Lewis et al v. The New York City Department of Correction et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis A Kaplan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-08428 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 05, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby, ORDERED that the following schedule of deadlines shall govern the further conduct of pretrial proceedings in this case: Motions due by 8/15/2025. Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2025. Expert Discovery due by 9/15/2025. Pretrial Order due by 10/15/2025. Jury Trial set for 12/2/2025 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/27/25) (yv) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2025 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Wed 02/26 4:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan via video-conference.Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/26/2025. (Mohan, Andrew) |
||
Tuesday, February 25, 2025 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 02/25 9:57 AM
DIAL-IN INFORMATION RE 2 26-2025 REMOTE IPTC: Counsel were directly emailed links to join the IPTC via video-conference. Public and press may listen to the audio only by dialing 646-453-4442, Conference ID: 451202976#. All listeners are requested to mute their phones upon joining. Participants and listeners are advised that only official court reporters and court staff may record court proceedings and any unauthorized recording of the hearing in whole or in part is prohibited by Court rules..(Mohan, Andrew) |
||
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER granting20 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Adjourned to 2/26/2025 at 02:15 PM. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 2/26/2025 at 02:15 PM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/18/25) (yv) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Bryn M. Ritchie dated February 14, 2025. Document filed by The City of New York, Lynelle Maginley-Liddie..(Ritchie, Bryn) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint,. Document filed by The New York City Department of Correction, The City of New York, Lynelle Maginley-Liddie..(Ritchie, Bryn) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Lynelle Maginley-Liddie served on 12/13/2024, answer due 1/24/2025. Service was accepted by Mr. Morgan (Co-Worker). Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Luis D Sanchez; Jeffrey Lewis; Robert Dinkins; Michael Farrell..(Demirayak, Caner) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER granting15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint,. (All Defendants) ; granting15 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/10/24) (yv) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Tue 12/10 12:23 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Initial Conference set for 2/19/2025 at 11:00 AM via video-conference before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. See the original scheduling order re initial conference and the attached proposed form scheduling order regarding the opportunity to submit a joint agreed upon proposed schedule in lieu of an IPTC. (Mohan, Andrew) |
||
Monday, December 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric M. Teszler on behalf of The City of New York, Lynelle Maginley-Liddie..(Teszler, Eric) |
|
15 | 15
![]() LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Bryn M. Ritchie dated December 9, 2024., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Bryn M. Ritchie dated December 9, 2024. Document filed by The City of New York, Lynelle Maginley-Liddie..(Ritchie, Bryn) |
|
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryn Ritchie on behalf of The City of New York, Lynelle Maginley-Liddie..(Ritchie, Bryn) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action having been assigned to me for all purposes, it is hereby, ORDERED as follows: 1. Counsel receiving this order shall promptly mail copies hereof to all other counsel of record or, in the case of parties for which no appearance has been made, to such parties. 2. Counsel for all parties are directed to confer regarding an agreed scheduling order. If counsel are able to agree on a schedule and the agreed schedule calls for filing of the pretrial order not more than six (6) months from the date of this order, counsel shall sign and file by 1/8/2025 a consent order in the form annexed for consideration by the Court. If such a consent order is not filed within the time provided, a video-conference invite will be emailed to counsel setting a video-conference on 1/15/2025 at 3:00 PM. (AS FURTHER SET FORTH IN THIS ORDER.) Initial Conference set for 1/15/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/6/2024) (vfr) |
|
12 | 12
![]() SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Lynelle Maginley-Liddie served on 11/19/2024, answer due 12/10/2024. Service was accepted by Adam Goebler, Authorized Agent of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Luis D Sanchez; Jeffrey Lewis; Robert Dinkins; Michael Farrell..(Demirayak, Caner) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. The City of New York served on 11/19/2024, answer due 12/10/2024. Service was accepted by Adam Goebler, Authorized Agent of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Luis D Sanchez; Jeffrey Lewis; Robert Dinkins; Michael Farrell..(Demirayak, Caner) |
|
Wednesday, November 13, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Demirayak, Caner) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Masai I Lord on behalf of Jeffrey Lewis, Michael Farrell, Robert Dinkins, Luis D Sanchez..(Lord, Masai) |
|
8 | 8
![]() ORDER OF DISMISSAL... This case is dismissed solely as against the New York City Department of Correction. SO ORDERED., (The New York City Department of Correction terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/7/24) (yv) |
|
Wednesday, November 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The City of New York..(gp) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lynelle Maginley-Liddie..(gp) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The New York City Department of Correction..(gp) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 11/06 2:38 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Caner Demirayak. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 11/06 3:01 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 11/06 3:01 PM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 11/06 3:02 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp) |
||
Tuesday, November 05, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lynelle Maginley-Liddie, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jeffrey Lewis, Michael Farrell, Robert Dinkins, Luis D Sanchez..(Demirayak, Caner) |
|
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jeffrey Lewis, Michael Farrell, Robert Dinkins, Luis D Sanchez..(Demirayak, Caner) |
|
2 | 2
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The New York City Department of Correction, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jeffrey Lewis, Michael Farrell, Robert Dinkins, Luis D Sanchez..(Demirayak, Caner) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Lynelle Maginley-Liddie, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Correction. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30142944)Document filed by Luis D Sanchez, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Dinkins, Michael Farrell..(Demirayak, Caner) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |