Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-20340
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 05, 2024 2:19 AM EST
Defendant
Alexis Leonardo (1)
Represented By
Stephen Thomas Millan
contact info
Thomas William Risavy
Law Office Of Thomas Risavy
contact info
Maria del Carmen Calzon
Maria Del Carmen Calzon
contact info
Defendant
Sebastian Mercado (2)
Represented By
Stephen Thomas Millan
contact info
Juan Diego Berrio
Berrio & Berrio PA
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Elizabeth Hannah
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/05/2024 2:27 AM EST
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
1 1 MOTION TO SEAL by USA as to Alexis Leonardo, Sebastian Mercado. (at)
Related: [-]
2 2 SEALED ORDER granting1 Motion TO SEAL as to Alexis Leonardo (1), Sebastian Mercado (2). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/7/2024). (See attached document for full details). (at)
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT as to Alexis Leonardo (1) count(s) 1, 2-4, Sebastian Mercado (2) count(s) 1, 2, 4. FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS. (at) (at).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/8/2024) Restricted Unredacted Indictment