Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Denise J Casper
Case #: 1:24-cv-12802
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Cloud Investment Holdings, Ltd.
Defendant
Temupaid LLC
Defendant
Does 1-5
Plaintiff
Whaleco Inc.
Represented By
Michelle Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Matan Shacham
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Erin E. Meyer
Keker And Van Nest LLP
contact info
Ajay S. Krishnan
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
19 19 motion Entry of Default Fri 05/16 9:05 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to TemuPaid LLC by Whaleco Inc..(Meyer, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
18 18 23 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 05/14 4:12 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to TemuPaid LLC filed by Whaleco Inc.. (SEC)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Default Judgment Tue 05/06 4:31 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to TemuPaid LLC by Whaleco Inc..(Meyer, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Whaleco Inc.s Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunctive Relief
Monday, April 07, 2025
16 16 order Notice of Entry of Default by Clerk Mon 04/07 11:29 AM
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Temupaid LLC(SEC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order Regarding Motions for Default Judgment
Friday, April 04, 2025
15 15 misc Request for notice of default Fri 04/04 4:29 PM
Request for notice of default by Whaleco Inc. - Application for Entry of Default as to Temupaid LLC . (Meyer, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
14 14 misc Affidavit Wed 02/19 6:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Erin Meyer Regarding Alternative Service of TemuPaid LLC by Whaleco Inc.. (Meyer, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/07 10:32 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting12 Motion Alternative Service and Limited Early Discovery by Whaleco Inc. (Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 12/03 6:16 PM
MOTION Alternative Service and Limited Early Discovery by Whaleco Inc..(Meyer, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Erin Meyer,
Att: 2 Declaration of John Nardizzi,
Att: 3 Declaration of Zach Fechheimer,
Att: 4 Declaration of Jill Vaglica,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 11/26 4:59 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matan Shacham. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 11/26 4:57 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michelle Ybarra. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 11/26 4:53 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ajay S. Krishnan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 11/08 12:06 PM
Summons Issued as to Cloud Investment Holdings, Ltd., Does 1-5, Temupaid LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 11/08 11:06 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/07 5:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matan Shacham Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10687632 by Whaleco Inc..(Meyer, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification in support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/07 5:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michelle Ybarra Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10687625 by Whaleco Inc..(Meyer, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification in support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/07 5:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ajay Krishnan Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10687614 by Whaleco Inc..(Meyer, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification in support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion
3 3 misc Report on the filing of patent/trademark case Thu 11/07 5:38 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Meyer, Erin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet Thu 11/07 5:35 PM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Whaleco Inc.. (Meyer, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/06 10:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Cloud Investment Holdings, Ltd., Temupaid LLC Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10685830 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Whaleco Inc..(Meyer, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons - Cloud Investment Holdings, Ltd.,
Att: 3 Summons - TemuPaid LLC