New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:24-cv-10286
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 5:25 AM EDT
Defendant
BAM TRADING SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
KERRY C DONOVAN
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Defendant
BINANCE HOLDINGS, LTD
Represented By
JAMES L. BROCHIN
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Defendant
CHANGPENG ZHAO
Represented By
ANTHONY J. STALTARI
Quinn Emanual Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-100
Defendant
XYZ CORP, INC. 1-100
Notice Only
PHV THANIA (ATHANASIA) CHARMANI
Notice Only
PHV GEORGE E. MASTORIS
Notice Only
PHV GABRIELA A. PLASENCIA
Notice Only
PHV DANIEL T. STABILE
Notice Only
PHV PETER H. FOUNTAIN
Notice Only
PHV BRENNA LEDVORA
Notice Only
PHV MICHAEL A. LINNEMAN
Notice Only
PHV AVI PERRY
QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP 1300 I STREET, NW, SUITE 900
WASHINGTON, DC 20005
Plaintiff
DAVID GONZALEZ
Represented By
ERIC JAMES WARNER
Law Office Of Eric J. Warner, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
42 42 misc Letter Mon 04/28 2:37 PM
Letter from Eric J. Warner, Esq.. (WARNER, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
41 41 order Text Order Wed 04/23 2:27 PM
TEXT ORDER: On April 9, 2025, in response to defendants' letter requests for a premotion conference, the Court ordered Plaintiff to respond to defendants'37 and38 letters by April 15, 2025. Having not received a response, the Court ordered Plaintiff to respond by April 21, 2025. To date, Plaintiff has not filed a response. A hearing will be held via Microsoft Teams on May 15, 2025 at 10:00 am. An invitation will be circulated prior to the hearing. Plaintiff's failure to appear may result in dismissal. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 04/23/2025. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
40 40 order Text Order Wed 04/16 4:21 PM
TEXT ORDER: On April 9, 2025, the Court ordered Plaintiff to respond to defendant's37 and38 letters by April 15, 2025. (See 39 .) To date, Plaintiff has not filed a response. Plaintiff shall file a response by April 21, 2025. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 04/16/2025. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
39 39 order Text Order Wed 04/09 11:20 AM
TEXT ORDER: In accordance with Judge Martinotti's preferences, any adversary shall respond to the37 and38 pre-motion letter by April 15, 2025, not to exceed three pages. No replies are permitted. A pre-motion conference will be scheduled following the court's review of the letters. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 04/09/2025. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
38 38 misc Letter Tue 04/08 2:46 PM
Letter from James L. Brochin requesting a pre-motion Conference to the Hon Brian R. Martinotti. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Letter Tue 04/08 12:33 PM
Letter from Kerry C. Donovan to Hon. Brian Martinotti to request a pre-motion conference in anticipation of Defendant BAM Trading Services, Inc.'s motion to dismiss re1 Complaint,.(DONOVAN, KERRY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
36 36 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/19 10:15 PM
LETTER ORDER denying17 Motion Leave for Constructive Service on Changpeng Zhao; Any new motion filed by Plaintiff shall include the information necessary for this Court to make a determination that Plaintiff has reasonably attempted to serve Defendant Zhao, why the Court's intervention is necessary, and why permitting alternative service would satisfy due process requirements under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f); that Defendants BAM Trading Services, Inc. and Binance Holdings, Ltd. must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, (ECF No. 1), on or before April 21, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/19/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
35 35 misc Transcript Wed 03/19 11:22 AM
Transcript of Hearing held on March 11, 2025, before Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 4/7/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/17/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2025. (and)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
minutes Motion Hearing Tue 03/11 11:32 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2025 re17 MOTION Leave for Constructive Service on Changpeng Zhao filed by DAVID GONZALEZ. (Court Reporter, Zoom) (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
34 34 order Text Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/27 4:15 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold oral argument on Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service, (ECF No.17 ), on 3/11/25 at 10:30 a.m. via Zoom. In addition to Plaintiff's counsel, counsel for ALL defendants (BAM Trading Services, Inc., Binance Holdings, Ltd., and Changpeng Zhao) must attend. Zoom information will be distributed in advance of the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/27/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Thu 01/23 1:23 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, PETER H. FOUNTAIN, BRENNA LEDVORA, MICHAEL A. LINNEMAN and AVI PERRY, haVE been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 01/10 6:55 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Avi Perry to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15932788.) (STALTARI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 01/10 6:50 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael A. Linneman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15932785.) (STALTARI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 01/10 6:45 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brenna Ledvora to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15932781.) (STALTARI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 01/10 6:38 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Peter H. Fountain to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15932746.) (STALTARI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
29 29 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 12/30 11:25 AM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAVID GONZALEZ re17 MOTION Leave for Constructive Service on Changpeng Zhao (WARNER, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/23 4:36 PM
ORDER granting27 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to AVI PERRY, PETER H. FOUNTAIN, MICHAEL A. LINNEMAN and BRENNA LEDVORA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/23/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/23 4:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CHANGPENG ZHAO.(STALTARI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Anthony J. Staltari,
Att: 2 Declaration of Avi Perry,
Att: 3 Declaration of Peter H. Fountain,
Att: 4 Declaration of Michael A. Linneman,
Att: 5 Declaration of Brenna Ledvora,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
26 26 17 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Mon 12/23 3:25 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CHANGPENG ZHAO re17 MOTION Leave for Constructive Service on Changpeng Zhao (STALTARI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Avi Perry in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Oct. 1, 2024 Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Nov. 25, 2024 Email,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Dec. 3, 2024 Email,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order Denying Alternative Service
Thursday, December 19, 2024
25 25 service Affidavit of Service Thu 12/19 10:33 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Binance Holdings LTD on 12/5/24, filed by DAVID GONZALEZ. (WARNER, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 12/12 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by ANTHONY J. STALTARI (STALTARI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/10 12:28 PM
ORDER granting the22 Application for the pro hac vice admission of Charles A. Michael, Andrew Adams, Brendan Hammond, and B. Gammon Fain. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/10/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
22 22 misc Letter Mon 12/09 4:21 PM
Letter from James L. Brochin.(BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of James L. Brochin,
Att: 2 Declaration of Andrew Adams,
Att: 3 Declaration of Charles A. Michael,
Att: 4 Declaration of Brendan Hammond,
Att: 5 Declaration of B. Gammon Fain,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/09 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES L. BROCHIN on behalf of BINANCE HOLDINGS, LTD (BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/03 4:31 PM
Set Deadlines as to17 MOTION Leave for Constructive Service on Changpeng Zhao . Motion set for 1/6/2025 before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
20 20 order Text Order Mon 12/02 12:18 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant BAM Trading Services, Inc.'s Motion for an Extension of Time to File an Answer, (ECF No.19 ), to the Complaint, (ECF No.1 ). As this Court previously ordered in ECF No. 18 , all deadlines to respond to the Complaint shall be held in abeyance until Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Effect Alternative Service of Process, (ECF No.17 ), is resolved. Accordingly, Defendant BAM's Motion, (ECF No.19 ), is DENIED as moot. Any party shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion on or before 12/23/24.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/2/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/27 1:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by BAM TRADING SERVICES, INC..(DONOVAN, KERRY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Wed 11/27 2:29 PM
19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, REFERRED to Cathy L. Waldor. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
18 18 order Text Order Tue 11/26 11:53 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's Motion to Set a Schedule to Respond to the Complaint, (ECF No.16 ), and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Effect Alternative Service of Process, (ECF No.17 ). All deadlines to respond to the Complaint, (ECF No.1 ), shall be held in abeyance until Plaintiff's Motion, (ECF No.17 ), is resolved. Accordingly, Defendant's Motion, (ECF No.16 ), is DENIED as moot. Scheduling will be addressed upon resolution of Plaintiff's Motion.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/26/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/25 11:30 AM
MOTION Leave for Constructive Service on Changpeng Zhao by DAVID GONZALEZ.(WARNER, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certification Certification of Counsel,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex 1 Emails with opposing counsel,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex 2 Motion in other case,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex 3 Unpublished Case,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex 4 Unpublished Case,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex 5 Unpublished Case,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex 6 Unpublished Case,
Att: 10 Certificate of Service
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/25 11:04 AM
MOTION to Set Schedule to Respond to Complaint by CHANGPENG ZHAO.(Staltari, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Mon 11/25 11:12 AM
16 MOTION to Set Schedule to Respond to Complaint REFERRED to Cathy L. Waldor. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
15 15 misc Exhibit (to Document) Thu 11/21 10:54 AM
Exhibit to13 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF (Amended Request for Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gabriela A. Plasencia To Receive Electronic Notifications) by BAM TRADING SERVICES, INC.. (DONOVAN, KERRY)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Exhibit (to Document) Thu 11/21 10:52 AM
Exhibit to10 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF (Amended Request for Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel T. Stabile To Receive Electronic Notifications) by BAM TRADING SERVICES, INC.. (DONOVAN, KERRY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Wed 11/20 3:55 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, THANIA (ATHANASIA) CHARMANI and GEORGE E. MASTORIS, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (wh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Tue 11/19 3:45 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, GABRIELA A. PLASENCIA, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Tue 11/19 3:47 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that while the13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice as to Gabriela A. Plasencia submitted by KERRY C DONOVAN on 11/18/2024 has been processed, the Notice itself does not reference the current Pro Hac Vice Fee of $250.00. Kindly submit an amended notice that references the current fee, and submit it using the event Exhibit (to Document), and link the new entry to the13 Notice when prompted. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 11/18 12:04 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gabriela A. Plasencia to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15814053.) (DONOVAN, KERRY)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 11/18 12:02 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Thania (Athanasia) Charmani to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15814046.) (DONOVAN, KERRY)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 11/18 11:58 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice George E. Mastoris to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15814035.) (DONOVAN, KERRY)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 11/18 11:56 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel T. Stabile to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15813986.) (DONOVAN, KERRY)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Mon 11/18 4:25 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, DANIEL T. STABILE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Mon 11/18 4:29 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that while the10 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel T. Stabile submitted by KERRY C DONOVAN on 11/18/2024 has been processed, the Notice itself does not reference the current Pro Hac Vice Fee of $250.00. Kindly submit an amended notice that references the current fee, and submit it using the event Exhibit (to Document) , and link the new entry to the10 Notice when prompted. (dam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Wed 11/13 11:19 AM
ORDER granting the8 Application for the pro hac vice admission of Daniel T. Stabile, Esq., George E. Mastoris, Esq., Thania (Athanasia) Charmani, Esq., and Gabriela A. Plasencia, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/13/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Wed 11/13 10:06 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Affidavit of Service6 filed by Eric Warner on 11/11/2024 was submitted incorrectly. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Affidavit of Service of the Summons and Complaint using the event "Summons Returned Executed" found under Civil-Initial Pleadings and Service-Service of Process. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney Wed 11/13 10:33 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter Application8 -Attachments #2-5 submitted by Kerry Donovan on 11/12/2024 contain improper signatures. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENTS WITH PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURES using the event "Exhibit (to Document)" found under Civil-Other Filings-Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
8 8 misc Letter Tue 11/12 6:10 PM
Letter from Kerry C. Donovan to Hon. Cathy L. Waldor regarding pro hac vice applications on consent.(DONOVAN, KERRY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kerry C. Donovan,
Att: 2 Declaration of Daniel T. Stabile,
Att: 3 Declaration of George E. Mastoris,
Att: 4 Declaration of Thania (Athanasia) Charmani,
Att: 5 Declaration of Gabriela A. Plasencia,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/12 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KERRY C DONOVAN on behalf of BAM TRADING SERVICES, INC. (DONOVAN, KERRY)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Mon 11/11 3:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on JOHNNIE MYERS on 11/7/2024, filed by DAVID GONZALEZ. (WARNER, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/06 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Staltari on behalf of CHANGPENG ZHAO (Staltari, Anthony)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 11/06 12:01 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAM TRADING SERVICES, INC., BINANCE HOLDINGS, LTD, CHANGPENG ZHAO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/06 9:56 AM
Case assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/05 3:30 PM
NOTICE by BINANCE HOLDINGS, LTD of Related Case (24-cv-08521) - all parties consent (BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons - Request for Issue Tue 11/05 11:00 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by David Gonzalez as to BAM TRADING SERVICES, INC.. (WARNER, ERIC)
Related: [-]
1 1 110 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/05 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15786478) with JURY DEMAND, filed by David Gonzalez.(WARNER, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A Plaintiff Blockchain Info,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex B Expert Trace Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex C Defendants Plea Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex D CFTC Consent Judgment,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex E Defendant Transmitter License,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex F FinCen Consent Order