Franco Giovannelli vs. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-06312 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 5:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
KiddeFenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Franco Giovannelli
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 11/05 11:54 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 11/4/2024), Franco Giovannelli vs. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-06312-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern District of Illinois (wmil, ) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil, ) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12086573.), filed by Franco Giovannelli. Service due by 2/3/2025(wmil, ) |