California Central District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-06694
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Terminated:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 19, 2024 12:57 PM PST
Defendant
Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante (1)
Represented By
Rebecca Kathleen Harris
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lisa Jane Lindhorst
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/29/2024 2:51 PM PST
Monday, November 04, 2024
1 1 15 pgs COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante in violation of 21:841(a)(1),(b)(1)(A)(viii). Approved by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin as to Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante (1). (jb)
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Myah Ofeibia Saakwa-Mante. (jb)
Related: [-]