Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Counts
Referred: Ronald C Griffin
Case #: 7:24-cv-00282
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2024
Terminated:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Dec 20, 2024 4:15 AM CST
Defendant
Nine Energy Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Christopher Sledz
Moore & Associates 440 LOUISIANA ST STE 1110
HOUSTON, TX 77002
Represented By
Curt Hesse
Moore & Associates
contact info
Melissa Moore
Moore & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, February 21, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/21 12:52 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 02/21 12:45 PM
ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE.. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
14 14 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 02/20 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher Sledz (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
13 13 2 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 12/04 3:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Nine Energy Services, LLC. (jb3)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/04 2:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Christopher Sledz. (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice Wed 12/04 2:26 PM
NOTICE Rejected Service of Process by Christopher Sledz re1 Complaint (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
10 10 7 pgs notice Notice of Filing Mon 11/18 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Filing6 3 5 7 4 and9 re Previously Filed Documents by Christopher Sledz (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
notice Deficiency Notice Thu 11/14 10:01 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 6 Notice (Other), 3 Notice of Appearance, 5 Notice (Other), 7 Notice (Other), 4 Notice (Other), 9 Notice (Other). Documents do not include any case information. Please re-file as "Notice of Filing" and include a cover sheet that has case and party information. All filings may be filed as one PDF. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
9 9 notice Notice Wed 11/13 5:25 PM
NOTICE Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff - Cody Lambert by Christopher Sledz (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/05 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Moore on behalf of Christopher Sledz. Attorney Melissa Moore added to party Christopher Sledz(pty:pla) (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice Tue 11/05 2:58 PM
NOTICE Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff - David Morriel by Christopher Sledz (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice Tue 11/05 2:56 PM
NOTICE Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff - Austin Morriel by Christopher Sledz (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice Tue 11/05 2:55 PM
NOTICE Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff - Jeffry Arnold by Christopher Sledz (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice Tue 11/05 2:53 PM
NOTICE Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff - Christopher Sledz by Christopher Sledz (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/05 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Curt Hesse on behalf of Christopher Sledz (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Tue 11/05 2:49 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Christopher Sledz. (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/05 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19430442). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Christopher Sledz.(Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/05 3:05 PM
Case assigned to Judge David Counts and Judge Ronald C. Griffin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jb3)
Related: [-]