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Diondre Cobb (ajw)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/30 9:54 AM
Plaintiff's RESPONSE in Opposition re8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by Diondre Cobb.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in support,
Att: 2 Affidavit
Monday, January 13, 2025
8 8 motion Dismiss Mon 01/13 2:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Expeditors International of Washington.(Johnson-Massie, Dionysia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination
Thursday, December 19, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 12/19 5:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Expeditors International of Washington. Expeditors International of Washington waiver mailed on 11/14/2024, answer due 1/13/2025. (Johnson-Massie, Dionysia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
6 6 service Request for Waiver of Service Thu 11/14 9:52 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service (2 Notices of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, 2 Waiver of Service of Summons forms, 1 copy of the Complaint, 1 copy of the Service Order, 1 Copy of the Initial Disclosures form and 1 Self-Addressed Stamped Envelope) mailed to Expeditors International of Washington on 11/14/2024. If waiver not returned by 12/19/2024, prepare personal service package. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
5 5 utility Remark Thu 11/14 9:31 AM
Received USM 285 form and proposed summons as to defendant Expeditors International of Washington. (ajw)
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 11/13 3:58 PM
Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Diondre Cobb.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
3 3 cmp Complaint Tue 11/05 9:31 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Diondre Cobb.(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 4 pgs order Order ruling on IFP ~Util - Allowing Case to Proceed ~Util - Directing Service by Clerk Tue 11/05 9:28 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, (Doc.1 ), is GRANTED. This action shall go forward as any other civil case, and Plaintiff is allowed to proceed without prepayment of a filing fee. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form, and to return to the Clerk of Court one of each for each Defendant named in the complaint within 21 days from the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned if Plaintiff fails to comply. Upon receipt of the forms by the Clerk, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a service waiver package for each Defendant. In the event that any Defendant does not return the Waiver of Service form to the Clerk of Court within 35 days following the date the service waiver package was mailed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshal's Service a service package for that Defendant. Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve upon each Defendant or counsel for Defendant, via hand-delivery or first-class mail, a copy of every further pleading, motion, or other document that Plaintiff submits to the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff is also ORDERED to keep the Court and Defendant advised of Plaintiff's current address and telephone number at all times during the pendency of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/4/2024. (tcc)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Forms Sent Tue 11/05 9:29 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Diondre Cobb re2 Order ruling on IFP. Forms sent to party: USM 285; Summons; Initial Disclosures. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 11/04 12:13 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 11/04 12:06 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Diondre Cobb.(cpp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet