New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:24-cv-10284
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 5:25 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
GROM ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By
DAVID J. SPRONG
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
EBS-360
Represented By
JAMES NGUYEN PHAN
Law Offices Of James Phan, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
RAPHE MOHAMMED
Represented By
JAMES NGUYEN PHAN
Law Offices Of James Phan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
GROM ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By
DAVID J. SPRONG
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EBS-360
Represented By
JAMES NGUYEN PHAN
Law Offices Of James Phan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
RAPHE MOHAMMED
Represented By
JAMES NGUYEN PHAN
Law Offices Of James Phan, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Fri 05/02 8:37 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/14/2025. Formal discovery is stayed while the parties exchange discovery necessary to facilitate settlement. An update will be submitted by 6/18/2025. If the matter does not settle, the discovery schedule will be addressed. (jem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
11 11 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 03/05 9:47 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2025 at 1:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/05/2025. (jem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 02/26 10:37 AM
Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Grom Associates, Inc. by EBS-360, RAPHE MOHAMMED.(PHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 02/10 3:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GROM ASSOCIATES, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (SPRONG, DAVID)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 02/10 3:45 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by GROM ASSOCIATES, INC..(SPRONG, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 01/21 3:50 PM
CONSENT ORDER granting extension of time until 2/10/2025 to answer, move, or otherwise reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/21/2025. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/13 11:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EBS-360, RAPHE MOHAMMED. GROM ASSOCIATES, INC. served on 11/20/2024, answer due 12/11/2024.(PHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 11/05 12:31 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by EBS-360, RAPHE MOHAMMED. (PHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 11/05 11:57 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to GROM ASSOCIATES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (amv)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Exhibit (to Document) Tue 11/05 10:17 AM
Exhibit to1 Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs. (PHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 11/05 10:00 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by EBS-360 identifying EBS-360 as Corporate Parent.. (PHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/05 9:42 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15786414) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EBS-360, Raphe Mohammed.(PHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Tue 11/05 11:45 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . DO NOT select a party if it is not in CAPITAL LETTERS or if it does not reflect the EXACT name as is found in the pleading, Create a new party. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Tue 11/05 11:46 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 11/05 11:46 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 11/05 11:56 AM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (amv)
Related: [-]