Dustin Hand v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-06332 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Dustin Hand
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 06, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 11/06 8:59 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 11/5/2024), Dustin Hand v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-06332-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Middle District of Alabama (wmil, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12090014.), filed by Dustin Hand. Service due by 2/3/2025(wmil, ) |