New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:24-cv-08477
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331cv Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Town of Highland
Represented By
Leo Dorfman
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Town of Highland Zoning Board of Appeals
Represented By
Leo Dorfman
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Yeshiva Ohr Shraga Veretzky
Represented By
Steven Barshov
Sbarshovlaw PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Town Board of the Town of Highland
Terminated: 04/01/2025
Represented By
Leo Dorfman
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Town of Highland Planning Board
Terminated: 04/01/2025
Represented By
Leo Dorfman
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/31 9:26 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint,,,,,, against Town of Highland, Town of Highland Zoning Board of Appeals.Document filed by Yeshiva Ohr Shraga Veretzky. Related document:1 Complaint,,,,,,..(Barshov, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit District Schedule of Use Regulations,
Att: 2 Exhibit Cover Letter, Preliminary Application, EAF - 2 10-2023
Att: 3 Exhibit Site Plan - 2 10-2023
Att: 4 Exhibit Minutes Excerpts - Planning Board - 3 22-2023
Att: 5 Exhibit Religious Memo of Law - 04 27-2023
Att: 6 Exhibit Minutes Excerpts - Planning Board - 06 28-2023
Att: 7 Exhibit Minutes Excerpts - Planning Board - 08 23-2023
Att: 8 Exhibit Minutes Excerpts - Planning Board -10 25-2023
Att: 9 Exhibit Religious Use Memo 11 17-2023
Att: 10 Exhibit Fuller Letter to Planning Board - 11-17-23,
Att: 11 Exhibit Site Plan - 11 17-2023
Att: 12 Exhibit Minutes Excerpts - Planning Board - 11 29-2023
Att: 13 Exhibit Minutes Excerpts - Planning Board - 12 20-2024
Att: 14 Exhibit Town Board Minutes - 01 02-2024
Att: 15 Exhibit Town Board Minutes - 01 04-2024
Att: 16 Exhibit SB Letter to Planning Board 01 12-2024
Att: 17 Exhibit Planning Board Minutes -01 24-2024
Att: 18 Exhibit SB Letter to Planning Board,
Att: 19 Exhibit Barshov Letter to Planning Board,
Att: 20 Exhibit Mogel Letter to Barshov,
Att: 21 Exhibit ZBA Minutes - 04 16-2024
Att: 22 Exhibit ZBA Minutes - 05 21-2024
Att: 23 Exhibit ZBA Minutes - 06 20-2024
Att: 24 Exhibit ZBA Minutes - 07 18-2024
Att: 25 Exhibit Officially Filed ZBA Interpretation
Thursday, February 27, 2025
minutes Pre-Motion Conference Thu 02/27 12:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Pre-Motion Conference held on 2/27/2025. Plaintiff's counsel Steven Barshov, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendants' counsel Leo Dorfman, Esq. appears telephonically. Law Clerk Samantha Mitchell appears telephonically. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend Complaint. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to be submitted by March 31, 2025. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to be submitted by May 15, 2025; Plaintiff's opposition due June 16, 2025; Defendants' reply due July 10, 2025. This proceeding was recorded via the Cisco Webex platform. (wc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/20 3:19 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Steven Barshov dated February 20, 2025 re:9 LETTER MOTION for Conference - Pre-Motion Conference in Anticipation of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Leo Dorfman dated January 30, 2025. . Document filed by Yeshiva Ohr Shraga Veretzky..(Barshov, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion for Conference Fri 01/31 9:48 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Pre-Motion Conference: Telephonic pre-motion conference set for 2/27/25 at 10:45 am. The Webex call-in number is 855-244-8681 and the access code is 1809850784#. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' letter, by letter of no more than 3 pages, no later than 2/20/25. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
9 9 motion Conference Thu 01/30 7:11 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference - Pre-Motion Conference in Anticipation of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Leo Dorfman dated January 30, 2025. Document filed by Town of Highland Zoning Board of Appeals, Town of Highland Planning Board, Town Board of the Town of Highland, Town of Highland..(Dorfman, Leo)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/20 4:44 PM
ORDER granting7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Defendants may have until 1/30/25 to respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/20 2:43 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Leo Dorfman dated 12/20/2024. Document filed by Town of Highland Zoning Board of Appeals, Town of Highland Planning Board, Town Board of the Town of Highland, Town of Highland..(Dorfman, Leo)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/20 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leo Dorfman on behalf of Town of Highland Zoning Board of Appeals, Town of Highland Planning Board, Town Board of the Town of Highland, Town of Highland..(Dorfman, Leo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 11/12 4:21 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Town Board of the Town of Highland, Town of Highland, Town of Highland Planning Board, Town of Highland Zoning Board of Appeals. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/12 9:06 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Steven Barshov to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 11/08 12:43 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Town of Highland Zoning Board of Appeals, Town of Highland Planning Board, Town Board of the Town of Highland, Town of Highland, re:1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Yeshiva Ohr Shraga Veretzky..(Barshov, Steven)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/08 12:15 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Yeshiva Ohr Shraga Veretzky..(Barshov, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/08 12:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barshov, Steven)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 11/08 9:30 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 11/08 9:30 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 11/08 9:30 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 11/08 9:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Barshov. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Yeshiva Ohr Shraga Veretzky. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was removed;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/08 9:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Steven Barshov. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/07 12:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Town Board of the Town of Highland, Town of Highland, Town of Highland Planning Board, Town of Highland Zoning Board of Appeals. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30153197)Document filed by Yeshiva Ohr Shraga Veretzky..(Barshov, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit District Schedule of Use Regulations,
Att: 2 Exhibit Cover Letter, Preliminary Application, EAF - 2 10-2023
Att: 3 Exhibit Site Plan - 2 10-2023
Att: 4 Exhibit Minutes Excerpts - Planning Board - 3 22-2023
Att: 5 Exhibit Religious Memo of Law - 04 27-2023
Att: 6 Exhibit Minutes Excerpts - Planning Board - 06 28-2023
Att: 7 Exhibit Minutes Excerpts - Planning Board - 08 23-2023
Att: 8 Exhibit Minutes Excerpts - Planning Board -10 25-2023
Att: 9 Exhibit Religious Use Memo 11 17-2023
Att: 10 Exhibit Fuller Letter to Planning Board - 11-17-23,
Att: 11 Exhibit Site Plan - 11 17-2023
Att: 12 Exhibit Minutes Excerpts - Planning Board - 11 29-2023
Att: 13 Exhibit Minutes Excerpts - Planning Board - 12 20-2024
Att: 14 Exhibit Town Board Minutes - 01 02-2024
Att: 15 Exhibit Town Board Minutes - 01 04-2024
Att: 16 Exhibit SB Letter to Planning Board 01 12-2024
Att: 17 Exhibit Planning Board Minutes -01 24-2024
Att: 18 Exhibit Barshov Letter to Planning Board and ZBA - 03 05-2024
Att: 19 Exhibit Barshov Letter to Planning Board and ZBA 03 20-2024
Att: 20 Exhibit Mogel Letter to Barshov 03 20-2024
Att: 21 Exhibit ZBA Minutes - 04 16-2024
Att: 22 Exhibit ZBA Minutes - 05 21-2024
Att: 23 Exhibit ZBA Minutes - 06 20-2024
Att: 24 Exhibit ZBA Minutes -07 18-2024
Att: 25 Exhibit Officially Filed ZBA Interpretation