New Jersey District Court
Judge:Evelyn Padin
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:24-cv-10317
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2024
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
ORTHO SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By
CALI L. CHANDIRAMANI
Goldberg Segalla
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDREW LEITHER
Represented By
GREGORY N. FILOSA
Filosa Graff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Mon 04/28 3:19 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 6/27/2025. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 4/28/2025. (bt)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 04/28 3:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Evelyn Padin: Settlement Conference held on 4/28/2025. (Court Reporter, Joanne Sekella (973-776-7753)) (bt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/16 9:24 AM
LETTER ORDER granting the parties request for permission to submit a brief (3-page), confidential letter summarizing our respective views on the case and settlement positions in hopes of narrowing the issues and expediting the negotiations by April 21, 2025. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 4/15/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Tue 04/15 10:15 AM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Separate, Confidential, Ex Parte Pre-Settlement Conference Submissions by ORTHO SOLUTIONS, INC.. (CHANDIRAMANI, CALI)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Tue 04/15 4:30 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The5 Letter Request for Leave to File Separate, Confidential, Ex Parte Pre-Settlement Conference Submissions filed by CALI L. CHANDIRAMANI on 4/15/2025 was submitted incorrectly as a MOTION. Please be advised to only use the Motion event category when submitting a formal motion pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1. For future filings of this nature, kindly use the event "Letter" found under Civil -> Other Filings -> Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court (ld)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
12 12 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 03/12 12:09 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall appear for an in-person settlement conference on 4/28/25 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4C before Judge Evelyn Padin. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 3/12/2025. (bt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
11 11 misc Letter Mon 03/10 7:16 PM
Letter from Gregory N. Filosa, Esq. re 10 Text Order. (FILOSA, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
10 10 order Text Order Fri 03/07 10:41 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' request, D.E.9 . The parties shall confirm by 3/11/25 whether they can attend an in-person settlement conference at 10 a.m. on 4/1/25. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 3/7/2025. (bt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
9 9 misc Letter Thu 02/27 3:37 PM
Letter from CALI CHANDIRAMANI re 8 Text Order. (CHANDIRAMANI, CALI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
8 8 order Text Order Wed 01/29 10:42 AM
TEXT ORDER: As discussed at the pre-motion conference, the parties shall report to the Court within 30 days advising whether this matter has been resolved or if further Court assistance is needed. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 1/29/2025. (bt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 01/28 11:02 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Evelyn Padin: Pre-Motion Telephone Conference held on 1/28/2025 off the record. (bt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
7 7 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/15 3:45 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Pre-Motion Conference is set before Judge Evely Padin on 1/28/2025 at 11:00 AM. Dial in number 973-437-5535, Phone conference ID: 421913315#. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 1/15/2025. (bt)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
6 6 misc Letter Mon 01/13 2:27 PM
Letter from Gregory N. Filosa, Esq. re5 Letter. (FILOSA, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
5 5 misc Letter Mon 01/06 9:26 AM
Letter from Cali L. Chandiramani. (CHANDIRAMANI, CALI)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CALI L. CHANDIRAMANI on behalf of ORTHO SOLUTIONS, INC. (CHANDIRAMANI, CALI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 11/13 1:29 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ORTHO SOLUTIONS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11/07 5:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANDREW LEITHER. ORTHO SOLUTIONS, INC. waiver sent on 11/6/2024, answer due 1/6/2025. (FILOSA, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 11/07 11:55 AM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (krg, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Entry made by Clerk's Office Staff Thu 11/07 12:22 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the entry made adding judges to this case this morning was docketed in error. Case will be assigned randomly. Please disregard. (jr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 11/07 12:28 PM
Case assigned to Judge Evelyn Padin and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/06 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT against ANDREW LEITHER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15790415) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ANDREW LEITHER.(FILOSA, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet