Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-06337
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2024
Terminated:Feb 03, 2025
Case in other court:Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-10785
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
LN Curtis & Sons
Defendant
Lion Apparel Inc
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
Defendant
MSA Safety Incorporated
Defendant
MSA Safety Sales LLC
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
Defendant
Milliken & Company
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
Defendant
Narcote Holding Corporation
Defendant
Narcote LLC
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Lakeland Industries Inc
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
Defendant
TenCate Protective Fabrics USA
6501Mall Blvd.
Union City, GA 30291
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Veridian Limited
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group Inc
Defendant
Corveta, Inc.
Defendant
3M Company
Represented By
Daniel Leslie Ring
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
Defendant
Innotex Corporation
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
Defendant
Globe Holding Company LLC
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Plaintiff
Paul Sherrod
Represented By
William T Gibbs
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Mitchell Wald Bild
Corboy & Demetrio, P.C.
contact info
Kenneth Thomas Lumb
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Rupsis
Represented By
William T Gibbs
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Mitchell Wald Bild
Corboy & Demetrio, P.C.
contact info
Kenneth Thomas Lumb
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Rispoli
Represented By
William T Gibbs
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Mitchell Wald Bild
Corboy & Demetrio, P.C.
contact info
Kenneth Thomas Lumb
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Plaintiff
Jean Rispoli
Represented By
William T Gibbs
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Mitchell Wald Bild
Corboy & Demetrio, P.C.
contact info
Kenneth Thomas Lumb
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Halgren
Represented By
William T Gibbs
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Mitchell Wald Bild
Corboy & Demetrio, P.C.
contact info
Kenneth Thomas Lumb
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Plaintiff
Carl John Halgren, Jr.
Represented By
William T Gibbs
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Mitchell Wald Bild
Corboy & Demetrio, P.C.
contact info
Kenneth Thomas Lumb
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffery Newton
Represented By
William T Gibbs
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Mitchell Wald Bild
Corboy & Demetrio, P.C.
contact info
Kenneth Thomas Lumb
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, February 03, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/03 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jeffery Newton, Paul Sherrod, Brian Rupsis, Joseph Rispoli, Jean Rispoli, Carl John Halgren, Jr., Heather Halgren, Margaret JanesAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-06337-RMG, 2:24-cv-06338-RMG(Gibbs, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Thursday, November 14, 2024
16 16 service Certificate of Service Thu 11/14 12:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffery Newton on all defendants(Lumb, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service on defendant AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service on defendant Allstar Fire Equipment Co.,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service on defendant Amerex Corporation,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service on defendant Archroma U.S., Inc.,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service on defendant Arkema, Inc.,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service on defendant Buckeye Fire Equipment Co,,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service on defendant Carrier Global Corporation,
Att: 8 Certificate of Service on defendant CB Garment, Inc.,
Att: 9 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemdesign Products, Inc.,
Att: 10 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemguard, Inc.,
Att: 11 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemicals, Inc.,
Att: 12 Certificate of Service on defendant Clariant Corporation,
Att: 13 Certificate of Service on defendant Corveta, Inc.,
Att: 14 Certificate of Service on defendant Daikin America, Inc.,
Att: 15 Certificate of Service on defendant Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.,
Att: 16 Certificate of Service on defendant Dynax Corporation,
Att: 17 Certificate of Service on defendant E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co., Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise,
Att: 18 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire Service Plus, Inc.,
Att: 19 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire-Dex, LLC,
Att: 20 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Holding Company, LLC,
Att: 21 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Manufacturing Company LLC,
Att: 22 Certificate of Service on defendant Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.,
Att: 23 Certificate of Service on defendant Innotex Corporation,
Att: 24 Certificate of Service on defendant Johnson Controls, Inc.,
Att: 25 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., (f/k/a Chubb National Foam, Inc., f/k/a National Foam, Inc.),
Att: 26 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. (f/k/a Fenwal, Inc.), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc.,
Att: 27 Civil Cover Sheet on defendant Kidde PLC, Inc., (f/k/a Williams Holdins, Inc.), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc.,
Att: 28 Certificate of Service on defendant Lakeland Industries, Inc.,
Att: 29 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Apparel, Inc.,
