Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-02626

California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laura S Taylor
Case #: 3:24-ap-90089
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2024
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Northwest Registered Agent
30 N Gould St., Ste. 7000
Sheridan, WY 82801
Represented By
Northwest Registered Agent
contact info
Plaintiffs
William Owen Lee
5580 La Jolla Blvd
La Jolla, CA 92037
Represented By
William Owen Lee
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, March 14, 2025
38 38 order Closed Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/14 11:42 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Crosby, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
37 37 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Fri 01/31 9:08 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 01/31/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Order
36 36 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Fri 01/31 9:08 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 01/31/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
35 35 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Order)(CSD 3039, 3040, other) Wed 01/29 1:46 PM
Order on Defendant Northwest Registered Agent LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff William Owen Lee's Adversary Complaint 3:2024-ap-90089-JBM . with BNC Service signed on 1/29/2025. (Crosby, A)
Related: [-]
34 34 order ~Generic~ Order Wed 01/29 1:32 PM
Order Denying Approval for Plaintiff to Appear Remotely For All Court Proceedings and Hearings ; with BNC Service Related [+] signed on 1/29/2025. (Crosby, A)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Appearance
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
33 33 notice Lodgment of Order (Notice) (CSD 1500) Tue 01/21 12:04 PM
Defendant Northwest Registered Agent LLC's Notice of Lodgment of Order with Service filed by Ajay Gupta of Gupta, Evans and Ayres, PC. on behalf of Northwest Registered Agent. Related [+] (Gupta, Ajay)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss
32 32 court Errors/Deficiencies (BNC) Tue 01/21 11:39 AM
Notice to Filer of Errors and/or Deficiencies in Documents. Adv Proc Misc. Tickler Due Date: 1/24/2025, Related [+] (Crosby, A)
Related: [-] 31 Notice of Lodgment of Order
31 31 notice Lodgment of Order (Notice) (CSD 1500) Tue 01/21 11:12 AM
Defendant Northwest Registered Agent LLC's Notice of Lodgment of Order with Service filed by Ajay Gupta of Gupta, Evans and Ayres, PC. on behalf of Northwest Registered Agent. Related [+] (Gupta, Ajay)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
30 30 vCal Court Minutes - CHAP Thu 01/16 11:09 AM
Court Minutes. Hearing Date 01/15/2025, MATTER: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF WILLIAM OWEN LEE'S ADVERSARY COMPLAINT FILED ON BEHALF OF NORTHWEST REGISTERED AGENT LLC DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss
29 29 misc Proof of Service (CSD 3010) Wed 01/15 4:50 PM
Proof of Service filed by William Owen Lee. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
28 28 vCal Tentative Ruling - CHAP Tue 01/14 12:14 PM
Amended Tentative Ruling. Department 2: Hearing Date and Time: 01/15/2025 @ 2:00 PM Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss,27 Tentative Ruling (CHAP)
27 27 vCal Tentative Ruling - CHAP Tue 01/14 9:29 AM
Tentative Ruling. Department 2: Hearing Date and Time: 01/15/2025 @ 2:00 PM Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss
Friday, January 10, 2025
26 26 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sun 01/12 9:07 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 01/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Memo on Unsigned Order
25 25 court Unsigned Order Memo (Notice)(BNC) Fri 01/10 4:25 PM
Memo on Unsigned Order. Request for further documentation or further action. Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 24 Generic Application or Motion
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
24 24 motion ~Generic~ Application or Motion Thu 01/09 11:05 AM
Plaintiff William Lee's Notice of Remote Appearance; Order on Approval for Plaintiff to Appear Remotely filed by William Owen Lee. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, December 20, 2024
21 21 ans Reply Fri 12/20 10:40 AM
Defendant Northwest Registered Agent LLC's Reply to Plaintiff William Owen Lee's Motion to Deny filed by Ajay Gupta of Gupta, Evans and Ayres, PC. on behalf of on behalf of Northwest Registered Agent. (Gupta, Ajay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
23 23 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Fri 12/20 9:11 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 12/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Memo on Unsigned Order
22 22 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Fri 12/20 9:11 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 12/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Notice of Change in Date Fixed for Trial/Hearing
20 20 notice Change in Date Fixed for Trial/Hearing (Notice) (CSD 1188 & 3025)(BNC) Wed 12/18 1:18 PM
Notice of Change in Time Fixed for Hearing HEARING Scheduled for 1/15/2025 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 2, Room 118, Weinberger Courthouse . Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss
19 19 notice Change in Assigned Judge and Number (Notice)(paperless entry) Wed 12/18 11:27 AM
Notice of Change in Assigned Judge and Number. Assigned to Judge J. Barrett Marum. You are further notified that the case number and judges initials (JBM) MUST appear on all papers in connection with the subject case. (Emery, JC)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Unsigned Order Memo (Notice)(BNC) Wed 12/18 9:06 AM
