Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah D Morrison
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:24-cv-04139
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Douglas Collins
Represented By
Benjamin Craig Adkins
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
John A. Gambill
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tracy Collins
Represented By
Benjamin Craig Adkins
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
John A. Gambill
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Moore
Represented By
Benjamin Craig Adkins
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
John A. Gambill
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Defendant
Steven Moore
Represented By
Benjamin Craig Adkins
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
John A. Gambill
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Defendant
WAI Construction Group, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin Craig Adkins
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
John A. Gambill
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Defendant
WAI Properties, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin Craig Adkins
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
John A. Gambill
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wastren Properties, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin Craig Adkins
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
John A. Gambill
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
1299 Zurich Way
Schaumburg, IL 60196
Represented By
Jarrod W. Stone
Manier & Herod, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Donna Gardner
Terminated: 02/18/2025
Defendant
James Gardner
Terminated: 02/18/2025


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 05/07 4:18 PM
ORDER granting34 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 25) on or before Wednesday May 28, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on May 7, 2025. (jlk)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Extension of Time Wed 05/07 12:28 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/28/2025. by Defendant WAI Construction Group, LLC. (Gambill, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/06 1:08 PM
ORDER granting32 Defendants' Motion for for Enlargement of Time to Respond to25 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants may have until MAY 7, 2025, to file their Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/6/25. (sem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
32 32 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/23 2:12 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/7/2025. by Defendant WAI Construction Group, LLC. (Gambill, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time
Monday, April 07, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/07 2:42 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Extension of Time. Set/Reset Deadlines as to25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Certain Defendants . Responses due by 4/23/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 7, 2025. (jlk)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/07 2:42 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Certain Defendants . Responses due by 4/23/2025 (jlk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
30 30 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/04 5:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/23/2025. to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant WAI Construction Group, LLC. (Gambill, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Thursday, March 20, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/20 2:20 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Certain Defendants Responses due by 4/9/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/20/2025. (vb)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/20 9:57 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/9/2025. by Defendant WAI Construction Group, LLC. (Gambill, John) Modified on 3/20/2025 (vb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Thursday, March 13, 2025
27 27 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Thu 03/13 4:31 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The Court adopts the following schedule: Joinder of Parties due by 4/25/2025. Motions to Amend due by 4/25/2025. Initial Disclosures due by 3/27/2025. Discovery due by 12/12/2025. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement on any matter related to discovery, they are directed to arrange a conference with the Court. Dispositive motions due by 2/13/2026. Primary Expert due by 9/12/2025. Rebuttal Expert due by 10/27/2025. Settlement Demand due by 5/12/2025. Response to Settlement Demand due by 5/26/2025. Mediation Deadline: 11/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 13, 2025. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/11 3:11 PM
NOTICE VACATING 24 Notice of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 3/13/2025 10:30 AM in Zoom Meeting before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers per Rule 26(f) Report/email from counsel. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
26 26 misc Rule 26(f) Report Thu 03/06 6:49 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
25 25 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 03/05 1:55 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Certain Defendants by Plaintiff Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Niel Franzese in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Certain Defendants
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 02/18 2:26 PM
ORDER granting ECF22 . Construing the subject Motion as a Motion to Sever pursuant to Rule 21, the Court GRANTS the Motion and DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims against Defendants James Gardner and Donna Gardner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/18/2025. (vb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 02/14 2:07 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims against Defendants James Gardner and Donna Gardner without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Plaintiff Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 02/06 4:33 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within 21 DAYS of the date of this order why the action should not be dismissed and why an extension of time to effect service on Defendants James Gardner and Donna Gardner should be allowed. The good cause showing should be supported with sworn affidavits. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that failure to comply with the Court's order may result in a dismissal of its claims against Defendants James Gardner and Donna Gardner. Show Cause Response due by 2/27/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/6/2025. (vb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
20 20 18 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/14 4:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand filed by Steven Moore, Jennifer Moore, Douglas Collins, Tracy Collins, and filed by Wastren Properties, LLC. (Gambill, John)
Related: [-]
19 19 17 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/14 4:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand filed by WAI Properties, LLC. (Gambill, John)
Related: [-]
18 18 18 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/14 4:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand filed by WAI Construction Group, LLC. (Gambill, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/31 12:53 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Douglas Collins answer due 1/14/2025; Tracy Collins answer due 1/14/2025; Jennifer Moore answer due 1/14/2025; Steven Moore answer due 1/14/2025; WAI Construction Group, LLC answer due 1/14/2025; WAI Properties, LLC answer due 1/14/2025; Wastren Properties, LLC answer due 1/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/31/24. (sem)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
16 16 5 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/30 4:47 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,, New date requested 1/14/2025. by Defendants WAI Properties, LLC, WAI Construction Group, LLC, Wastren Properties, LLC, Steven Moore, Jennifer Moore, James Gardner, Donna Gardner, Douglas Collins, Tracy Collins. (Gambill, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/17 1:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Wastren Properties, LLC. Wastren Properties, LLC served on 12/10/2024, answer due 12/31/2024. (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/17 1:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant WAI Properties, LLC. WAI Properties, LLC served on 12/11/2024, answer due 1/2/2025. (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/17 1:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant WAI Construction Group, LLC. WAI Construction Group, LLC served on 12/10/2024, answer due 12/31/2024. (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/17 1:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Tracy Collins. Tracy Collins served on 12/10/2024, answer due 12/31/2024. (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/17 1:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Steven Moore. Steven Moore served on 12/10/2024, answer due 12/31/2024. (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/17 1:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Jennifer Moore. Jennifer Moore served on 12/10/2024, answer due 12/31/2024. (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/17 1:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Douglas Collins. Douglas Collins served on 12/10/2024, answer due 12/31/2024. (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 12/11 9:24 AM
Summons Issued as to WAI Properties, LLC (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 12/10 6:57 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to WAI Properties, LLC (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/08 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF NON-ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. (mas)
Related: [-]
5 5 12 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 11/08 9:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Douglas Collins, Tracy Collins, Jennifer Moore, Steven Moore, WAI Construction Group, LLC, Wastren Properties, LLC. (mas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/07 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jarrod W. Stone for Plaintiff Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Thu 11/07 3:50 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/07 3:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. for Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland.. (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
1 1 38 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/07 3:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Douglas Collins, Tracy Collins, Donna Gardner, James Gardner, Jennifer Moore, Steven Moore, WAI Construction Group, LLC, WAI Properties, LLC, Wastren Properties, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10242725), filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Stone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit General Indemnity Agreement,
Att: 2 22 pgs Exhibit Letter from F&D to Indemnitors,
Att: 3 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 2 pgs Summons Form Summons as to Donna Gardner,
Att: 5 2 pgs Summons Form Summons as to Douglas Collins,
Att: 6 2 pgs Summons Form Summons as to James Gardner,
Att: 7 Summons Form Summons as to Jennifer Moore,
Att: 8 Summons Form Summons as to Steven Moore,
Att: 9 Summons Form Summons as to Tracy Collins,
Att: 10 Summons Form Summons as to WAI Construction Group, LLC,
Att: 11 Summons Form Summons as to Wastren Properties, LLC