Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Randal S Mashburn
Case #: 3:24-bk-04309
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ludlow Hospitality, LLC
1007 Mooreland Blvd
Brentwood, TN 37027-7942
Represented By
KEITH DAVID SLOCUM
Slocum Law
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 12:03 PM CDT
Saturday, May 03, 2025
55 55 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 05/03 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 54 Order Scheduling Hearing
Thursday, May 01, 2025
54 54 order Schedule Hearing with Last Day for Filing Objections Thu 05/01 8:50 AM
Order Scheduling Hearing on Debtor's Second Amended Plan of Reorganization and Establishing Confirmation Procedures . Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 6/10/2025 at 09:30 AM, Courtroom 1 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Objections due by 6/2/2025. Response to any Objection deadline is 6/6/2025. In-person. Signed on 5/1/2025. (jtd)
Related: [-] Related Doc#:53
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
53 53 plan Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Wed 04/30 12:53 PM
Debtor's Second Amended Plan Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan .Certificate of Service Mailed on 4/30/25. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Ludlow Hospitality, LLC. (SLOCUM, KEITH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Mailing List
52 52 plan Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Wed 04/30 12:30 PM
Debtor's Second Amended Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan .Certificate of Service Mailed on 4/30/25. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Ludlow Hospitality, LLC. (SLOCUM, KEITH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Mailing List
Att: 4 Exhibit
Monday, April 28, 2025
51 51 misc Operating Report Mon 04/28 9:15 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period (Month Ending) March . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Ludlow Hospitality, LLC. (SLOCUM, KEITH)
Related: [-]