Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:24-cv-01224
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
305 DevCo, Inc.
Represented By
Anna Marie Gamez
contact info
Ryan Michael Lindsay
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Kelly Elizabeth Rowe
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Barsky
contact info
Joseph Benedict Cicero
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Defendant
InformData Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Ahmad Takouche
contact info
Steve Hanle
contact info
Bindu Ann George Palapura
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Defendant
InformData, LLC
Represented By
Ahmad Takouche
contact info
Steve Hanle
contact info
Bindu Ann George Palapura
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sentinel Information Systems LLC
Represented By
Ahmad Takouche
contact info
Steve Hanle
contact info
Bindu Ann George Palapura
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Efrain Logreira
Represented By
Anna Marie Gamez
contact info
Ryan Michael Lindsay
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Kelly Elizabeth Rowe
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Barsky
contact info
Joseph Benedict Cicero
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Safety Holdings Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer Ying
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Natalie A. Bennett
contact info
Calvin M. Brien
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
misc Deficiency re Courtesy Copies (SRF cases) Thu 05/01 3:37 PM
SECOND REQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #24 and31 in an envelope addressed to Judge Fallon's chambers. (lih)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
32 32 order Order Referring Motion Tue 04/15 1:42 PM
ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss (D.I.23 ) is now REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/15/2025. *Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(nms)
Related: [-]
misc Deficiency re Courtesy Copies (SRF cases) Tue 04/15 4:13 PM
REQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #23 thru26 ,30 and31 in an envelope or box addressed to Judge Fallon's chambers. Counsel is advised to ensure that each document's D.I. number is written in the upper right-hand corner of each courtesy copy. Counsel is also advised that each document must be bound in accordance with Local Rule 7.1.3(a)(2). (lih)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
31 31 respm Brief - Reply Fri 01/24 4:56 PM
REPLY BRIEF re23 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Sentinel Information Systems LLC, InformData Holdings, LLC, InformData, LLC. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 1/24/2025 (nms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
30 30 respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Tue 01/14 4:00 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Safety Holdings Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/21/2025. (Ying, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
29 29 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Mon 12/23 4:48 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent InformData Holdings, LLC for InformData, LLC filed by InformData, LLC. (Palapura, Bindu)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Mon 12/23 4:47 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by InformData Holdings, LLC. (Palapura, Bindu)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Mon 12/23 4:46 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent InformData Holdings, LLC for Sentinel Information Systems LLC filed by Sentinel Information Systems LLC. (Palapura, Bindu)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Statement Mon 12/23 4:44 PM
Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, by Sentinel Information Systems LLC, InformData Holdings, LLC, InformData, LLC. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 12/23/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Declaration Mon 12/23 4:42 PM
DECLARATION of Steve Hanle re23 MOTION to Dismiss, by Sentinel Information Systems LLC, InformData Holdings, LLC, InformData, LLC.(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 12/23/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-3
24 24 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Mon 12/23 4:41 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sentinel Information Systems LLC, InformData Holdings, LLC, InformData, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/6/2025. (Palapura, Bindu)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Dismiss/Fail to State Claim Mon 12/23 4:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Sentinel Information Systems LLC, InformData Holdings, LLC, InformData, LLC.(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 12/23/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/23 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Michael Lindsay and Kelly Elizabeth Rowe on behalf of 305 DevCo, Inc., Efrain Logreira (Rowe, Kelly) Modified on 12/23/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Mon 12/23 12:43 PM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The notice of appearance filed at D.I. 23 has been removed from the docket as it was duplicative in part to the notice filed at D.I.22 . (nms)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Mon 12/23 12:49 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anna Marie Gamez for 305 DevCo, Inc. and Efrain Logreira added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Mon 12/23 12:51 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel J. Barsky for 305 DevCo, Inc. and Efrain Logreira added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
21 21 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Fri 12/20 3:59 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Anna Marie Gamez and Daniel J. Barsky. ( re20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anna Marie Gamez and Daniel J. Barsky of Holland & Knight LLP )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4576028).(Cicero, Joseph)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/20 3:58 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anna Marie Gamez and Daniel J. Barsky of Holland & Knight LLP - filed by 305 DevCo, Inc., Efrain Logreira. (Cicero, Joseph)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 12/20 3:52 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by 305 DevCo, Inc.. (Cicero, Joseph)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/20 3:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by 305 DevCo, Inc., Efrain Logreira.(Cicero, Joseph)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Fri 12/20 12:34 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Natalie A. Bennett and Calvin M. Brien. ( re16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Natalie A. Bennett and Calvin M. Brien )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4575518).(Ying, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/20 12:32 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Natalie A. Bennett and Calvin M. Brien - filed by Safety Holdings Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 12/20 8:44 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ahmad Takouche,Steve Hanle for InformData Holdings, LLC,Ahmad Takouche,Steve Hanle for InformData, LLC,Ahmad Takouche,Steve Hanle for Sentinel Information Systems LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (scs)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Fri 12/20 12:44 PM
