California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:24-cv-07703
Nature of Suit195 Contract - Contract Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2024
Terminated:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 2:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Intel Corporation
Represented By
Achyut Jayant Phadke
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Stephanie Goldfarb Herrera
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Gregory P. Stone
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Laura Ashley Aull
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Vanvalkenburgh
Represented By
Alexander Cyclone Covey
Kneupper & Covey, PC
contact info
Kevin Kneupper
Kneupper & Covey, PC
contact info
Richard Elgar Lyon, III
Dovel & Luner LLP
contact info
Christin Cho
Dovel And Luner, LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 29 2025
ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Transfer as Unopposed. The Clerk shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on January 29, 2025. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2025)

Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 30, 2025
utility Remark Thu 01/30 12:56 PM
Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in District of Delaware as case 1:25-cv-00128, filed 01/30/2025. (sfb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Transferring Case - - Out of District ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 01/29 3:50 PM
ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Transfer as Unopposed. The Clerk shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on January 29, 2025. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Wed 01/29 2:07 PM
RESPONSE re14 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to the District of Delaware Motion not opposed by Mark Vanvalkenburgh. (Covey, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 01/06 1:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING 20 Joint Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedules and to Vacate Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines As Modified. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/06 1:58 PM
Reset Deadlines as to14 Motion to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to the District of Delaware . Plaintiff's opposition due by 2/3/2025. Defendant's reply due by 2/14/2025. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/06 2:01 PM
Reset Deadlines as to16 Motion to Dismiss Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), 12(f) . Plaintiff's opposition due by 2/25/2025. Defendant's replydue by 3/18/2025. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
20 20 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 01/03 3:39 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedules and to Vacate Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Intel Corporation.(Aull, Laura Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 02, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 01/02 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Stephanie Goldfarb Herrera on behalf of Intel Corporation (Herrera, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 01/02 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Achyut Jayant Phadke on behalf of Intel Corporation (Phadke, Achyut)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 01/02 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Gregory P. Stone on behalf of Intel Corporation (Stone, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss Fri 12/27 5:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), 12(f) filed by Intel Corporation. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 2/4/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. Responses due by 1/10/2025. Replies due by 1/17/2025.(Aull, Laura Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/27 5:15 PM
NOTICE by Intel Corporation of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding [L.R. 3-13](Aull, Laura Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
14 14 motion Transfer Case Fri 12/27 5:01 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to the District of Delaware filed by Intel Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 1/10/2025. Replies due by 1/17/2025.(Aull, Laura Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Achyut J. Phadke ISO Motion to Transfer,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Friday, December 13, 2024
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 12/13 11:32 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Intel Corporation.. (Aull, Laura Ashley)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 11/29 2:35 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 12/13/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
11 11 order Order Wed 11/27 8:14 AM
ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen on November 27, 2024. Dkt. 9 is approved. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
10 10 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 11/26 3:14 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Intel Corporation and Civil Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Conflicts and Interested Entities and Persons (Aull, Laura Ashley)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 11/26 2:54 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (L.R. 6-1(A)) filed by Intel Corporation. (Aull, Laura Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/19 11:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Vanvalkenburgh. Intel Corporation served on 11/13/2024, answer due 12/4/2024. (Lyon, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 11/07 4:49 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Vanvalkenburgh.. (Cho, Christin)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 11/07 4:21 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Mark Vanvalkenburgh (Cho, Christin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 11/06 11:36 AM
Summons Issued as to Intel Corporation. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 11/06 11:24 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2025 09:30 AM in San Jose - To be held by Zoom. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 11/06 8:25 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/20/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 11/05 7:37 PM
Proposed Summons. (Cho, Christin)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/05 7:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Intel Corporation ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20021918.). Filed by Mark Vanvalkenburgh.(Cho, Christin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet