Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark J Conway
Case #: 5:24-bk-02892
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Smith Health Care, Ltd.
453 S Main Road
Mountain Top, PA 18707
Represented By
Robert E Chernicoff
Cunningham And Chernicoff PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
US Courthouse 1501 N. 6th St
Harrisburg, PA 17102
Represented By
Joseph P Schalk
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
101 101 misc Ombudsman Report Wed 05/07 7:41 AM
Third 60-day Ombudsman Report for the period of 01/07/25 through 03/06/25 Filed by Margaret Barajas Related [+]. (Dunbar-Yancey, Daneisha)
Related: [-] 85 ,93
Friday, May 02, 2025
100 100 misc Monthly Operating Report Fri 05/02 4:27 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 03/31/2025 Filed by Robert E Chernicoff of Cunningham and Chernicoff PC on behalf of Smith Health Care, Ltd.. (Chernicoff, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
99 99 misc Monthly Operating Report Fri 05/02 4:26 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 02/28/2025 Filed by Robert E Chernicoff of Cunningham and Chernicoff PC on behalf of Smith Health Care, Ltd.. (Chernicoff, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit