New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:24-bk-11928
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2024
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Malv No 2 Inc.
100 Church St Fl 8
New York, NY 10007-2614
Represented By
Malv No 2 Inc.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 02/27 1:33 PM
Case Closed. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
21 21 misc Certificate of Mailing - Order to Dismiss Thu 02/27 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Order to Dismiss Related [+] . Notice Date 02/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #19 )
20 20 notice Notice, Appearance Wed 02/26 1:00 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Toole on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Toole, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
19 19 order Motion, Dismiss Case Mon 02/24 10:50 AM
Order, signed on 2/24/2025, Dismissing Chapter 11 Case With Prejudice Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
18 18 order Motion, Relief from Stay (fee) Wed 02/05 11:36 AM
Order, Signed on 2/5/2025, Vacating Automatic Stay Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, February 03, 2025
17 17 misc Letter Mon 02/03 4:44 PM
Letter of Adjournment Related [+] Filed by Aleksandra Krasimirova Fugate on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. with hearing to be held on 2/4/2025 (check with court for location) (Fugate, Aleksandra)
Related: [-] 7
16 16 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Mon 02/03 4:31 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Related [+] filed by Shara Claire Cornell on behalf of United States Trustee. with hearing to be held on 2/4/2025 at 04:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Cornell, Shara)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, January 24, 2025
15 15 answer Opposition Mon 01/27 1:18 PM
Opposition to Wells Fargo's Motion for Relief From Stay Related [+] filed by Malv No 2 Inc.. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 7
Sunday, December 29, 2024
14 14 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Mon 12/30 12:09 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 12/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #13 )
Friday, December 27, 2024
13 13 misc PDF Notice Fri 12/27 4:28 PM
Notice Re: Order (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Motion, Extend Time Fri 12/27 4:27 PM
Order signed on 12/27/2024 RE: Motion Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 motion Motion, Extend Time Fri 12/27 3:12 PM
Motion to Extend Time (30 days) to Retain an Attorney to Represent the Debtor filed by Kenneth Moxey, President of Malv No 2 Inc.. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Opposition Fri 12/27 2:53 PM
Opposition to United State Trustee's Motion for an Order Dismissing this Case, or, in the alternative, converting this case to chapter 7 Related [+] filed by Kenneth Moxey, President of Malv No 2 Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/4/2025 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, December 23, 2024
9 9 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Mon 12/23 8:50 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Regarding the United State's Trustee's Motion for an Order Dismissing this Case, or, in the alternative, converting this case to chapter 7 Related [+] filed by Mark Bruh on behalf of United States Trustee. with hearing to be held on 2/4/2025 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Bruh, Mark)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, December 12, 2024
8 8 misc Letter Thu 12/12 4:21 PM
Letter Waiving 362(e) Related [+] Filed by Aleksandra Krasimirova Fugate on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Fugate, Aleksandra)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 motion Motion, Relief from Stay (fee) Thu 12/12 4:19 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay and in rem as to the property located at 138-12 249 Street, Rosedale, NY 11422 filed by Aleksandra Krasimirova Fugate on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. with hearing to be held on 2/4/2025 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG). (Fugate, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 in rem Motion for Relief
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit B-1
Att: 5 Exhibit C
Att: 6 Exhibit D
Att: 7 Exhibit E
Att: 8 Exhibit F
Att: 9 Exhibit G
Att: 10 Exhibit H
Att: 11 Exhibit I
Att: 12 Exhibit J
Att: 13 Certificate of Service
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 12/12 4:20 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (fee)([LINK 24-11928 mg] ) [motion,185] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16899607. Fee amount 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #7
Thursday, November 14, 2024
6 6 notice Notice, Appearance Thu 11/14 2:21 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Brittany J Marks on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Marks, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/12 2:49 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Shara Claire Cornell on behalf of United States Trustee. (Cornell, Shara)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 motion Motion, Dismiss Case Tue 11/12 11:59 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss or Convert filed by Shara Claire Cornell on behalf of United States Trustee with hearing to be held on 1/6/2025 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG). (Cornell, Shara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, November 09, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Sun 11/10 12:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 11/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #2 )
Thursday, November 07, 2024
2 2 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC) Thu 11/07 3:55 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/12/2024 at 01:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Cappiello, Karen)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 11/07 1:48 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Fee Amount $ 1738, Receipt Number: Fee Pending. Schedule A/B due 11/21/2024. Schedule D due 11/21/2024. Schedule E/F due 11/21/2024. Schedule G due 11/21/2024. Schedule H due 11/21/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 11/21/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/21/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 11/21/2024. Declaration of Schedules due 11/21/2024. Resolution or Other Statement Authorizing Filing Pursuant to LR 1074-1 due 11/21/2024. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 11/21/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement due by: 11/21/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 11/21/2024, Chapter 11 Plan due by 3/7/2025, Disclosure Statement due by 3/7/2025, Initial Case Conference due by 12/9/2024, Filed by Malv No 2 Inc. . (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
misc Add Judge Thu 11/07 2:26 PM
Judge Martin Glenn added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]