New Jersey District Court
Judge:Renee Marie Bumb
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:24-cv-10311
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2024
Case in other court:Burlington County Superior, BUR-L-83-00024
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 4:32 AM EDT
Cross Claimant
HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Represented By
ALICIA LYNNE CALAF
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Cross Defendant
HOME DEPOT MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Represented By
ALICIA LYNNE CALAF
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Cross Defendant
HOME DEPOT REALTY, INC.
Represented By
ALICIA LYNNE CALAF
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Cross Defendant
HOME DEPOT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By
ALICIA LYNNE CALAF
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Cross Defendant
THE HOME DEPOT
Represented By
ALICIA LYNNE CALAF
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Cross Defendant
THE HOME DEPOT, INC.
Represented By
ALICIA LYNNE CALAF
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
HOME DEPOT MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Represented By
ALICIA LYNNE CALAF
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
HOME DEPOT REALTY, INC.
Represented By
ALICIA LYNNE CALAF
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
HOME DEPOT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By
ALICIA LYNNE CALAF
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Represented By
ALICIA LYNNE CALAF
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
THE HOME DEPOT
Represented By
ALICIA LYNNE CALAF
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Defendant
THE HOME DEPOT, INC.
Represented By
ALICIA LYNNE CALAF
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE HEARD
Represented By
JOEL R. ROSENBERG
Stark & Stark, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
19 19 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/16 2:43 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/25/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Counsel shall dial 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID 978 090 680# to connect to the call. Pretrial Factual Discovery is extended to 7/30/2025. If expert discovery will be served, dispositive motions shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court no later than December 5, 2025. If expert discovery will not be served, dispositive motions shall be filed by September 30, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 4/16/2025. (sms2)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 04/16 2:20 PM
TEXT ORDER: By consent of the parties, and for good cause shown, the defendant's oral application on 4/16/25 for an extension of time to complete discovery shall be, and is hereby, GRANTED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 4/16/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 04/16 2:19 PM
Defendant's Oral Application on 4/16/25 for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (mb, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 04/16 2:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/16/2025. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
16 16 order Order Tue 04/08 2:26 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having received the April 8, 2025 letter request [ECF No. 15] submitted by Joel R. Rosenberg, Esquire, counsel for Plaintiff, seeking to adjourn the upcoming telephone status conference; and Defendants not objecting to this request; it is hereby ORDERED that the April 10, 2025 telephone status conference is RESCHEDULED to April 16, 2025 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID: 836 803 68#. . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 4/8/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Tue 04/08 11:49 AM
Letter from Joel R. Rosenberg,, Esquire. (ROSENBERG, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
14 14 order Order Mon 02/10 1:34 PM
TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the status conference scheduled for March 31, 2025 is being RESCHEDULED to April 10, 2025 at 10:30 am.All parties shall dial 1-856-210-8988 conference ID: 836 803 68# to connect to the cconference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 2/10/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
13 13 order Order Mon 02/03 2:06 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone status conference on February 3, 2025; it is hereby ORDERED that a follow-up telephone status conference is scheduled for March 31, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID: 836 803 68#. The deadlines set forth in the December 3, 2024 Scheduling Order [ECF No. 11] remain in effect. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 2/3/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 02/03 1:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/3/2025. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
12 12 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 12/04 2:46 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by JACQUELINE HEARD. (ROSENBERG, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/03 3:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 2/3/2025 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Counsel shall dial 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID 861 347 356# to connect to the call. Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2025. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 5/30/2025. If expert discovery will be served, dispositive motions shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court no later than 10/15/2025. If expert discovery will not be served, dispositive motions shall be filed by 7/30/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 12/3/2024. (lm, )
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 12/03 11:51 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by JACQUELINE HEARD.(ROSENBERG, JOEL)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 12/03 1:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/3/2024. Scheduling Order to be entered. (mb, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 12/03 1:53 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (dmw )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
9 9 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 11/19 5:34 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by JACQUELINE HEARD.(ROSENBERG, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
8 8 order Order Tue 11/12 2:47 PM
TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on at shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-856-210-8988 conference ID: 727 924 727# Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 11/12/24. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
7 7 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Fri 11/08 9:07 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 12/3/2024 at 12:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 11/08/2024. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
6 6 8 pgs cmp Crossclaim Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 11/07 1:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against HOME DEPOT MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC, HOME DEPOT REALTY, INC., HOME DEPOT SERVICES, LLC, THE HOME DEPOT, THE HOME DEPOT, INC. by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (CALAF, ALICIA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
5 5 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 11/06 11:41 AM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (CALAF, ALICIA)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 11/06 11:40 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (CALAF, ALICIA)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 11/06 8:55 AM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (CALAF, ALICIA)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 11/06 8:54 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (CALAF, ALICIA)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 11/06 8:52 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. from Burlington County Superior, case number BUR-L-1983-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15789364), filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC..(CALAF, ALICIA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
qc QC - Electronic Signature Does Not Match E-filer Wed 11/06 11:20 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Corporate Disclosure Statement2 and the Diversity Disclosure Statement3 submitted by ALICIA LYNNE CALAF, ESQ. on 11/6/2024 contain an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (js)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 11/06 11:48 AM
Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (tf, )
Related: [-]