SO ORDERED, re16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Natalie A. Bennett and Calvin M. Brien filed by Safety Holdings Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2024. (aas)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 12/20 4:23 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Calvin M. Brien, Natalie A. Bennett for Safety Holdings Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Fri 12/20 4:35 PM
SO ORDERED, re20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anna Marie Gamez and Daniel J. Barsky of Holland & Knight LLP, filed by 305 DevCo, Inc., Efrain Logreira. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
order SO ORDERED Thu 12/19 8:52 AM
SO ORDERED, re15 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
15 15 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 12/18 6:44 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to move to dismiss the Complaint, for Plaintiff to file its answering brief in opposition to any motion to dismiss, and for Defendants to file their reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss to December 23, 2024, January 14, 2025, and January 24, 2025 respectively - filed by Sentinel Information Systems LLC, InformData Holdings, LLC, InformData, LLC. (Palapura, Bindu)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Wed 12/18 4:47 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Steven M. Hanle and Ahmad S. Takouche. ( re13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Hanle and Ahmad S. Takouche of Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth LLP )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4573745).(Palapura, Bindu)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/18 4:45 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Hanle and Ahmad S. Takouche of Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth LLP - filed by Sentinel Information Systems LLC, InformData Holdings, LLC, InformData, LLC. (Palapura, Bindu)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Wed 12/18 4:56 PM
SO ORDERED, re13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Hanle and Ahmad S. Takouche of Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth LLP filed by InformData, LLC, InformData Holdings, LLC, Sentinel Information Systems LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/2024. (aas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/22 3:12 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time - filed by Safety Holdings Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) Modified on 11/22/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 11/22 1:21 PM
STIPULATION and Order Extending the Time to Respond to the Complaint - filed by 305 DevCo, Inc., Efrain Logreira. (Cicero, Joseph) Modified on 11/22/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 11/22 3:10 PM
SO ORDERED, re11 STIPULATION and Order Extending the Time to Respond to the Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: 305 DevCo, Inc. answer due 12/20/2024; Efrain Logreira answer due 12/20/2024). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/22/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 11/22 4:54 PM
SO ORDERED, re12 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: InformData Holdings, LLC answer due 12/20/2024; InformData, LLC answer due 12/20/2024; Sentinel Information Systems LLC answer due 12/20/2024). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/22/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/20 10:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safety Holdings Inc..305 DevCo, Inc. served on 11/15/2024, answer due 12/6/2024. (Ying, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/13 11:30 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
9 9 service Summons Reissued - Alias Summons Tue 11/12 8:29 AM
Alias Summons issued as to 305 DevCo, Inc.. (vfm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/11 4:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safety Holdings Inc..Efrain Logreira served on 11/7/2024, answer due 12/2/2024. (Ying, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/06 2:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safety Holdings Inc..InformData, LLC served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024. (Ying, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/06 2:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safety Holdings Inc..InformData Holdings, LLC served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024. (Ying, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/06 2:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safety Holdings Inc..Sentinel Information Systems LLC served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024. (Ying, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 11/06 8:35 AM
Summons Issued as to 305 DevCo, Inc. on 11/5/2024; InformData Holdings, LLC on 11/5/2024; InformData, LLC on 11/5/2024; Efrain Frank Logreira on 11/5/2024; Sentinel Information Systems LLC on 11/5/2024.(cdd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued,
Att: 2 Summons Issued,
Att: 3 Summons Issued,
Att: 4 Summons Issued
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Wed 11/06 8:33 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Safety Topco Holdings LP, Other Affiliate Trident VIII, L.P., Other Affiliate Trident VIII Parallel Fund, L.P. for Safety Holdings Inc. filed by Safety Holdings Inc.. (cdd)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Wed 11/06 8:30 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cdd)
Related: [-]
1 1 35 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/06 8:29 AM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against 305 DevCo, Inc., InformData Holdings, LLC, InformData, LLC, Efrain Frank Logreira, Sentinel Information Systems LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4541162.) - filed by Safety Holdings Inc..(cdd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-22,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet