Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-06323
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2024
Case in other court:Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-10765
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
Defendant
LN Curtis & Sons
Defendant
Lakeland Industries Inc
Defendant
Lion Apparel Inc
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
Defendant
MSA Safety Incorporated
Defendant
MSA Safety Sales LLC
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
Defendant
Milliken & Company
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
Defendant
Narcote Holding Corporation
Defendant
Narcote LLC
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
National Foam. Inc.
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
Defendant
TenCate Protective Fabrics USA
6501Mall Blvd.
Union City, GA 30291
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Veridian Limited
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
3M Company
Represented By
Daniel Leslie Ring
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256
Defendant
Globe Holding Company LLC
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
Defendant
Innotex Corporation
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Plaintiff
David Bucher
Represented By
William T Gibbs
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Kenneth Thomas Lumb
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Mitchell Wald Bild
Corboy & Demetrio, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
16 16 service Certificate of Service Wed 11/13 4:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Bucher on all defendants(Lumb, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service on defendant AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service on defendant Allstar Fire Equipment Co.,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service on defendant Amerex Corporation,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service on defendant Archroma U.S., Inc.,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service on defendant Arkema, Inc.,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service on defendant Buckeye Fire Equipment Co,,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service on defendant Carrier Global Corporation,
Att: 8 Certificate of Service on defendant CB Garment, Inc.,
Att: 9 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemdesign Products, Inc.,
Att: 10 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemguard, Inc.,
Att: 11 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemicals, Inc.,
Att: 12 Certificate of Service on defendant Clariant Corporation,
Att: 13 Certificate of Service on defendant Corveta, Inc.,
Att: 14 Certificate of Service on defendant Daikin America, Inc.,
Att: 15 Certificate of Service on defendant Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.,
Att: 16 Certificate of Service on defendant Dynax Corporation,
Att: 17 Certificate of Service on defendant E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co., Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise,
Att: 18 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire Service Plus, Inc.,
Att: 19 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire-Dex, LLC,
Att: 20 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Holding Company, LLC,
Att: 21 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Manufacturing Company LLC,
Att: 22 Certificate of Service on defendant Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.,
Att: 23 Certificate of Service on defendant Innotex Corporation,
Att: 24 Certificate of Service on defendant Johnson Controls, Inc.,
Att: 25 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., (f/k/a Chubb National Foam, Inc., f/k/a National Foam, Inc.),
Att: 26 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. (f/k/a Fenwal, Inc.), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc.,
Att: 27 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde PLC, Inc., (f/k/a Williams Holdins, Inc.), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc.,
Att: 28 Certificate of Service on defendant Lakeland Industries, Inc.,
Att: 29 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Apparel, Inc.,
Att: 30 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Group, Inc.,
Att: 31 Certificate of Service on defendant L.N. Curtis & Sons,
Att: 32 Certificate of Service on defendant Mallory Safety and Supply, LLC,
Att: 33 Certificate of Service on defendant Milliken & Company,
Att: 34 Certificate of Service on defendant Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC,
Att: 35 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Incorporated,
Att: 36 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Sales, LLC,
Att: 37 Certificate of Service on defendant Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.,
Att: 38 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote Holding Corporation (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.),
Att: 39 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote, LLC (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.),
Att: 40 Certificate of Service on defendant Nation Ford Chemical Company,
Att: 41 Certificate of Service on defendant National Foam, Inc.,
Att: 42 Certificate of Service on defendant PBI Performance Products, Inc.,
Att: 43 Certificate of Service on defendant Perimeter Solutions, LP,
Att: 44 Certificate of Service on defendant Ricochet Manufacturing Co., Inc.,
Att: 45 Certificate of Service on defendant Safety Components Fabric Technologies, Inc.,
Att: 46 Certificate of Service on defendant Stedfast USA, Inc.,
Att: 47 Certificate of Service on defendant Tencate Protective Fabrics USA, d/b/a Southern Mills, Inc.,
Att: 48 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise,
Att: 49 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise,
Att: 50 Certificate of Service on defendant Tyco Fire Products, L.P. as Successor-In-Interest to The Ansul Company,
Att: 51 Certificate of Service on defendant United Technologies Corporation,
Att: 52 Certificate of Service on defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (f/k/a GE Interlogix, Inc.), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc.,
Att: 53 Certificate of Service on defendant Veridian Limited d/b/a Veridian Fire Protective Gear,
Att: 54 Certificate of Service on defendant Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc., d/b/a "The Fire Store",
Att: 55 Certificate of Service on defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
15 15 service Summons Issued Wed 11/06 10:55 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
14 14 misc MDL Member Case Opened Tue 11/05 1:33 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-10765, David Bucher v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-06323-RMG (jbin)
Related: [-]
13 13 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 11/05 12:45 PM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:24-cv-10765. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
12 12 transfer Case Transferred Out - District Not MDL Tue 11/05 8:42 AM
TRANSFERRED to the USDC, District of South Carolina the electronic record. (evw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/05 8:33 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to District of South Carolina. Mailed notice. (evw, )
Related: [-]
10 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Bucher by William T Gibbs (Gibbs, William) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2873 Conditional Transfer Order filed 11/4/2024. (evw, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 11/05 8:34 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2873 Conditional Transfer Order filed 11/4/2024. (evw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
9 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Bucher by Mitchell Wald Bild (Bild, Mitchell) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Bucher by Kenneth Thomas Lumb (Lumb, Kenneth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
7 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Although a conditional transfer order to the MDL has been entered, on review of the Complaint, the Court orders the following jurisdictional inquiry. Defendant 3M Company relies on diversity jurisdiction, 28 U.S.C. § 1332, for the Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Notice of Removal para. 13. For the LLC defendants, the Complaint itself states only their place of incorporation and principal place of business. Compl. paras. 23, 28, 29, 32, 43, 57, 59, 62. But an LLC's citizenship is not like a corporation's; instead an LLC is a citizen of every state where its members are citizens. Wise v. Wachovia Securities, LLC, 450 F.3d 265, 267 (7th Cir. 2006). The Notice of Removal supplies facts that might support the citizenship allegations for most of the LLCs, although not for Defendant Narcote. Not. of Removal paras. 27, 32, 36, 45, 59, 61, 64. But the Notice of Removal alleges the defendants' citizenship solely "on information and belief." Id. Citizenship must be proven by underlying facts, not just alleged on information and belief. See America's Best Inns, Inc. v. Best Inns of Abilene, L.P., 980 F.2d 1072, 1074 (7th Cir. 1992). Likewise, the Notice of Removal only alleges Chemguard's principal place of business (which was not alleged in the Complaint) and corrects Mine Safety Compliance Company, LLC's identity on information and belief. Not. of Removal paras. 46, 33. The parties' counsel (including the Plaintiff's counsel and defense counsel for the Defendants that did not file the notice of removal) must be prepared to confirm the citizenship allegations for all of the Defendants in the status report that is due on 11/05/2024. See R. 6. The parties may skip all other sections of the status report, other than subject matter jurisdiction, if the parties acknowledge that the case is headed to the MDL. Emailed notice (mw, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
6 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial tracking status hearing set for 11/15/2024 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 11/05/2024. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendants have not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (mw, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Status Report Requirements
Monday, October 21, 2024
5 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to William T. Gibbs. (jxm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 3M Company by Daniel Leslie Ring (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 3M Company (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2024-L-10758) filed by 3M Company Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22623750.(Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/5/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (ksr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/5/2024.]
Related: [-]