Att: 30 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Group, Inc.,
Att: 31 Certificate of Service on defendant L.N. Curtis & Sons,
Att: 32 Certificate of Service on defendant Mallory Safety and Supply, LLC,
Att: 33 Certificate of Service on defendant Milliken & Company,
Att: 34 Certificate of Service on defendant Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC,
Att: 35 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Incorporated,
Att: 36 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Sales, LLC,
Att: 37 Certificate of Service on defendant Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.,
Att: 38 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote, LLC (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.),
Att: 39 Certificate of Service on defendant Nation Ford Chemical Company,
Att: 40 Certificate of Service on defendant National Foam, Inc.,
Att: 41 Certificate of Service on defendant PBI Performance Products, Inc.,
Att: 42 Certificate of Service on defendant Perimeter Solutions, LP,
Att: 43 Certificate of Service on defendant Ricochet Manufacturing Co., Inc.,
Att: 44 Certificate of Service on defendant Safety Components Fabric Technologies, Inc.,
Att: 45 Certificate of Service on defendant Stedfast USA, Inc.,
Att: 46 Certificate of Service on defendant Tencate Protective Fabrics USA, d/b/a Southern Mills, Inc.,
Att: 47 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise,
Att: 48 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise,
Att: 49 Certificate of Service on defendant Tyco Fire Products, L.P. as Successor-In-Interest to The Ansul Company,
Att: 50 Certificate of Service on defendant United Technologies Corporation,
Att: 51 Certificate of Service on defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (f/k/a GE Interlogix, Inc.), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc.,
Att: 52 Certificate of Service on defendant Veridian Limited d/b/a Veridian Fire Protective Gear,
Att: 53 Certificate of Service on defendant Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc., d/b/a "The Fire Store",
Att: 54 Certificate of Service on defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.,
Att: 55 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote Holding Corporation (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.)
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
15 15 service Summons Issued Wed 11/06 3:53 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
14 14 misc MDL Member Case Opened Wed 11/06 1:49 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-10785, Jeffrey Newton et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-06337-RMG (jbin)
Related: [-]
13 13 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 11/06 1:42 PM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:24-cv-10785. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
12 12 transfer Case Transferred Out - District Not MDL Wed 11/06 9:48 AM
Transferred to the USDC for the District of South Carolina the electronic record.(gcy, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Wed 11/06 9:33 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to District of South Carolina. Mailed Notice.(gcy, )
Related: [-]
10 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jeffery Newton, Paul Sherrod, Brian Rupsis, Joseph Rispoli, Jean Rispoli, Carl John Halgren, Jr., Heather Halgren by William T Gibbs (Gibbs, William) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/6/2024.]
Related: [-]
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2873 Conditional Transfer Order filed 11/4/24). (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/6/2024.]
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 11/06 9:36 AM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2873 Conditional Transfer Order filed 11/4/24). (gcy, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
9 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jeffery Newton by Mitchell Wald Bild (Bild, Mitchell) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/6/2024.]
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jeffery Newton by Kenneth Thomas Lumb (Lumb, Kenneth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/6/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
7 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 12/20/2024 at 9:45 AM as an in-person hearing. Defendant(s) is directed to advise the Plaintiff(s) of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. If the parties agree to consent jurisdiction before the Magistrate Judge, all parties must sign the consent form and electronically file the signed form on the case docket. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/6/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
6 6 MINUTE entry before the Executive Committee: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman for all further proceedings pursuant to IOP 13(f)(1) per 28 USC 455(b)(4). Mailed notice. (smb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/6/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Reassignment
Monday, October 21, 2024
5 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record.(smb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/6/2024.]
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/6/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 3M Company by Daniel Leslie Ring (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/6/2024.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 3M Company (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/6/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/6/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2024-L-10942) filed by 3M Company Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22625320.(Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/6/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (bi, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/6/2024.]
Related: [-]