Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-06962
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Nov 07, 2024 12:21 AM MST
Defendant
Jorge Jimenez (1)
Represented By
Mark Lee Williams
Law Office Of Mark L Williams
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Gordon E Davenport, III
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/07/2024 12:59 AM MST
Monday, November 04, 2024
Arrest of Jorge Jimenez on 11/4/2024. (CMB)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Jorge Jimenez on 11/4/2024. (CMB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
1 1 3 pgs COMPLAINT as to Jorge Jimenez. (CMB)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark Lee Williams appearing for Jorge Jimenez. (JAM)
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Initial Appearance as to Jorge Jimenez held on 11/5/2024. An attorney is appointed to represent the defendant. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Detention Hearing as to the defendant held on 11/5/2024. Defendant ordered/continued released on own recognizance. Defendant is advised on the record. Preliminary Hearing as to the defendant waived on 11/5/2024. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Interpreter N/A English. In the presence of government and defense counsel, the Court orally advises the government of their Brady obligation. Written order to follow. Appearances : AUSA Gordon Davenport for the Government, retained attorney Mark Williams for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Related [+] Hearing held 2:26 PM to 3:35 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
5 5 ORDER: Under federal law, including Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions from the Supreme Court and the Ninth Circuit interpreting Brady , the government has a continuing obligation to produce all information or evidence known to the government relating to guilt or punishment that might reasonably be considered favorable to the defendant's case, even if the evidence is not admissible so long as it is reasonably likely to lead to admissible evidence. See United States v. Price , 566 F.3d 900,913 n.14 (9th Cir. 2009). Accordingly, the court orders the government to produce to the defendant in a timely manner all such information or evidence. Information or evidence may be favorable to a defendant's case if it either may help bolster the defendant's case or impeach a prosecutor's witness or other government evidence. If doubt exists, it should be resolved in favor of the defendant with full disclosure being made. If the government believes that a required disclosure would compromise witness safety, victim rights, national security, a sensitive law-enforcement technique, or any other substantial government interest, the government may apply to the Court for a modification of the requirements of this Disclosure Order, which may include in camera review and/or withholding or subjecting to a protective order all or part of the information. This Disclosure Order is entered under Rule 5(f) and does not relieve any party in this matter of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating either this Disclosure Order or the government's obligations under Brady include, but are not limited to, the following: contempt, sanction, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges. Nothing in this Disclosure Order enlarges or diminishes the government's obligation to disclose information and evidence to a defendant under Brady , as interpreted and applied under Supreme Court and Ninth Circuit precedent. As the Supreme Court noted, "the government violates the Constitution's Due Process Clause 'if it withholds evidence that is favorable to the defense and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment." ' Turner v. United States , 137 S. Ct. 1885, 1888 (2017), quoting Smith v. Cain , 565 U.S. 73, 75 (2012). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins.(JAM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jorge Jimenez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 11/05/2024. (JAM)
Related: [-]