California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:24-bk-12853
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $50,001 to $100,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Casablanca The Restaurant Corp.
6800 W Coast Hwy
Newport Beach, CA 92663-1765
Represented By
Andrew S Bisom
Bisom Law Group
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 30 seconds ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
58 58 motion Compensation (motion) Wed 05/14 4:42 PM
Application for Compensation with Notice of Opportunity and Proof of Service. for Robert Paul Goe (TR), Trustee, Period: 11/7/2024 to 5/14/2025, Fee: $5,941.00, Expenses: $0. Filed by Attorney Robert Paul Goe (TR) (Goe (TR), Robert)
Related: [-]
57 57 answer Response Wed 05/14 3:29 PM
Response to Related [+] Subchapter V Trustees Comments To Motion To Dismiss Bankruptcy Case with proof of service Filed by Trustee Robert Paul Goe (TR) (Goe (TR), Robert)
Related: [-] 55 Motion to Dismiss Debtor filed by Debtor Casablanca The Restaurant Corp.
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
56 56 notice Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) Tue 05/13 9:37 PM
Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) Filed by Debtor Casablanca The Restaurant Corp. Related [+]. (Bisom, Andrew)
Related: [-] 55 Motion to Dismiss Debtor Filed by Debtor Casablanca The Restaurant Corp.
55 55 motion Dismiss Debtor (motion) Tue 05/13 9:19 PM
Motion to Dismiss Debtor Filed by Debtor Casablanca The Restaurant Corp. (Bisom, Andrew)
Related: [-]