Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant
Case #: 4:24-cv-00993
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 3:43 AM CDT
Consol Plaintiff
Gautam Jadhav
Represented By
Stuart Lee Cochran
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg
contact info
Defendant
M. Shane Henrie
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mary E. Thigpen
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Frank M. Svoboda
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
David A. Rodriquez
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Darren M. Rebelez
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thomas P. Kalmbach
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Steven P. Johnson
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robert W. Ingram
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Larry M. Hutchison
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Globe Life Inc. f/k/a Torchmark Corporation
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
James Matthew Darden
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gary L. Coleman
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alice S. Cho
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jane M. Buchan
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
James P. Brannen
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mark A. Blinn
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cheryl D. Alston
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Marilyn A. Alexander
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Linda L. Addison
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Charles E. Adair
Represented By
Paul Richard Bessette
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Michael John Biles
King & Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Frances Reka Fink
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jui Cheng Hsiao
Represented By
Stuart Lee Cochran
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg
contact info


Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Friday, January 24, 2025
9 9 3 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 01/24 4:49 PM
ORDER granting8 JOINT MOTION to Stay (to Temporarily Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss in Related Case) . Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/24/2025. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
8 8 motion Stay Thu 01/16 2:08 PM
JOINT MOTION to Stay (to Temporarily Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss in Related Case) by Jui Cheng Hsiao, Gautam Jadhav.(Cochran, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 06, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/06 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frances Reka Fink on behalf of All Defendants (Fink, Frances)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/06 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael John Biles on behalf of All Defendants (Biles, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/06 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Richard Bessette on behalf of All Defendants (Bessette, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
4 4 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Fri 01/03 2:39 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Related Actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings, trial, and appeal under Master File No. 4:24-cv-00993-ALM (the "Consolidated Derivative Action"). Within sixty (60) days of entry of this Order approving this Joint Motion, the Parties shall submit to the Court a proposal and schedule regarding next steps in the Consolidated Action. Defendants are not required to answer or otherwise respond to the respective complaints filed in the Consolidated Derivative Action until the deadline set forth in the Court's order on the Parties' proposal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/3/2025. (xl)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 01/03 3:54 PM
Consolidated Defendant Added: Gautam Jadhav Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant GLOBE LIFE INC formerly known as Torchmark Corporation, (4:24-cv-1011-ALM).(xl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 12/02 3:44 PM
TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Amos L. Mazzant, effective immediately. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/2/2024. (xl)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
2 2 motion Consolidate Cases Appoint Counsel Mon 11/25 12:07 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Consolidate Cases , UNOPPOSED MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Co-Lead & Liaison Counsel by Jui Cheng Hsiao.(Cochran, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Glancy Firm Resume,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Rosen Firm Resume,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 07, 2024
1 1 32 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/07 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10469825.), filed by Jui Cheng Hsiao.(Cochran, Stuart) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/7/2024) (xl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 11/07 10:54 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (xl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 11/07 10:55 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (xl)
Related: [-]