Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Timothy W Dore
Case #: 2:24-bk-12811
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Dec 09, 2024

Debtor
Pacific Northwest Theatre Associates Acquisition Corporation
18706 85th Ave SE
Snohomish, WA 98296-8017
Represented By
Brett L Wittner
Morton Mcgoldrick, P.S.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Ronald G. Brown
Ronald G. Brown, Chapter 7 Trustee P.O. Box 2369
Kirkland, WA 98083
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101


Docket last updated: 11/05/2024 12:01 AM PST
Monday, November 04, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 11/04 9:32 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition ( 24-12811 [misc,1028] ( 338.00). Receipt number A28571445. Fee amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Creditors Uploaded Mon 11/04 9:31 AM
Creditor matrix uploaded/added 147 creditor(s). (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (OTC) Mon 11/04 9:30 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Non-Individual . Schedule A/B due 11/19/2024. Schedule D due 11/19/2024. Schedule E/F due 11/19/2024. Schedule G due 11/19/2024. Schedule H due 11/19/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/19/2024. Summary of schedules due 11/19/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 11/19/2024. Filed by Brett L Wittner on behalf of Pacific Northwest Theatre Associates Acquisition Corporation (Wittner, Brett)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAWBApi Meeting of Creditors-Business Chapter 7 - No Asset Mon 11/04 9:40 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Brown, Ronald G. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/9/2024 at 09:00 AM via 341 Zoom Brown: Meeting ID 461 609 6703, Passcode 3660254164, Phone 1-425-332-5845. (Wittner, Brett)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc Notice of Deficient Filing Mon 11/04 10:09 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing . (VAB)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs court 341 Notice Prepare Mon 11/04 10:10 AM
341 Meeting of Creditors Notice Sent to BNC for Mailing . (VAB)
Related: [-]