Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Jonathan JC Grey
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:24-cv-12964
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Pita Way Rocky River, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Livonia 8 Mile, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Livonia, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Macomb, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Management Group, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Milford, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Mound Rd, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Mt. Pleasant, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way New Hudson, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Owosso, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Plymouth, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Portage, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Rochester, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Lapeer LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way South Lyon, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Thompson Ann Arbor, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Troy, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Walker, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Warren, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way West Oaks, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Westnedge, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way White Lake, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Woodhaven, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Wyoming, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Zeeb Rd, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Lansing, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Auburn, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Bay City, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Beltline, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Berkley, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Birch Run, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Bloomfield, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Chesterfield, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Columbia Ave, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Commerce, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Commissary, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Davison, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Dewitt, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way East Lansing, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Fenton, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Fort Gratiot, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Fort Wayne, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Grand Blanc, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Grand Rapids, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Green Oak, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Howell, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pita Way Lake Orion, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth W. Skaggs
Varnum LLP
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marc D. Miller
Represented By
Kevin J. Stoops
Sommers Schwartz, PC
contact info
Paulina Rose Kennedy
Sommers Schwartz, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, February 07, 2025
10 10 order Staying Case Fri 02/07 9:58 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED STAY AND TOLLING STATUTE OF LIMITATION OF PUTATIVE FLSA COLLECTIVE MEMEBERS Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Fri 02/07 10:00 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 2/13/2025 is Cancelled re9 Notice to Appear. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
9 9 notice Appear* Wed 01/29 12:40 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2025 02:00 PM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey ***Parties are to file a FRCP 26(f) one week prior to conference*** (SOso)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation
Monday, December 30, 2024
8 8 notice Appearance Mon 12/30 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paulina Rose Kennedy on behalf of Marc D. Miller. (Kennedy, Paulina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
7 7 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Thu 12/12 8:34 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Skaggs, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/12 7:56 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Skaggs, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Thu 12/12 7:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Rouse-Ayoub on behalf of All Defendants. (Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance Thu 12/12 7:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth W. Skaggs on behalf of All Defendants. (Skaggs, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
3 3 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/11 3:56 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Pita Way Auburn, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Bay City, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Beltline, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Berkley, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Birch Run, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Bloomfield, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Chesterfield, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Columbia Ave, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Commerce, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Commissary, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Davison, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Dewitt, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way East Lansing, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Fenton, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Fort Gratiot, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Fort Wayne, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Grand Blanc, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Grand Rapids, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Green Oak, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Howell, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Lake Orion, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Lansing, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Lapeer LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Livonia 8 Mile, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Livonia, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Macomb, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Management Group, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Milford, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Mound Rd, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Mt. Pleasant, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way New Hudson, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Owosso, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Plymouth, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Portage, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Rochester, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Rocky River, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way South Lyon, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Thompson Ann Arbor, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Troy, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Walker, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Warren, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way West Oaks, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Westnedge, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way White Lake, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Woodhaven, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way Wyoming, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024; Pita Way, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024. (Stoops, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued* Fri 11/08 2:35 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Pita Way Auburn, Inc., Pita Way Bay City, LLC, Pita Way Beltline, LLC, Pita Way Berkley, LLC, Pita Way Birch Run, LLC, Pita Way Bloomfield, LLC, Pita Way Chesterfield, LLC, Pita Way Columbia Ave, LLC, Pita Way Commerce, Inc., Pita Way Commissary, LLC, Pita Way Davison, Inc., Pita Way Dewitt, LLC, Pita Way East Lansing, LLC, Pita Way Fenton, Inc., Pita Way Fort Gratiot, LLC, Pita Way Fort Wayne, LLC, Pita Way Grand Blanc, Inc., Pita Way Grand Rapids, LLC, Pita Way Green Oak, Inc., Pita Way Howell, LLC, Pita Way Lake Orion, Inc., Pita Way Lansing, LLC, Pita Way Lapeer LLC, Pita Way Livonia 8 Mile, LLC, Pita Way Livonia, Inc., Pita Way Macomb, LLC, Pita Way Management Group, LLC, Pita Way Milford, LLC, Pita Way Mound Rd, LLC, Pita Way Mt. Pleasant, LLC, Pita Way New Hudson, Inc., Pita Way Owosso, LLC, Pita Way Plymouth, LLC, Pita Way Portage, LLC, Pita Way Rochester, LLC, Pita Way Rocky River, LLC, Pita Way South Lyon, LLC, Pita Way Thompson Ann Arbor, LLC, Pita Way Troy, Inc., Pita Way Walker, LLC, Pita Way Warren, Inc., Pita Way West Oaks, LLC, Pita Way Westnedge, LLC, Pita Way White Lake, Inc., Pita Way Woodhaven, LLC, Pita Way Wyoming, LLC, Pita Way Zeeb Rd, LLC, Pita Way, Inc. * (SHic)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 11/08 2:36 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SHic)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
1 1 21 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 11/07 1:07 PM
COMPLAINT Collective Action Complaint filed by Marc D. Miller against Pita Way Auburn, Inc., Pita Way Bay City, LLC, Pita Way Beltline, LLC, Pita Way Berkley, LLC, Pita Way Birch Run, LLC, Pita Way Bloomfield, LLC, Pita Way Chesterfield, LLC, Pita Way Columbia Ave, LLC, Pita Way Commerce, Inc., Pita Way Commissary, LLC, Pita Way Davison, Inc., Pita Way Dewitt, LLC, Pita Way East Lansing, LLC, Pita Way Fenton, Inc., Pita Way Fort Gratiot, LLC, Pita Way Fort Wayne, LLC, Pita Way Grand Blanc, Inc., Pita Way Grand Rapids, LLC, Pita Way Green Oak, Inc., Pita Way Howell, LLC, Pita Way Lake Orion, Inc., Pita Way Lansing, LLC, Pita Way Lapeer LLC, Pita Way Livonia 8 Mile, LLC, Pita Way Livonia, Inc., Pita Way Macomb, LLC, Pita Way Management Group, LLC, Pita Way Milford, LLC, Pita Way Mound Rd, LLC, Pita Way Mt. Pleasant, LLC, Pita Way New Hudson, Inc., Pita Way Owosso, LLC, Pita Way Plymouth, LLC, Pita Way Portage, LLC, Pita Way Rochester, LLC, Pita Way Rocky River, LLC, Pita Way South Lyon, LLC, Pita Way Thompson Ann Arbor, LLC, Pita Way Troy, Inc., Pita Way Walker, LLC, Pita Way Warren, Inc., Pita Way West Oaks, LLC, Pita Way Westnedge, LLC, Pita Way White Lake, Inc., Pita Way Woodhaven, LLC, Pita Way Wyoming, LLC, Pita Way Zeeb Rd, LLC d/b/a Pita Way, Pita Way, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10006416 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Stoops, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Executed CTJ Form