Original Case: 8:19-cv-01236

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-usc-13581
Typeu.s. civil / u.s. plaintiff
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 1:57 PM EDT
SERVICE
Represented By
Michael Hugh McGinley
Dechert, LLP
contact info
Steven Andrew Engel
Dechert, LLP
contact info
Steven F. Grover
Steven F. Grover, PA
contact info
Jacklyn DeMar
Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund
contact info
Jeffrey Carter Anderson
Bush Ross, PA
contact info
Jonathan Kroner
Jonathan Kroner Law Office
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino, PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae
EDWIN MEESE, III
Represented By
Amit Ramnik Vora
Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
BRIAN BUTLER
Represented By
Glenn Edward Chappell
Tycko & Zavareei, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
ROBERT FARLEY
Represented By
Glenn Edward Chappell
Tycko & Zavareei, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
MANUEL FUENTES
Represented By
Glenn Edward Chappell
Tycko & Zavareei, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CHARLES E. GRASSLEY
Represented By
Michael J. Ronickher
Whistleblower Partners, LLP
contact info
Max Voldman
Whistleblower Partners, LLP
contact info
Eric R. Havian
Whistleblower Partners, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
JARED LUCKY
Represented By
Jared Lucky
Edelson PC
contact info
Amicus Curiae
JAMES PFANDER
Represented By
Jared Lucky
Edelson PC
contact info
Amicus Curiae
DIEGO ZAMBRANO
Represented By
Jared Lucky
Edelson PC
contact info
Amicus Curiae
PACIFIC LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By
Sean J. Radomski
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Harold D. Holder III
Bush Ross, PA
contact info
Jeffrey Carter Andersen
Bush Ross, PA
contact info
Michael Hugh McGinley
Dechert, LLP
contact info
Steven Engel
Dechert, LLP
contact info
Brian Kulp
Dechert, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
BRENT BERRY
Represented By
Glenn Edward Chappell
Tycko & Zavareei, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
MICHAEL B. MUKASEY
Represented By
Amit Ramnik Vora
Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STEVEN CALABRESI
Represented By
Amit Ramnik Vora
Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
GARY LAWSON
Represented By
Amit Ramnik Vora
Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
LANDMARK LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By
Amit Ramnik Vora
Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By
Cory L. Andrews
Washington Legal Foundation
contact info
Amicus Curiae
THE PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND MANUFACTURERS OF AMERICA
Represented By
Kwaku A. Akowuah
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS
Represented By
Kwaku A. Akowuah
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RESPONSIBILITY
Represented By
Steven Paul Lehotsky
Lehotsky Keller Cohn, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
BEVERLY MARCUS
Represented By
Glenn Edward Chappell
Tycko & Zavareei, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER
Represented By
Brianne Jenna Gorod
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus Curiae
PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Represented By
Allison M. Zieve
Public Citizen Litigation Group
contact info
Scott Lawrence Nelson
Public Citizen Litigation Group
contact info
Amicus Curiae
RANDY BECK
Represented By
Daniel Woofter
Russell & Woofter, LLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae
ANTI-FRAUD COALITION
Represented By
Claire Marie Sylvia
Phillips & Cohen, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE
Represented By
Matthew Wessler
Gupta Wessler, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
THE LEUKEMIA & LYMPHOMA SOCIETY
Represented By
Catherine Dorsey
Baron & Budd, PC
contact info
Amicus Curiae
TRISTRAM J. COFFIN
Represented By
Debra Loevy
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Amicus Curiae
JERRY E. MARTIN
Represented By
Debra Loevy
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Amicus Curiae
WILLIAM NETTLES
Represented By
Debra Loevy
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Amicus Curiae
JOYCE WHITE VANCE
Represented By
Debra Loevy
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Amicus Curiae
SEAN GOSE
Represented By
Glenn Edward Chappell
Tycko & Zavareei, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
OPTIMUM HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By
Amanda M. Santella
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Catherine Nagle
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David M. Deaton
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
David Jeffrey Leviss
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Scott P. Drake
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Kelly A. McDonnell
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A. Arias
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Ginger B. Boyd
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
contact info
Elizabeth M. Bock
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Anton Metlitsky
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Amanda Santella
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Benjamin D. Singer
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
FREEDOM HEALTH, INC.
Represented By
David M. Deaton
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A. Arias
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Ginger B. Boyd
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
contact info
Elizabeth M. Bock
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Anton Metlitsky
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Benjamin D. Singer
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Amanda M. Santella
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Catherine Nagle
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David Jeffrey Leviss
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
William T. Buffaloe
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Scott P. Drake
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Kelly A. McDonnell
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Amanda Santella
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANION TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By
Samantha M. Gerencir
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Priyanka Ghosh-Murthy
Law Office of Priyanka Ghosh-Murthy
contact info
Joseph W. Swanson
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Matthew D. Krueger
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Kannon K. Shanmugam
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP
contact info
Lauren Lisette Valiente
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Giovanni P. Giarratana
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
contact info
Arthur Lee Bentley III
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
contact info
Jason P. Mehta
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
David J. Wenthold
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
LaTour Rey Lafferty
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Joseph Warren Swanson
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Michael Patrick Matthews
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Anna Jayne Goodman
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP
contact info
Benjamin Miller-Gootnick
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP
contact info
James Durling
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PHYSICIAN PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By
Samantha M. Gerencir
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Priyanka Ghosh-Murthy
Law Office of Priyanka Ghosh-Murthy
contact info
Joseph W. Swanson
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Matthew D. Krueger
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Kannon K. Shanmugam
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP
contact info
Lauren Lisette Valiente
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Giovanni P. Giarratana
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
contact info
Arthur Lee Bentley III
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
contact info
Jason P. Mehta
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
David J. Wenthold
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
LaTour Rey Lafferty
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Joseph Warren Swanson
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Michael Patrick Matthews
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Anna Jayne Goodman
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP
contact info
Benjamin Miller-Gootnick
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP
contact info
James Durling
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
FLORIDA MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLC, d.b.a. VIPCARE
Represented By
Samantha M. Gerencir
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Priyanka Ghosh-Murthy
Law Office of Priyanka Ghosh-Murthy
contact info
Joseph W. Swanson
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Matthew D. Krueger
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Kannon K. Shanmugam
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP
contact info
Lauren Lisette Valiente
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Giovanni P. Giarratana
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
contact info
Arthur Lee Bentley III
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
contact info
Jason P. Mehta
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
David J. Wenthold
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
LaTour Rey Lafferty
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Joseph Warren Swanson
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Michael Patrick Matthews
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Anna Jayne Goodman
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP
contact info
Benjamin Miller-Gootnick
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP
contact info
James Durling
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP
contact info
Movant - Appellant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Daniel Winik
DOJ-CIV
contact info
U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida
DOJ-USAO
contact info
Sean P. Keefe
Morgan & Morgan
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CLARISSA ZAFIROV, ex rel; Dr.
Represented By
Adam Rabin
Rabin Kammerer Johnson, PA
contact info
Havan M. Clark
Rabin Kammerer Johnson, PA
contact info
Jonathan M. Lischak
Morgan Verkamp, LLC
contact info
Jillian L. Estes
Morgan Verkamp, LLC
contact info
Anne Hayes Hartman
Morgan Verkamp, LLC
contact info
Chandra Napora
Morgan Verkamp, LLC
contact info
Kenneth J. Nolan
Nolan Auerbach & White
contact info
Jennifer M. Verkamp
Morgan Verkamp, LLC
contact info
Marcella Auerbach
Nolan Auerbach & White
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:57 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant USA on 10/29/2024. Fee Status: Fee Not Required. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/22/2024 as to Appellant United States of America. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/02/2024 as to Appellees Florida Medical Associates, LLC and Freedom Health, Inc..
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 3 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 2 pgs USDC Judgment DE 347
Att: 4 53 pgs USDC Order DE 346
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Clarissa Zafirov on 10/29/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/22/2024 as to Appellant Clarissa Zafirov. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/02/2024 as to Appellees Florida Medical Associates, LLC and Freedom Health, Inc..
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 2 pgs USDC Judgment DE 347
Att: 4 53 pgs USDC Order DE 346