California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:24-cv-07673
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 2:11 AM PDT
Defendant
Republic Services, Inc.
Represented By
Richard Loran Gillespie
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Erin Leigh Winters
Foster Employment Law
contact info
Defendant
West Contra Costa Sanitary Landfill, Inc.
Represented By
Richard Loran Gillespie
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ed A. Baquerizo
Represented By
Barbara E. Cowan
Workplace Advocates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
39 39 misc Joint Case Management Statement Tue 05/13 11:32 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Republic Services, Inc..(Gillespie, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
38 38 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 05/13 11:31 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Republic Services, Inc..(Gillespie, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, April 21, 2025
37 37 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 04/22 11:34 AM
Order Denying 14 Motion to Dismiss Prayer for Punitive Damages. Signed on 4/21/2025 by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Defendants ordered to file an answer within 21 days, by 5/13/2025. (ccf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
36 36 13 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 03/26 3:10 PM
Order. Signed 3/26/2025 by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 33 Stipulated Protective Order.(klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
35 35 oth_sup Declaration in Support Tue 03/25 11:06 AM
Declaration of Erin Winters filed byRepublic Services, Inc..(Winters, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Thursday, March 20, 2025
34 34 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/20 12:06 PM
ORDER re 33 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Republic Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/20/2025. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
33 33 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 03/19 12:00 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Republic Services, Inc..(Winters, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Thursday, February 27, 2025
32 32 order Order Thu 02/27 3:53 PM
ORDER requiring Plaintiff to email Word (.docx) version of their 24 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss to kawpo@cand.uscourts.gov by 3/4/2025. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/27/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
31 31 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 02/27 3:07 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE NOTICE VACATING HEARING DATE. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds that the Motion to Dismiss, currently set for hearing on March 6, 2025, at 1:30 P.M. is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date is hereby VACATED. The motion will be taken under submission and decided on the papers. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
30 30 motion Appear by Telephone Thu 02/20 7:12 PM
MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Erin Winters filed by Republic Services, Inc..(Winters, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 02/20 6:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Erin Leigh Winters on behalf of Republic Services, Inc. (Winters, Erin)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Appear by Telephone Thu 02/20 10:59 AM
MOTION to Appear by Telephone or Zoom filed by Ed A. Baquerizo. (Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
27 27 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 02/19 8:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Republic Services, Inc. re26 Objection,25 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Gillespie, Richard)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Objection Wed 02/19 8:01 PM
OBJECTIONS to re24 Opposition/Response to Motion Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice File in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Strike Plaintiff's Request for Punitive Damages by Republic Services, Inc.. (Gillespie, Richard)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Wed 02/19 7:55 PM
REPLY Related [+] Defendants' Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Strike Plaintiff's Request for Punitive Damages filed byRepublic Services, Inc.. (Gillespie, Richard)
Related: [-] 14 MOTION to Dismiss
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
24 24 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 02/11 4:24 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byEd A. Baquerizo.(Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-] 14 MOTION to Dismiss
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice
Friday, January 31, 2025
23 23 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 01/31 10:26 AM
CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MGMT CONFERENCE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at kawcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 5/19/2025 by Noon. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
22 22 misc Joint Case Management Statement Tue 01/28 2:52 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Republic Services, Inc., West Contra Costa Sanitary Landfill, Inc..(Gillespie, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
21 21 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 01/28 2:13 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by West Contra Costa Sanitary Landfill, Inc... (Gillespie, Richard)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 01/28 12:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Republic Services, Inc. (Gillespie, Richard)
Related: [-]
19 19 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 01/28 8:53 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 01/28 8:52 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Ed A. Baquerizo (Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-]
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 01/28 8:06 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Republic Services has filed a Motion to Dismiss 14 . Accordingly, Defendant West Contra Costa Sanitary Landfill shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/4/2025. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
16 16 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 01/27 7:55 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Republic Services, Inc... (Gillespie, Richard)
Related: [-]
15 15 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mon 01/27 7:53 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gillespie, Richard)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss Mon 01/27 7:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Republic Services, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 3/6/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Responses due by 2/10/2025. Replies due by 2/18/2025.(Gillespie, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Erin Winters in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Strike Plaintiff's Request for Punitive Damages,
Att: 2 Defendants' Notice of Interested Parties,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/24 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Only as to Plaintiff's Fourth Cause of Action for Defamation (Without Prejudice) by Ed A. Baquerizo (Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/03 2:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Ed A. Baquerizo. (Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/22 9:10 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ed A. Baquerizo. Service waived by Republic Services, Inc. waiver sent on 11/5/2024, answer due 1/6/2025. (Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued Thu 11/14 11:49 AM
Summons Issued as to Republic Services, Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 11/14 10:42 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ed A. Baquerizo.. (Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
8 8 misc Proposed Summons Wed 11/13 4:04 PM
Proposed Summons. (Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 11/13 3:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ed A. Baquerizo. Service waived by West Contra Costa Sanitary Landfill, Inc. waiver sent on 11/5/2024, answer due 1/6/2025. (Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 11/06 9:09 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 11/05 11:52 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/19/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/05 11:47 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Ed Baquerizo . (Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Tue 11/05 10:38 AM
COMPLAINT (Corrected) against All Defendants. Filed by Ed Baquerizo. (Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/05 10:34 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Ed Baquerizo . (Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/05 10:24 AM
COMPLAINT against Republic Services, Inc., West Contra Costa Sanitary Landfill, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20018681.). Filed by Ed Baquerizo.(Cowan, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 11/05 10:31 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . CAND Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Complaint, filed by Ed Baquerizo (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]