Idaho District Court
Judge:B Lynn Winmill
Case #: 1:24-cv-00536
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 3:04 AM MDT
Defendant
Mike Courtney
Represented By
Christine Gealy England
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Peter Ditton
Represented By
Christine Gealy England
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Deb Haaland
Represented By
Christine Gealy England
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Codie Martin
Represented By
Christine Gealy England
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Tracy Stone-Manning
Represented By
Christine Gealy England
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Friends of Lee's Gulch
Represented By
Albert P Barker
Marten Law
contact info
Brian Anthony Daluiso
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Lili Simpson
Represented By
W. Alan Schroeder
Schroeder Law
contact info

GPO Apr 15 2025
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Plaintiff/Intervenors unopposed Motion to Intervene (Dkt. 9) is GRANTED. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
35 35 misc Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan Tue 05/06 3:31 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Deb Haaland. (Firpo, Robert)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form Tue 05/06 2:49 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Friends of Lee's Gulch, Elizabeth Lili Simpson. (Schroeder, W.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
33 33 order Litigation Order Thu 04/24 1:22 PM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan due by 5/6/2025. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2025 04:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
32 32 cmp Intervenor Complaint Tue 04/22 12:54 PM
Intervenor COMPLAINT in Intervention for Judicial Agency Decision , filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch.(Daluiso, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
31 31 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Tue 04/15 5:04 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Plaintiff/Intervenors unopposed Motion to Intervene (Dkt.9 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
30 30 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/20 8:55 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION to Intervene Defendants' Response to Motion to Intervene filed by Mike Courtney, Peter Ditton, Deb Haaland, Codie Martin, Tracy Stone-Manning. Replies due by 4/3/2025.(Firpo, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
29 29 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 03/14 4:14 PM
ORDER - Defendants Motion to Vacate (Dkt.26 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the scheduling conference on March 25, 2025, is hereby vacated. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
28 28 order Order Wed 03/12 3:07 PM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: Defendants are directed to file their Reply, if any, in support of the Motion to Vacate (Dkt.26 ) no later than March 13, 2025. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ra))
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Response to Motion Wed 03/12 9:08 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re26 MOTION to Vacate Motion to Vacate Deadline for Litigation Plan and Scheduling Conference filed by Elizabeth Lili Simpson. Replies due by 3/26/2025.(Schroeder, W.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
26 26 motion Vacate Tue 03/11 3:26 PM
MOTION to Vacate Motion to Vacate Deadline for Litigation Plan and Scheduling Conference Christine Gealy England appearing for Defendants Mike Courtney, Peter Ditton, Deb Haaland, Codie Martin, Tracy Stone-Manning. Responses due by 4/1/2025 (England, Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
25 25 respm Response to Motion Wed 03/05 9:01 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION to Intervene -- Response in Non-Opposition to Motion to Intervene filed by Elizabeth Lili Simpson. Replies due by 3/19/2025.(Schroeder, W.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
24 24 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:45 AM
DECLARATION of Karin T. Martin re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:39 AM
DECLARATION of Todd Reimunds re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:38 AM
DECLARATION of Darci Reimunds re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:35 AM
DECLARATION of Richard Gouley re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:34 AM
DECLARATION of Mary Mills re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:33 AM
DECLARATION of David Reiman re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:32 AM
DECLARATION of Chase Gouley re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:31 AM
DECLARATION of Lauire Yeager re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:30 AM
DECLARATION of Kathleen Chase Gouley re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:28 AM
DECLARATION of Cynthia L. Carroll re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:27 AM
DECLARATION of Jennifer M. Card, VMD re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:26 AM
DECLARATION of James R. Laski re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:08 AM
DECLARATION of James R. Laski as Designated Representative of Friends of Lee's Gulch filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 11:07 AM
DECLARATION of Albert P. Barker in Support of Motion to Intervene re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch . (Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
10 10 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 02/27 11:01 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Friends of Lee's Gulch.(Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Intervene Thu 02/27 10:53 AM
MOTION to Intervene Albert P Barker appearing for Intervenor Plaintiff Friends of Lee's Gulch. Responses due by 3/20/2025(Barker, Albert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Complaint
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 02/18 4:40 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR LITIGATION PLAN AND CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline to file a litigation plan is extended to March 11, 2025, and the telephonic scheduling conference is continued to March 25, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 02/18 11:16 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Litigation Plan and Continue Scheduling Conference Christine Gealy England appearing for Defendants Mike Courtney, Peter Ditton, Deb Haaland, Codie Martin, Tracy Stone-Manning. Responses due by 3/11/2025 (England, Christine)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
utility Expired 30 Day ddl re Consents Mon 02/10 1:03 PM
The 30 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
notice Consent Deadline Reminder Mon 01/27 8:40 AM
NOTICE OF CONSENT DEADLINE: Pursuant to General Order 457, this is a reminder that the Court has not received your completed form in response to the5 Notice of Availability regarding consent to United States Magistrate Judge. Please discuss this matter with your client and complete and return the consent to proceed form, if appropriate. As provided in Local Rule 73.1, your opportunity to consent will expire if we do not receive your consent prior to the 30 day deadline. * Consents are not to be filed in the case and should be emailed in pdf form to consents@id.uscourts.gov. No Judge will be informed of a party's response. (jd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
6 6 order Litigation Order Thu 01/16 2:48 PM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before February 18, 2025, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2025 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Availability Setting Deadline Wed 01/08 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Elizabeth Lili Simpson, Deb Haaland, Tracy Stone-Manning, Peter Ditton, Mike Courtney, Codie Martin re1 Complaint,4 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/7/2025. (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
4 4 16 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/07 3:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, Answer to Complaint for Judicial Review of Agency Decision by Deb Haaland, Tracy Stone-Manning, Peter Ditton, Mike Courtney, Codie Martin.(England, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 11/26 4:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Lili Simpson. All Defendants. (Schroeder, W.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 11/06 10:00 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.)(jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for Martin,
Att: 2 Summons for Attorney General,
Att: 3 Summons for Civil Process Clerk,
Att: 4 Summons for Ditton,
Att: 5 Summons for Haaland,
Att: 6 Summons for Stone-Manning
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
1 1 56 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/05 2:43 PM
COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Agency Decision against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIDDC-2837412.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Schroeder, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Deb Haaland, Secretary of the USDI,
Att: 3 Summons Tracy Stone-Manning Director of the BLM,
Att: 4 Summons Peter Ditton, Idaho State Director of the BLM,
Att: 5 Summons Mike Courtney, Twin Falls District Manager for the Twin Falls District, Idaho, Bureau of Land Management,
Att: 6 Summons Codie Martin, Shoshone Field Office Manager for the Shoshone Field Office,
Att: 7 Summons Civil Process Clerk, US Attorney's Office,
Att: 8 Summons Attorney General, US Department of Justice