Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-11068

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:24-ap-50186
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 31, 2025 2:26 PM EST
Claims Agent
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
www.kroll.com/kra 1 World Trade Center 31st Floor
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Salame
Represented By
Marc J. Phillips
Montgomery Mccracken Walker & Rhoads LLP
contact info
Ryan Salame
contact info
Interested Party
Michelle Bond
Represented By
Lawrence Joel Kotler
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
FTX Recovery Trust
Represented By
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FTX Trading Ltd.
Represented By
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Michael Barlow
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Howard W Robertson, IV
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alameda Research LLC
3500 South Dupont Highway
Dover, DE 19901
Represented By
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Michael Barlow
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Howard W Robertson, IV
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alameda Research Ltd.
Represented By
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Michael Barlow
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Howard W Robertson, IV
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
North Dimension Inc.
Represented By
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Michael Barlow
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Howard W Robertson, IV
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
West Realm Shires, Inc.
167 N Green Street Suite 1102
Chicago, IL 60607
Represented By
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Michael Barlow
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Howard W Robertson, IV
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
West Realm Shires Services, Inc.
167 N Green Street Suite 1102
Chicago, IL 60607
Represented By
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Michael Barlow
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Howard W Robertson, IV
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
186 186 misc Withdrawal of Appearance - Notice Wed 05/07 12:19 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. terminating Gregory T. Donilon and Marc J. Phillips has withdrawn from the case. Filed by Sam Bankman-Fried, John Conbere, Joshua Leyton, Luis Scott-Vargas, Matthew Nass, Matthew Place, Ryan Salame. (Phillips, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
185 185 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 05/06 11:05 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Nelson Crespin Regarding Notice of Agenda for Virtual Status Conference Scheduled for April 30, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. (ET), before the Honorable Karen B. Owens, Chief Judge, at the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, Located at 824 North Market Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom No. 3, Wilmington, Delaware 19801 . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 170
184 184 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 05/06 10:58 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Nelson Crespin Regarding Motion of Plaintiff for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing Plaintiff to File Under Seal the Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; and (II) Granting Related Relief, and Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 156 ,157
183 183 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 05/06 9:34 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Nelson Crespin Regarding Plaintiffs Opposition to Intervenor Bonds Motion for Entry of an Order Scheduling an Emergency Hearing on Bonds Motion for Modification of the Temporary Restraining Order for Payment of Legal Fees and Expenses . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 166
Monday, May 05, 2025
182 182 notice Notice of Service Mon 05/05 4:00 PM
Notice of Service Related [+] Filed by Michelle Bond (Ross, Sommer)
Related: [-] 177 ,180
181 181 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Mon 05/05 10:57 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery / Notice of Service of Defendant Ryan Salame's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Filed by Ryan Salame (Phillips, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
180 180 3 pgs misc Declaration in Support Fri 05/02 9:53 PM
Declaration in Support of Intervenor Michelle Bond's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Michelle Bond in Civil Contempt for Violating Temporary Restraining Order and/or For Sanctions Related [+] Filed by Michelle Bond. (Ross, Sommer)
Related: [-] 177
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
179 179 notice Withdrawal - Notice Fri 05/02 9:51 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Adversary Docket No. 178 Related [+] Filed by Michelle Bond (Ross, Sommer)
Related: [-] 178
178 178 misc Declaration in Support Fri 05/02 9:05 PM
**WITHDRAWAL - See Docket No.179 ** Declaration in Support of Intervenor Michelle Bond's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Michelle Bond in Civil Contempt for Violating Temporary Restraining Order and/or For Sanctions Related [+] Filed by Michelle Bond. (Ross, Sommer)Modified on 5/5/2025 (ALD)
Related: [-] 177
177 177 21 pgs answer Objection Fri 05/02 9:02 PM
Objection / Intervenor Michelle Bond's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Michelle Bond in Civil Contempt for Violating Temporary Restraining Order and/or For Sanctions Related [+] Filed by Michelle Bond (Ross, Sommer)
Related: [-] 136 ,137
176 176 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 05/02 11:34 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Ishrat Khan Regarding Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Non-Party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 158
175 175 notice Notice of Service Fri 05/02 9:59 AM
Notice of Service Filed by Michelle Bond (Ross, Sommer)
Related: [-]
174 174 misc Transcript Fri 05/02 9:33 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/30/25 RE: Status Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/31/2025. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number 302-654-8080. Filed by FTX Recovery Trust . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/9/2025. Redaction Request Due By 5/23/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/2/2025. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/31/2025. (JC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
173 173 court Hearing Held Wed 04/30 5:48 PM
Zoom Hearing Held. Motion to Shorten "DENIED". Related [+] (Mml)
Related: [-] 164 ,170
172 172 audio Wed 04/30 3:00 PM
Court Date & Time [04/30/2025 02:58:15 PM]. File Size [ 29275 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:02:23 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
171 171 92 pgs notice Intent - Notice Wed 04/30 2:25 PM
Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Non-Parties Filed by FTX Recovery Trust. (Robertson, Howard)
Related: [-]