Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-01536
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 06, 2024 1:23 AM CST
Defendant
Servando Ambros-Garcia (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 11/06/2024 2:03 AM CST
Monday, November 04, 2024
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Servando Ambros-Garcia (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 11/5/2024 at 09:35 AM before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga (akp5)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Servando Ambros-Garcia, filed. (akp5)
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on November 4, 2024 at 04:13 PM as to Servando Ambros-Garcia. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (akp5)
Related: [-]