Memo on Unsigned Order. Request for further documentation or further action. Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Appearance
Monday, December 16, 2024
17 17 misc Proof of Service (CSD 3010) Mon 12/16 4:42 PM
Proof of Service filed by William Owen Lee on Behalf of William Owen Lee. Related [+] (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 15 Notice (miscellaneous),16 Notice of Appearance
16 16 notice Appearance (Notice) Mon 12/16 4:39 PM
Plaintiff William Lee's Notice of Remote Appearance; Order Regarding Remote Appearance filed by William Owen Lee on Behalf of William Owen Lee. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Miscellaneous (Document/Notice) Mon 12/16 4:37 PM
Plaintiff William Lee's Notice of Motion, and Motion to Deny Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Adversary Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Support to Deny Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by William Owen Lee on Behalf of William Owen Lee. Related [+] (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Hearing and Motion
Att: 1 Declaration
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
14 14 cmp Return of Summons Served Thu 12/12 9:05 AM
Return of Summons Served on: Northwest Registered Agent . Served On 11/13/2024 filed by William Owen Lee . (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice ~Generic~ Document Wed 12/11 4:50 PM
Plaintiff William Lee's Summons for Adversary Proceeding; Certificate of Service filed by William Owen Lee . (Slaughter, S.) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2024 (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
12 12 motion Hearing & Motion (Notice) (CSD 1181, 1183 & 3015) [14 day opp] Fri 12/06 5:33 PM
Defendant Northwest Registered Agent LLC's Notice of Hearing and Motion with Certificate of Service. filed by Ajay Gupta of Gupta, Evans and Ayres, PC. on behalf of Northwest Registered Agent. HEARING Scheduled for 1/15/2025 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3, Room 129, Weinberger Courthouse . Notice Served On: 12/6/2024. Opposition due on 12/20/2024 unless an objector is entitled to additional time under FRBP 9006. Related [+] (Gupta, Ajay)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss
11 11 court Errors/Deficiencies (BNC) Fri 12/06 5:08 PM
Notice to Filer of Errors and/or Deficiencies in Documents. Adv Proc Misc. Tickler Due Date: 12/12/2024, Related [+] (Crosby, A)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Hearing and Motion
10 10 court Errors/Deficiencies (BNC) Fri 12/06 5:04 PM
Notice to Filer of Errors and/or Deficiencies in Documents. Adv Proc Misc. Tickler Due Date: 12/12/2024, Related [+] (Crosby, A)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Hearing and Motion
9 9 motion Hearing & Motion (Notice) (CSD 1181, 1183 & 3015) [14 day opp] Fri 12/06 3:06 PM
Defendant Northwest Registered Agent LLC's Notice of Hearing and Motion with Certificate of Service. filed by Ajay Gupta of Gupta, Evans and Ayres, PC. on behalf of Northwest Registered Agent. HEARING Scheduled for 1/15/2025 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3, Room 129, Weinberger Courthouse . Notice Served On: 12/6/2024. Opposition due on 12/20/2024 unless an objector is entitled to additional time under FRBP 9006. Related [+] (Gupta, Ajay)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss
8 8 court Errors/Deficiencies (BNC) Fri 12/06 2:28 PM
Notice to Filer of Errors and/or Deficiencies in Documents. Adv Proc Misc. Tickler Due Date: 12/12/2024, Related [+] (Crosby, A)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Hearing and Motion
7 7 motion Hearing & Motion (Notice) (CSD 1181, 1183 & 3015) [14 day opp] Fri 12/06 12:18 PM
Defendant Northwest Registered Agent LLC's Notice of Hearing and Motion with Certificate of Service. filed by Ajay Gupta of Gupta, Evans and Ayres, PC. on behalf of Northwest Registered Agent. HEARING Scheduled for 1/15/2025 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3, Room 129, Weinberger Courthouse . Notice Served On: 12/6/2024. Opposition due on 12/20/2024 unless an objector is entitled to additional time under FRBP 9006. Related [+] (Gupta, Ajay)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss
6 6 motion Dismiss (Motion) Fri 12/06 12:15 PM
Defendant Northwest Registered Agent LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff William Owen Lee's Adversary Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Ajay Gupta on behalf of Northwest Registered Agent. Related [+] (Gupta, Ajay)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Declaration
Friday, November 22, 2024
5 5 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sun 11/24 9:09 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 11/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Errors/Deficiencies
4 4 court Errors/Deficiencies (BNC) Fri 11/22 11:38 AM
Notice to Filer of Errors and/or Deficiencies in Documents. Adv Proc Misc. Tickler Due Date: 12/23/2024, Related [+] (Crosby, A)
Related: [-] 3 Proof of Service
3 3 misc Proof of Service (CSD 3010) Fri 11/22 11:37 AM
Proof of Service filed by William Owen Lee . Related [+] (Crosby, A)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (CSD 2500A) Wed 11/06 5:00 PM
Summons Issued on Northwest Registered Agent Answer Due 12/6/2024; Certificate of Service (Lewis, L.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 11/06 4:17 PM
Adversary case 24-90089 Complaint by William Owen Lee against Northwest Registered Agent. Nature of Suit: 72 (Injunctive relief - other) 91 (Declaratory judgment) , Fee Amount $ 0.0 Filed by William Owen Lee. (Lewis, L.) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2024 (Lewis, L.)
Related: [-]