Jisung Park v. CAO Group Inc
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-09636 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Case Filed: | Nov 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 1:39 AM PDT |
Defendant
CAO Group Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jisung Park
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, February 26, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 02/26 1:46 PM
MINUTES OF New Case Status Conference held via Zoom before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: A Jury Trial is set for 7/15/2025 at 9:00 AM, with a Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2025 at 3:00 PM. Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Christopher T. Kim. Attorney for Defendant(s): Al Mohajerian. Courtroom Deputy: Paul M. Cruz. Time in Court: 05 mins. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (pc) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 02/18 10:48 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference scheduled for 02/24/2025 at 3:00 p.m. is advanced to 2:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 2/24/2025 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Counsel are granted leave to appear by Zoom to this one proceeding. The Zoom link can be accessed from the Judges Procedures and Schedules page at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. (pc) |
|
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant CAO Group Inc.(Mohajerian, Al) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, filed by Defendant CAO Group Inc.(Attorney Al Mohajerian added to party CAO Group Inc (pty:dft))(Mohajerian, Al) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflectedbelow. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than December 20, 2024 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details). (aco) |
|
Friday, November 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jisung Park, upon Defendant CAO Group Inc served on 11/18/2024, answer due 12/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amanda Ventura (Accounting Clerk) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, November 13, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The courtesy copy requirement is suspended until further notice. All proceedings are held in person. Requests for remote appearances must be filed a week prior to the proceeding. Requests are made in a pleading format, with a declaration stating the good cause why the attorney cannot appear in-person. (pc) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant CAO Group Inc. (car) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jisung Park. (Kim, Christopher) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jisung Park. (Kim, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jisung Park, identifying Jisung Park and CAO Group, Inc.. (Kim, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38545031 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Jisung Park. (Attorney Christopher Taewoo Kim added to party Jisung Park(pty:pla))(Kim, Christopher) |