New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Allyne R Ross
Referred: Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:24-cv-07755
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
CDS Tranportation LLC
Represented By
Deanna Elaine Hazen
Fleischner Potash LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ricardo Mortigo Vigoya
Represented By
Deanna Elaine Hazen
Fleischner Potash LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherzod Ismatov
Represented By
Michelle Jean-Jacques
Harmon Linder & Rogowsky
contact info
Igor Tarasov
Law Offices Of Tarasov & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
13 13 misc Status Report Mon 04/28 2:15 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Letter - April, 2025 by CDS Tranportation LLC, Ricardo Mortigo Vigoya (Hazen, Deanna)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Mon 04/28 4:55 PM
ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report by June 2, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/28/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
12 12 misc Status Report Wed 03/26 3:30 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Letter - March, 2025 by CDS Tranportation LLC, Ricardo Mortigo Vigoya (Hazen, Deanna)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 03/26 11:47 AM
ORDER: The parties were ordered to file a joint status report by March 25, 2025. No such document was filed on the docket. The parties shall file a joint status report by March 26, 2025, at 5:00 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 3/26/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/26 4:39 PM
ORDER granting12 . The Court extends the discovery deadlines as follows: Fact discovery shall be completed by May 25, 2025. Plaintiff shall make Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosures, if any, by June 23, 2025. Defendants shall make Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosures, if any, by July 24, 2025. All discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed by August 25, 2025. The final date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice, if any, shall be September 1, 2025. There will be no further extensions to these deadlines. The parties shall file a joint status report by April 30, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 3/26/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
11 11 misc Status Report Tue 02/25 3:12 PM
STATUS REPORT by CDS Tranportation LLC, Ricardo Mortigo Vigoya (Hazen, Deanna)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Letter Tue 02/25 2:51 PM
Letter Joint Status Letter - February 25, 2025 by CDS Tranportation LLC, Ricardo Mortigo Vigoya (Hazen, Deanna)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Tue 02/25 3:46 PM
ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report by March 25, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 2/25/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
9 9 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 01/28 2:26 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition by Ricardo Mortigo Vigoya, CDS Tranportation LLC. (Hazen, Deanna)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Tue 01/28 3:02 PM
ORDER: The parties are reminded that they shall refrain from filing any discovery on the docket. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 1/28/2025. (GWM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
8 8 misc Status Report Fri 01/24 1:41 PM
STATUS REPORT by Sherzod Ismatov (Jean-Jacques, Michelle)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Fri 01/24 4:25 PM
ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report by February 25, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 1/24/2025. (GWM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/10 11:06 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo: An initial conference was held on the record on December 10, 2024. Counsel appeared. The parties' proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order was discussed. Following that discussion, the Court set the below deadlines. Plaintiff shall provide executed medical releases to Defendants by December 20, 2024. The date for completion of automatic disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) shall be January 10, 2025. No amendment of the pleadings will be permitted after January 17, 2025. No additional parties may be joined after January 17, 2025. The parties shall file a joint status report by January 24, 2025 outlining the current status of discovery. Fact discovery shall be completed by April 10, 2025. Plaintiff shall make Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosures, if any, by May 9, 2025. Defendants shall make Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosures, if any, by June 9, 2025. All discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed by July 11, 2025. The final date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice, if any, shall be July 18, 2025. No extension of the above deadlines will be granted except upon a motion, filed prior to the deadline and consistent with Judge Marutollo's Individual Practices and Rules, showing good cause for the extension. The parties are reminded that "a finding of 'good cause' depends on the diligence of the moving party." Parker v. Columbia Pictures Industries, 204 F.3d 326, 340 (2d Cir. 2000). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, the Court has an obligation "to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding." (FTR Log #10:30-10:41.) (EG)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
7 7 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 12/06 5:03 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Ricardo Mortigo Vigoya, CDS Tranportation LLC (Hazen, Deanna)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/06 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Jean-Jacques on behalf of Sherzod Ismatov (aty to be noticed) (Jean-Jacques, Michelle)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/06 10:57 AM
ORDER: The parties were ordered to file the proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by December 5, 2024. No such document was filed on the docket. The parties are ordered to file the proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by December 6, 2024, at 5:00 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 12/6/2024. (EG)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/08 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Deanna Elaine Hazen on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Hazen, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Affirmation of Service
4 4 order Scheduling Order Fri 11/08 10:53 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held on December 10, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 324 North before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. The parties must complete the attached proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and file it on ECF no later than December 5, 2024. Plaintiff is directed to ensure that all Defendants are aware of this conference. Counsel with knowledge of the case must attend the conference; per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. The parties are directed to review this Court's Individual Practices and Rules in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 11/8/2024. (EG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Individual Practices and Rules
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 11/08 8:00 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 11/08 7:59 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 11/08 7:55 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal Fri 11/08 7:58 AM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 11/06 6:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Ricardo Mortigo Vigoya and CDS Transportation LLC from Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 523833/2024. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18471704) (Hazen, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affirmation of Service upon Ricardo Mortigo Vigoya,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affirmation of Service upon CDS Transportation LLC,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Verified Answer,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Discovery Demands,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service